Strongin et al v. Scott et al
Plaintiff: Kyle Strongin, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Kristen Plaisance, Karen Rene Towell, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Sonja Zielsdorf, Beverly Foley, Jose Carlos Arias, Jose Christine Silvester, Tommie Dickinson, Robert James Brooks, Jr., Alana S. Phillips, Jennifer B. Edwards, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Amber Cloy, Jennifer Mienke, Jennifer Williams, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Lynn Davenport, Juan Carlos Arias, Alana S Phillips, Mr. Lester Rand, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I and Lester Rand
Defendant: John B. Scott, Jose "Joe" A. Esparza, Secretary of State of Texas, Ruth R. Hughs, Keith Ingram, Jacquelyn Callanen, Nelson Wolff, Rebeca Clay-Flores, Justin Rodriguez, Marialyn Barnard, Tommy Calvert, Bobbie Koepp, Cynthia Jacqua, Frank Phillips, Andy Eads, Ryan Williams, Ron Marchant, Bobbie J. Mitchell, Dianne Edmondson, Lina Hidalgo, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Tom S. Ramsey, R. Jack Cole, Isabel Longoria, Jennifer Doinoff, Ruben Becerra, Debbie Ingalsbe, Mark Jones, Lon Shell, Walt Smith, Ron Massingill, Michele Carew, Pat Deen, Crickett Miller, George Conley, Craig Peacock, Larry Walden, Steve Dugan, Heider Garcia, R. Jack Cagle, Roy Charles Brooks, Devan Allen, Gary Fickes, J.D. Fickes, Andrew Steven Brown, Dana Debeauvoir, Rebecca Guerrero, Bill Gravell, Christopher Davis, Terry Cook, Cynthia Long, Valerie Covey, Ross Boles, Suzie Harvey, Robert C. Walker, Charlie Riley, James Noack, James Metts, J.D. Johnson, Glenn Whitley, Susan Fletcher, Darrell Hale, Chris Hill, Cheryl Williams, Duncan Webb, Bruce Sherbet, Mark Keough, Sarah Eckhardt, B. Glen Whitley, Cynthia Jaqua and Clifford Tatum
Not Classified By Court: Honorable Warren Kenneth Paxton, Jr
Case Number: 4:2022cv00576
Filed: July 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Cureton
Referring Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 247 NOTICE of Defendants' Advisory to the Court filed by Jose "Joe" A. Esparza, Ruth R. Hughs, Keith Ingram, John B. Scott (Dyer, Heather)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 246 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney, added attorney Heather Lee Dyer,Heather Lee Dyer for Jose Joe A. Esparza,Heather Lee Dyer for Keith Ingram,Heather Lee Dyer for Ruth R. Hughs,Heather Lee Dyer for John B. Scott. Motion filed by Jose "Joe" A. Esparza, Keith Ingram, Ruth R. Hughs, John B. Scott (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Heather Lee Dyer added to party Jose "Joe" A. Esparza(pty:dft), Attorney Heather Lee Dyer added to party Ruth R. Hughs(pty:dft), Attorney Heather Lee Dyer added to party Keith Ingram(pty:dft), Attorney Heather Lee Dyer added to party John B. Scott(pty:dft) (Dyer, Heather)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Order: Before the Court is Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint with Prejudice ("Motion"). ECF No. #239 . Having considered the filing, the Court hereby REFERS this Motion and related motions (ECF No. #131 ) to the same to United States Magistrate Judge Jeffrey Cureton. All papers filed hereafter referring to the Motion shall include the following notation under the case-number: "(Relates to the Motions Referred to Magistrate Judge Cureton)." (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 1/13/2023) (fba)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 244 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Alana S Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Lester Rand, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf re: #239 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint with prejudice, #240 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) In Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Joint Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss) (Buster, Jason)
