Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Anco Management Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Anco Management Incorporated d/b/a Temptations and d/b/a Temptations Lounge, Attauyo N. Nsekhe, Christopher Poux, Anco Management Incorporated doing business as Temptations doing business as Temptations Lounge, Ty Nsekhe and Chris Poux
Case Number: 4:2022cv00437
Filed: May 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions due by 1/16/2023. Deadline for mediation is on or before 11/16/2022. Discovery due by 12/16/2022. Pretrial Order due by 4/20/2023. Bench Trial set for 5/15/2023 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/27/2022) (wxc)
July 26, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Joint Report of the Parties re: #12 Order for Scheduling Order Proposal, filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (King, Jamie)
July 21, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (King, Jamie)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Before the Court is Defendants' Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel (ECF No. #14 ), filed July 15, 2022. The Court GRANTS the motion and ORDERS that Defendants counsel is required to abide by all local rules of this Court, including the standards of litigation conduct set forth in Dondi Properties Corporation v. Commerce Savings & Loan Association, 121 F.R.D. 284 (N.D. Tex. 1988). It is further ORDERED that if proceeding without local counsel disrupts this litigation or otherwise results in a failure to comply with the rules of this Court, Defendants will be required to obtain local counsel immediately. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/15/2022) (sre)
July 15, 2022 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File To Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Anco Management Incorporated, Attauyo N. Nsekhe, Christopher Poux (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dolezal, Trey)
July 15, 2022 Filing 13 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Anco Management Incorporated, Attauyo N. Nsekhe, Christopher Poux Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Dolezal, Trey)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCEAND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Lead counsel for each party and any unrepresented party shall confer as soon as practicable. The Joint Report shall be filed on or before 8/3/2022. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/6/2022) (jgg)
July 6, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anco Management Incorporated, Attauyo N. Nsekhe, Christopher Poux. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Dolezal, Trey)
July 6, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Anco Management Incorporated, Attauyo N. Nsekhe, Christopher Poux. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice.Attorney Trey L Dolezal added to party Anco Management Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Trey L Dolezal added to party Attauyo N. Nsekhe(pty:dft), Attorney Trey L Dolezal added to party Christopher Poux(pty:dft) (Dolezal, Trey)
June 20, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Anco Management Incorporated ; served on 6/15/2022. (King, Jamie)
June 20, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Attauyo N. Nsekhe ; served on 6/15/2022. (King, Jamie)
May 23, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Anco Management Incorporated, Attauyo N. Nsekhe, Christopher Poux. (mmw)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 ...Before the Court is Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.s Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel (ECF No. #4 ), filed May 19, 2022. The Court GRANTS the motion and ORDERS that Plaintiffs counsel is required to abide by all local rules of this Court, including the standards of litigation conduct set forth in Dondi Properties Corporation v. Commerce Savings & Loan Association, 121 F.R.D. 284 (N.D. Tex. 1988) (per curiam). It is further ORDERED that if proceeding without local counsel disrupts this litigation or otherwise results in a failure to comply with the rules of this Court, Defendant will be required to obtain local counsel immediately. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/23/2022) (wxc)
May 19, 2022 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (npk)
May 19, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (King, Jamie)
May 19, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (King, Jamie)
May 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. ($402; Receipt number 0539-12835735 ) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (King, Jamie) Modified on 5/19/2022 (mmw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Anco Management Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anco Management Incorporated d/b/a Temptations and d/b/a Temptations Lounge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attauyo N. Nsekhe
Represented By: Trey L Dolezal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Poux
Represented By: Trey L Dolezal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anco Management Incorporated doing business as Temptations doing business as Temptations Lounge
Represented By: Trey L Dolezal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Nsekhe
Represented By: Trey L Dolezal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Poux
Represented By: Trey L Dolezal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?