Narmada Hospitality v. Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota
Plaintiff: Narmada Hospitality doing business as Quality Inn and Suites
Defendant: Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota
Not Classified By Court: ADR Provider
Case Number: 4:2021cv00990
Filed: August 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The Court has been notified that this case has settled. See ECF No. #16 . Therefore, the Court ORDERS that all deadlines are STAYED until further ordered by the Court. The parties shall file appropriate dismissal papersa stipulation of dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) or an appropriate motion and corresponding proposed order with the Clerk's Office on or before October 29, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 10/14/2021) (mmw)
October 13, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Joint Mediation Report filed by Narmada Hospitality (Dugas, Preston)
September 29, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Wilson, Lisa)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Court hereby REFERS the parties to mediation and APPOINTS Donald E. Herrmann as mediator. It is ORDERED that beginning at 9:00 a.m. on Wednesday, October 6, 2021, the parties (or a representative with full settlement authority) and their counsel shall conduct an in-person mediation before Mr. Herrmann at the Fourth Floor Courtroom and Jury Room of the Eldon B. Mahon United States Courthouse, located at 501 W. 10th Street, Fort Worth, Texas. Within seven days after the mediation, the parties shall jointly prepare and file a written report. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 9/16/2021) (pef)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota's Motion to Dismiss #9 and the parties' Joint Motion to Stay or Alternatively for an Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to the Motion to Dismiss #12 . Having considered the Motion to Dismiss, the Court concludes that it should be and hereby is DENIED. Having considered the Joint Motion to Stay, the Court finds that it should be and hereby is DENIED. The alternative request for extension of time is DENIED as moot. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 9/15/2021) (sre)
September 14, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay or in the Alternative, Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Narmada Hospitality (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order) (Dugas, Preston)
September 14, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Joint Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order filed by Narmada Hospitality (Dugas, Preston)
August 30, 2021 Filing 10 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota re #9 MOTION to Dismiss The Extra-Contractual Claims in Plaintiff's Original Petition (Wilson, Lisa)
August 30, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss The Extra-Contractual Claims in Plaintiff's Original Petition filed by Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota (Wilson, Lisa)
August 27, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Narmada Hospitality. (Dugas, Preston)
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron George Stendell on behalf of Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Stendell, Aaron)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before September 14, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 8/24/2021) (tln)
August 21, 2021 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (tln)
August 21, 2021 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota. (Wilson, Lisa)
August 21, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Notice of Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota (Wilson, Lisa)
August 21, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate W. R. Berkley for Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota. (Wilson, Lisa)
August 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12156327) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) A-1, #3 Exhibit(s) A-2, #4 Exhibit(s) A-3, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Wilson, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Narmada Hospitality v. Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Narmada Hospitality doing business as Quality Inn and Suites
Represented By: Preston J Dugas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota
Represented By: Lisa M Wilson
Represented By: Kieran Warren Leary
Represented By: Aaron George Stendell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ADR Provider
Represented By: Donald E Herrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?