January 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER granting #242 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. It is ORDERED that Plaintiffs' response shall be no greater than 50 pages in length. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 1/2/2023) (rjh)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MOTION for Leave to File Excess pagesin response to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss filed by Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Alana S Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Lester Rand, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Motion for Leave to File Excess pages) (Buster, Jason)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Appendix in Support filed by Devan Allen, Marialyn Barnard, Ruben Becerra, Ross Boles, Roy Charles Brooks, Andrew Steven Brown, R. Jack Cagle, Jacquelyn Callanen, Tommy Calvert, Michele Carew, Rebeca Clay-Flores, R. Jack Cole, George Conley, Terry Cook, Valerie Covey, Christopher Davis, Dana Debeauvoir, Pat Deen, Jennifer Doinoff, Steve Dugan, Andy Eads, Sarah Eckhardt, Dianne Edmondson, Rodney Ellis, Jose "Joe" A. Esparza, Gary Fickes, J.D. Fickes, Susan Fletcher, Adrian Garcia, Heider Garcia, Bill Gravell, Rebecca Guerrero, Darrell Hale, Suzie Harvey, Lina Hidalgo, Chris Hill, Ruth R. Hughs, Debbie Ingalsbe, Keith Ingram, Cynthia Jacqua, Cynthia Jaqua, J.D. Johnson, Mark Jones, Mark Keough, Bobbie Koepp, Cynthia Long, Isabel Longoria, Ron Marchant, Ron Massingill, James Metts, Crickett Miller, Bobbie J. Mitchell, James Noack, Warren Kenneth Paxton, Jr, Craig Peacock, Frank Phillips, Tom S. Ramsey, Charlie Riley, Justin Rodriguez, John B. Scott, Secretary of State of Texas, Lon Shell, Bruce Sherbet, Walt Smith, Clifford Tatum, Larry Walden, Robert C. Walker, Duncan Webb, B. Glen Whitley, Glenn Whitley, Cheryl Williams, Ryan Williams, Nelson Wolff re #240 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,, to Dismiss (Plake, Daniel)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Devan Allen, Marialyn Barnard, Ruben Becerra, Ross Boles, Roy Charles Brooks, Andrew Steven Brown, R. Jack Cagle, Jacquelyn Callanen, Tommy Calvert, Michele Carew, Rebeca Clay-Flores, R. Jack Cole, George Conley, Terry Cook, Valerie Covey, Christopher Davis, Dana Debeauvoir, Pat Deen, Jennifer Doinoff, Steve Dugan, Andy Eads, Sarah Eckhardt, Dianne Edmondson, Rodney Ellis, Jose "Joe" A. Esparza, Gary Fickes, J.D. Fickes, Susan Fletcher, Adrian Garcia, Heider Garcia, Bill Gravell, Rebecca Guerrero, Darrell Hale, Suzie Harvey, Lina Hidalgo, Chris Hill, Ruth R. Hughs, Debbie Ingalsbe, Keith Ingram, Cynthia Jacqua, Cynthia Jaqua, J.D. Johnson, Mark Jones, Mark Keough, Bobbie Koepp, Cynthia Long, Isabel Longoria, Ron Marchant, Ron Massingill, James Metts, Crickett Miller, Bobbie J. Mitchell, James Noack, Warren Kenneth Paxton, Jr, Craig Peacock, Frank Phillips, Tom S. Ramsey, Charlie Riley, Justin Rodriguez, John B. Scott, Secretary of State of Texas, Lon Shell, Bruce Sherbet, Walt Smith, Clifford Tatum, Larry Walden, Robert C. Walker, Duncan Webb, B. Glen Whitley, Glenn Whitley, Cheryl Williams, Ryan Williams, Nelson Wolff re #239 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint with prejudice (Plake, Daniel)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint with prejudice filed by Devan Allen, Marialyn Barnard, Ruben Becerra, Ross Boles, Roy Charles Brooks, Andrew Steven Brown, R. Jack Cagle, Jacquelyn Callanen, Tommy Calvert, Michele Carew, Rebeca Clay-Flores, R. Jack Cole, George Conley, Terry Cook, Valerie Covey, Christopher Davis, Dana Debeauvoir, Pat Deen, Jennifer Doinoff, Steve Dugan, Andy Eads, Sarah Eckhardt, Dianne Edmondson, Rodney Ellis, Jose "Joe" A. Esparza, Gary Fickes, J.D. Fickes, Susan Fletcher, Adrian Garcia, Heider Garcia, Bill Gravell, Rebecca Guerrero, Darrell Hale, Suzie Harvey, Lina Hidalgo, Chris Hill, Ruth R. Hughs, Debbie Ingalsbe, Keith Ingram, Cynthia Jacqua, Cynthia Jaqua, J.D. Johnson, Mark Jones, Mark Keough, Bobbie Koepp, Cynthia Long, Isabel Longoria, Ron Marchant, Ron Massingill, James Metts, Crickett Miller, Bobbie J. Mitchell, James Noack, Warren Kenneth Paxton, Jr, Craig Peacock, Frank Phillips, Tom S. Ramsey, Charlie Riley, Justin Rodriguez, John B. Scott, Secretary of State of Texas, Lon Shell, Bruce Sherbet, Walt Smith, Clifford Tatum, Larry Walden, Robert C. Walker, Duncan Webb, B. Glen Whitley, Glenn Whitley, Cheryl Williams, Ryan Williams, Nelson Wolff (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting dismissal) (Plake, Daniel)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #158 Motion to Sever. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 12/12/2022) (Judge Mark Pittman) Modified on 12/14/2022 (tjc).
