McCoy v. General Motors LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bruce McCoy
Defendant: General Motors LLC and Ed Morse Automotive LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00979
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 14 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by General Motors LLC. (Hudgins, Rebekah)
October 1, 2021 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Bruce McCoy (Davis, Arnesia)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Lead counsel for each party and any unrepresented party shall confer in a face-to-face conference as soon as practicable. The Joint Report shall be filed on or before October 12, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 9/28/2021) (bdb)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 Motion for leave to participate without local counsel. Local counsel shall enter an appearance no later than October 1, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 9/24/2021) (npk)
September 23, 2021 Filing 10 First MOTION for Leave to File Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Bruce McCoy (Davis, Arnesia)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Having considered the application, the Court finds that Plaintiff's counsel's request for admission pro hac vice should be and hereby is GRANTED. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 9/9/2021) (mmw)
September 9, 2021 Filing 8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Clerk Note: Filer states no fee is to be collected due to prior payment or waiver by MO 16 or prior order.) filed by Bruce McCoy (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (Davis, Arnesia)
September 8, 2021 Filing 7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12199110) filed by Bruce McCoy (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing Letter __ Awaiting Arrival)***CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING NOT ATTACHED*** (Davis, Arnesia) Modified on 9/9/2021 (bdb).
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with a Letter Regarding Certificate of Good Standing filed by Bruce McCoy. NO FEE PAID. ***FILED USING EMERGENCY FILING EMAIL*** (cea) Modified to correct motion on 9/8/2021 (cea).
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Accordingly, on or by September 7, 2021, Ms. Davis shall file an application to proceed pro hac vice, or otherwise comply with Local Rule 83.9(a). Failure to do so may result in the imposition of sanctions, and/or a ban from practicing in the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 8/30/2021) (tln)
August 30, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Mon Aug 30 12:27:11 CDT 2021 (crt)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ed Morse Automotive LLC, General Motors LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, (Wade, Deron)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (tln)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ed Morse Automotive LLC, General Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate General Motors Company, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate General Motors Holdings LLC for General Motors LLC; Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate TJMIII LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Morse Operations, Inc. for Ed Morse Automotive LLC. (Wade, Deron)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Ed Morse Automotive LLC, General Motors LLC. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12149623) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Index with Documents, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Wade, Deron)
August 19, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Thu Aug 19 10:55:08 CDT 2021 (crt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy v. General Motors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce McCoy
Represented By: Arnesia B. Davis
Represented By: Arnesia B Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Deron L Wade
Represented By: Rebekah Lynne Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Morse Automotive LLC
Represented By: Deron L Wade
Represented By: Rebekah Lynne Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?