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #157 Motion to Sever. ; denying #157 Motion to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 12/12/2022) (Judge Mark Pittman) Modified on 12/14/2022 (tjc).
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #81 Motion to Sever. ; denying #81 Motion to Transfer Case out of District/Division. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 12/12/2022) (Judge Mark Pittman) Modified on 12/14/2022 (tjc).
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #80 Motion to Sever. ; denying #80 Motion to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 12/12/2022) (Judge Mark Pittman) Modified on 12/14/2022 (tjc).
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER granting #233 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint and Motion to File a Joint Brief in Excess of 25 Pages. It is ORDERED that Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint no later than December 30, 2022. It is further ORDERED that Defendants may file a Joint Motion to Dismiss no greater than 50 pages in length. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 11/21/2022). (fba)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MOTION to Extend Time time to file motions to dismiss and to file a joint brief in excess of 25 pages filed by Devan Allen, Marialyn Barnard, Ruben Becerra, Ross Boles, Roy Charles Brooks, Andrew Steven Brown, R. Jack Cagle, Jacquelyn Callanen, Tommy Calvert, Michele Carew, Rebeca Clay-Flores, R. Jack Cole, George Conley, Terry Cook, Valerie Covey, Christopher Davis, Dana Debeauvoir, Pat Deen, Jennifer Doinoff, Steve Dugan, Andy Eads, Sarah Eckhardt, Dianne Edmondson, Rodney Ellis, Jose "Joe" A. Esparza, Gary Fickes, J.D. Fickes, Susan Fletcher, Adrian Garcia, Heider Garcia, Bill Gravell, Rebecca Guerrero, Darrell Hale, Suzie Harvey, Lina Hidalgo, Chris Hill, Ruth R. Hughs, Debbie Ingalsbe, Keith Ingram, Cynthia Jacqua, Cynthia Jaqua, J.D. Johnson, Mark Jones, Mark Keough, Bobbie Koepp, Cynthia Long, Isabel Longoria, Ron Marchant, Ron Massingill, James Metts, Crickett Miller, Bobbie J. Mitchell, James Noack, Warren Kenneth Paxton, Jr, Craig Peacock, Frank Phillips, Tom S. Ramsey, Charlie Riley, Justin Rodriguez, John B. Scott, Secretary of State of Texas, Lon Shell, Bruce Sherbet, Walt Smith, Clifford Tatum, Larry Walden, Robert C. Walker, Duncan Webb, B. Glen Whitley, Glenn Whitley, Cheryl Williams, Ryan Williams, Nelson Wolff (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Plake, Daniel)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 232 Order: Having conducted a de novo review of the Magistrate Judge's FCR (ECF No. #224 ), and Plaintiff's Objection (ECF No. #226 ), the Court ADOPTS the reasoning in the Magistrate Judge's FCR and OVERRULES Plaintiff's Objection. The Court further notes that election at issue in this emergency temporary restraining order ("TRO") occurred on November 8, 2022. Thus, the emergency equitable relief sought by the TRO is moot. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 11/15/2022) (fba)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 231 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint against All Defendants filed by Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Amber Cloy, James L. Clark, Sonja Zielsdorf, Beverly Foley, Tommie Dickinson, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Lindsey Gremont, Alana S Phillips, Kyle Strongin, Lester Rand, Jose Christine Silvester, Lynn Davenport, Jennifer Williams, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Juan Carlos Arias, Kristen Plaisance, Christine Koepke, Alexandra Campo, Jason Scott Buster, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (fba)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER:Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. ECF No. #196 . Having considered the Motion, the Court finds that it should be and hereby is GRANTED. Therefore, the Clerk of the Court is INSTRUCTED to file Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, attached to the Motion (ECF No. #196 -1), as a separate docket entry. As a result of the amended complaint, the Court further ORDERS that Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. #15 , #78 , #79 , #83 , #115 , #122 , #130 , #135 , #156 , #159 , #160 , #163 , #187 , #194 ) are DENIED as moot. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 11/15/2022) (fba)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 229 REPLY filed by Andrew Steven Brown, Dana Debeauvoir, Sarah Eckhardt, Rebecca Guerrero re: #157 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Nelson, Anthony)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 228 REPLY filed by Andrew Steven Brown, Dana Debeauvoir, Sarah Eckhardt, Rebecca Guerrero re: #156 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Nelson, Anthony)
November 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 227 Appendix in Support filed by Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Alana S Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Lester Rand, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf re #226 Response/Objection,,, SUPPORTING DOCUMENTATION for ECF 226 (Buster, Jason)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 226 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Alana S Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Lester Rand, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf re: #224 Findings and Recommendations on Motion re: #203 Motion for TRO,,, filed by Jason Scott Buster, Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr., Alexandra Campo, Christine Koepke, Kyle Strongin, Lester Rand, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Jennifer Williams (Buster, Jason)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #220 Motion for Leave to File. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 11/3/2022) (chmb)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 224 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER #203 . The Court RECOMMENDS that the district judge DENY Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order [doc. #203 ]. Under 28 U.S.C. 636, it is hereby ORDERED that each party is granted until November 17, 2022 to serve and file written objections to the United States Magistrate Judge's proposed findings, conclusions and recommendation. It is further ORDERED that if objections are filed and the opposing party chooses to file a response, the response shall be filed within seven (7) days of the filing date of the objections. It is further ORDERED that the above-styled and numbered action, previously referred to the United States Magistrate Judge for findings, conclusions and recommendation, be and hereby is returned to the docket of the United States District Judge. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 11/3/2022) (fba) (Main Document 224 replaced with a text searchable doc on 11/4/2022) (ali).
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 223 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Alana S Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Lester Rand, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf re: #207 Response/Objection, (Buster, Jason)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 222 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Alana S Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Lester Rand, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf re: #208 Response/Objection, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Supporting documentation) (Buster, Jason)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 221 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Alana S Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Lester Rand, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf re: #205 Response/Objection, #204 MOTION to Extend Time file reply to response (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Supporting documentation) (Buster, Jason)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to TRO filed by Suzie Harvey, Mark Keough, James Metts, James Noack, Charlie Riley, Robert C. Walker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proposed surreply, #2 Exhibit(s) Proposed appendix to surreply, #3 Proposed Order granting motion for leave) (Plake, Daniel)
October 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 219 REPLY filed by Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Alana S Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Lester Rand, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf re: #216 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Supporting documentation) (Buster, Jason) Modified on 11/1/2022 (sre).
October 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 218 REPLY filed by Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Alana S Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Lester Rand, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf re: #214 Response/Objection, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Supporting documentation) (Buster, Jason) Modified on 11/1/2022 (sre).
October 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 217 REPLY filed by Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Alana S Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Lester Rand, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf re: #212 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion #211 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Supporting documentation) (Buster, Jason) Modified on 11/1/2022 (sre).
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Jose "Joe" A. Esparza, Ruth R. Hughs, Keith Ingram, John B. Scott re #215 Response/Objection, OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (Smith, Pierce)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 215 RESPONSE filed by Jose "Joe" A. Esparza, Ruth R. Hughs, Keith Ingram, John B. Scott re: #203 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order barring Defendants use of computerized equipment to administer elections (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Prop order Ds' Resp. to TRO) (Smith, Pierce)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 214 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #213 RESPONSE filed by Suzie Harvey, Mark Keough, James Metts, James Noack, Charlie Riley, Robert C. Walker re: #203 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order barring Defendants use of computerized equipment to administer elections (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix) (Plake, Daniel) Modified title of document per MJ chambers on 11/2/2022 (bdb).
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 213 RESPONSE filed by Suzie Harvey, Mark Keough, James Metts, James Noack, Charlie Riley, Robert C. Walker re: #203 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order barring Defendants use of computerized equipment to administer elections (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Plake, Daniel)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Devan Allen, Roy Charles Brooks, Gary Fickes, Heider Garcia, J.D. Johnson, B. Glen Whitley re #211 Response/Objection, (Lund, Stephen)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 211 RESPONSE filed by Devan Allen, Roy Charles Brooks, Gary Fickes, Heider Garcia, J.D. Johnson, B. Glen Whitley re: #203 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order barring Defendants use of computerized equipment to administer elections (Lund, Stephen)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF PROCESS: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Substituted Service of Process [doc. #154 ] is DENIED AS MOOT. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 10/27/2022). (fba)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER GRANTING COLLIN COUNTY DEFENDANTS OPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND REPLY DEADLINE. ECF No. #204 . IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT the Collin County Defendants' OPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND REPLY DEADLINE be and hereby is GRANTED and that, in the event the Court should deny Plaintiffs' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT ("PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE") [ECF No. #196 ], the deadline for the Collin County Defendants to file their reply to the Plaintiffs' OPPOSITION TO THE COLLIN COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF No. #201 ), is hereby extended to ten(10) calendar days after the Court has ruled on the PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 10/25/2022). (fba)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Hearing/Deadline Modification: Deadlines/hearings set. Responses due by 10/28/2022 per 206. (mmw)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 208 RESPONSE filed by Suzie Harvey, Mark Keough, James Metts, James Noack, Charlie Riley, Robert C. Walker re: #196 First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended and Supplemental Complaints (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Plake, Daniel)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 207 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Jose "Joe" A. Esparza, Ruth R. Hughs, Keith Ingram, John B. Scott re: #196 First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended and Supplemental Complaints (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Smith, Pierce)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Pending before the Court is Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order ("TRO") (doc. #203 ). Having carefully considered the motion, the Court concludes an expedited response is necessary. Based on the foregoing, it is ORDERED that Defendants' responses to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for TRO are due no later than Friday, October 28, 2022. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 10/24/2022) (chmb) Modified link on 10/25/2022 (mmw).
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 205 RESPONSE filed by Susan Fletcher, Darrell Hale, Chris Hill, Bruce Sherbet, Duncan Webb, Cheryl Williams re: #196 First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended and Supplemental Complaints (Davis, Robert)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Opposed MOTION to Extend Time file reply to response filed by Susan Fletcher, Darrell Hale, Chris Hill, Bruce Sherbet, Duncan Webb, Cheryl Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Attempted Certificate of Conference, #2 Proposed Order) (Davis, Robert) Modified on 10/27/2022 (sre).
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 203 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order barring Defendants use of computerized equipment to administer elections filed by Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Alana S Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Lester Rand, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Supporting Documentation, #2 Affidavit(s) In Support of TRO, #3 Declaration(s) In Support of TRO, #4 Proposed Order Granting TRO and Preliminary Injunction) (Buster, Jason)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 202 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Alana S Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Lester Rand, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf re: #194 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) MOA_MOU on Cybersecurity, #2 Proposed Order On Defendant Ruth Hughs Motion to Dismiss) (Buster, Jason)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 201 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Alana S Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Lester Rand, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf re: #187 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) MOA_MOU on Cybersecurity, #2 Proposed Order On Collin County Defendants Motion to Dismiss) (Buster, Jason)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER GRANTING DEFANDANTS' OPPOSED MOTIONS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME: The Court is of the opinion that the Motions [doc. #199 ] have merit and should be GRANTED. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that, in the event the Court should DENY Plaintiffs'Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Supplemental Complaint ("Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave") [ECF No. 196], the deadlines for Bexar, Harris and Travis County Defendants to file replies to Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss [ECF Nos. 185, 189 and 191], and the deadlines for Bexar and Travis County Defendants to file replies to Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Motions to Sever and Transfer Venue [ECF Nos. 186 and 190] are hereby extended to ten (10) calendar days after the Court has ruled on Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 10/14/2022). (fba)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #189 Response/Objection,, #190 Response/Objection,,, #186 Response/Objection,, #185 Response/Objection,, #191 Response/Objection,, filed by Andrew Steven Brown, Dana Debeauvoir, Sarah Eckhardt, Rebecca Guerrero (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nelson, Anthony)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 198 REPLY filed by Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Alana S Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Lester Rand, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf re: #179 Response/Objection, (Phillips, Alana)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 197 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tiffany Bingham on behalf of R. Jack Cagle, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Lina Hidalgo, Tom S. Ramsey, Clifford Tatum. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Bingham, Tiffany)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 196 First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended and Supplemental Complaints filed by Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Alana S Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Lester Rand, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amendment Second Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Amendment Supplement to Second Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Order On Motion For Leave to File) (Buster, Jason)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 195 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Ruth R. Hughs re #194 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint (Smith, Pierce)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint filed by Ruth R. Hughs (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Pierce Nicholas Vail Smith added to party Ruth R. Hughs(pty:dft) (Smith, Pierce)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Ruth R. Hughs re #83 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint (Smith, Pierce)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 192 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Alana S Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Lester Rand, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf re: #160 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) In opposition of motion, #2 Proposed Order To deny Montgomery County Defendants Motion to Dismiss) (Plaisance, Kristen)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 191 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Alana S Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Lester Rand, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf re: #159 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) containing information supporting Plaintiffs' response, #2 Proposed Order denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) (Buster, Jason)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 190 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Jennifer Mienke, Alana S Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Lester Rand, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf re: #158 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue and Brief in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) containing information supporting Plaintiffs' Response, #2 Proposed Order to deny Defendants' Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue) (Buster, Jason)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 189 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Alana S Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Lester Rand, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf re: #163 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order TO DENY HARRIS COUNTY DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS) (Phillips, Alana)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Susan Fletcher, Darrell Hale, Chris Hill, Bruce Sherbet, Duncan Webb, Cheryl Williams re #187 MOTION to Dismiss (Davis, Robert)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Susan Fletcher, Darrell Hale, Chris Hill, Bruce Sherbet, Duncan Webb, Cheryl Williams (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Davis, Robert)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 186 RESPONSE filed by Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Jennifer Mienke, Alana S Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Lester Rand, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf re: #157 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Gremont, Lindsey)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 185 RESPONSE filed by Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Jennifer Mienke, Alana S Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Lester Rand, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf re: #156 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) Halderman Declaration Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Gremont, Lindsey)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 184 AFFIDAVIT re #131 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Preserve Election Records CORRECTION TO AFFIDAVIT 7 by Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Alana S Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Lester Rand, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf. (Phillips, Alana)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 183 REPLY filed by Bill Gravell re: #135 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Heath, C)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 182 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Jennifer Mienke, Alana S Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Lester Rand, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf re: #135 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Supporting documents to Opposition, #2 Proposed Order To Deny Williamson County Motion to Dismiss) (Buster, Jason)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Order and Notice of Deficiency: The Court has independently determined that the document(s) below should be stricken and unfiled. Accordingly, it is ordered that the document(s) is/are stricken from the record of this case, and the Clerk is directed to note on the docket that the document(s) has/have been unfiled (ECF #169 ). Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Jennifer Mienke, Alana S Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Lester Rand, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf must address the following deficiency: The motion or response must include: certificate of conference or inability to confer. See LR 7. I (b) or LCrR 47. J(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 9/19/2022). (fba)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 180 Order and Notice of Deficiency: The Court has independently determined that the document(s) below should be stricken and unfiled. Accordingly, it is ordered that the document(s) is/are stricken from the record of this case, and the Clerk is directed to note on the docket that the document(s) has/have been unfiled (ECF #170 ). Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Jennifer Mienke, Alana S Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Lester Rand, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf must address the following deficiency: The motion or response must include: certificate of conference or inability to confer. See LR 7.1(b) or LCrR 47.1(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 9/19/2022). (fba)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 179 RESPONSE filed by R. Jack Cagle, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Lina Hidalgo, Tom S. Ramsey, Clifford Tatum re: #131 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Preserve Election Records (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Birring, Sameer)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Order Striking and Unfiling Documents: The Court has independently determined that the document(s): Notification to Court (docs #173 , #174 ) should be stricken and unfiled. Accordingly, it is ordered that the document(s) is/are stricken from the record of this case, and the Clerk is directed to note on the docket that the document(s) has/have been unfiled and is considered deficient in the area(s) noted: Pursuant to the Court's Order Overruling Plaintiffs' Objection to the Order Requiring Compliance with Local Rules and Regarding Plaintiffs' Notifications to Court [doc. 177], dated September 14, 2022, the Court is unfiling these Notifications to Court as they are unnecessary, a waste of judicial resources, and only cause further delays. The Court is well aware that Plaintiffs are proceeding pro se. In addition, the Court has established procedures in place and will issue a Scheduling Order based on these procedures. There are multiple pending motions, which if granted, could either result in the dismissal of all or a portion of the case or result in the transfer of portions of this case to other Courts. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 9/15/2022). (fba)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:177. Thu Sep 15 11:20:46 CDT 2022 (crt)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:178. Thu Sep 15 14:59:27 CDT 2022 (crt)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER OVERRULING PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTION TO THE ORDER REQUIRING COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES AND REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' NOTIFICATIONS TO COURT: Based on the foregoing, it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Objection to the Order Requiring Compliance with Local Rules [doc, 172] is OVERRULED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 9/14/2022). (fba)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 176 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Alana S Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Lester Rand, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf re: #147 Notice (Other) (Buster, Jason)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 175 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Alana S Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Lester Rand, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf re: #146 Notice (Other) (Buster, Jason)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 174 **UNFILED** NOTICE of Request for Scheduling Order filed by Jason Scott Buster (Buster, Jason) Modified on 9/15/2022 (fba).
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ***UNFILED** NOTICE of Pro Se Plaintiffs filed by Jason Scott Buster (Buster, Jason)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 172 OBJECTION to a Magistrate Judge Order #134 ORDER REQUIRING COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES: According to the Court's records, the following prose plaintiffs have not complied with this local rule: Kyle Strongin, Christine Koepke, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Karen Rene Towell, Alexandra Campo, Sonja Zielsdorf, Beverly Foley, Jose Christine Silvester, Robert James Brooks, Jr., Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jennifer Mienke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Lynn Davenport, and Lester Rand. Based on the foregoing, it is ORDERED that the above-listed Plaintiffs, no later than September 16, 2022, comply with these local rules or file a motion for exemption from the ECF requirements. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 8/29/2022). (fba) . (Phillips, Alana)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 171 REPLY filed by Devan Allen, Roy Charles Brooks, Gary Fickes, Heider Garcia, J.D. Johnson, B. Glen Whitley re: #131 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Preserve Election Records (Lund, Stephen)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ***STRICKEN & UNFILED PER #180 ORDER*** MOTION for Leave to File to file a surreply to ECF #139 filed by Alana S Phillips with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Leave for Plaintiffs to File A Surreply) (Phillips, Alana) Modified on 10/11/2022 (bdb).
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ***STRICKEN & UNFILED PER #181 ORDER*** MOTION for Leave to File Motion for leave to file a surreplyto ECF #137 filed by Kyle Strongin with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Leave for Plaintiffs to File A Surreply) (Strongin, Kyle) Modified on 10/11/2022 (bdb).
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 168 REPLY filed by Andy Eads, Dianne Edmondson, Ron Marchant, Bobbie J. Mitchell, Frank Phillips, Ryan Williams re: #133 Response/Objection (Shovlin, Matthew)
September 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 167 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Kyle Strongin re: #130 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimFirst MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Deny Motion to Dismiss - Hood County) (Strongin, Kyle)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 166 NOTICE of Failure to Comply with Local Rules 5.1 (e) & (f) filed by Alana S Phillips (Phillips, Alana)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 165 NOTICE of Motion of Substituted Service re: #154 MOTION authorize substituted service on defendant filed by Lindsey Gremont (Gremont, Lindsey)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 164 REPLY filed by Devan Allen, Roy Charles Brooks, Gary Fickes, Heider Garcia, J.D. Johnson, B. Glen Whitley re: #148 Response/Objection (Lund, Stephen)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by LINA HIDALGO, RODNEY ELLIS, ADRIAN GARCIA, TOM S. RAMSEY, R. JACK CAGLE, AND CLIFFORD TATUM with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Sameer Singh Birring added to party Clifford Tatum(pty:dft) (Birring, Sameer) Modified filers per PDF on 9/9/2022 (mmw).
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 162 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin Devane Griffin on behalf of Suzie Harvey, Mark Keough, James Metts, James Noack, Charlie Riley, Robert C. Walker. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Griffin, Benjamin)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 161 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Suzie Harvey, Mark Keough, James Metts, James Noack, Charlie Riley, Robert C. Walker re #160 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-3) (Griffin, Benjamin)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim() filed by Suzie Harvey, Mark Keough, James Metts, James Noack, Charlie Riley, Robert C. Walker (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Benjamin Devane Griffin added to party Suzie Harvey(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Devane Griffin added to party Mark Keough(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Devane Griffin added to party James Metts(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Devane Griffin added to party James Noack(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Devane Griffin added to party Charlie Riley(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Devane Griffin added to party Robert C. Walker(pty:dft) (Griffin, Benjamin)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Marialyn Barnard, Jacquelyn Callanen, Tommy Calvert, Rebeca Clay-Flores, Justin Rodriguez, Nelson Wolff with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Knight, Camille)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue and Brief in Support filed by Marialyn Barnard, Jacquelyn Callanen, Tommy Calvert, Rebeca Clay-Flores, Justin Rodriguez, Nelson Wolff with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Knight, Camille)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MOTION to Sever , MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division () filed by Andrew Steven Brown, Dana Debeauvoir, Sarah Eckhardt, Rebecca Guerrero with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Nelson, Anthony)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction () filed by Andrew Steven Brown, Dana Debeauvoir, Sarah Eckhardt, Rebecca Guerrero with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Anthony J Nelson added to party Andrew Steven Brown(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony J Nelson added to party Dana Debeauvoir(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony J Nelson added to party Rebecca Guerrero(pty:dft) (Nelson, Anthony)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 155 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alana S Phillips re #153 Response/Objection, to the Hood County Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Phillips, Alana)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MOTION authorize substituted service on defendant filed by Lindsey Gremont (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s) L Gremont in support of motion for substituted service of process, #2 Affidavit(s) Process server in support of motion for substituted service of process, #3 Exhibit(s) Receipt of payment to process server, #4 Proposed Order for Substituted Service of Process) (Gremont, Lindsey)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 153 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Jason Scott Buster re: #130 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimFirst MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order To Deny Hood County Defendants Motion to Dismiss) (Buster, Jason)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 152 REPLY filed by Ruben Becerra, Jennifer Doinoff, Debbie Ingalsbe, Mark Jones, Lon Shell, Walt Smith re: #79 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Shaunessy, Michael)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 151 REPLY filed by Cynthia Jaqua, Bobbie Koepp re: #78 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Shaunessy, Michael)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Defendants John Scott, Joe Esparza and Keith Ingram's REPLY Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss #83 MOTION to Dismiss . ***FILED USING EMERGENCY FILING EMAIL*** (cea)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 148 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Jason Scott Buster re: #122 MOTION to Dismiss (Buster, Jason)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Mail returned as undeliverable. #26 Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply, #24 Order on Motion for Leave to File, #25 Order on Motion for Leave to File, received back from Robert James Brooks Jr. as Return to Sender - No such number - Unable to Forward. Documents has been re-mailed 9/2/2022 to Robert James Brooks, Jr. 3414 Zebecca Creek Drive Austin, TX 78732. (fba)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE of Advisory to the Court re: #131 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Preserve Election Records filed by Ruben Becerra, Jennifer Doinoff, Debbie Ingalsbe, Mark Jones, Lon Shell, Walt Smith (Shaunessy, Michael)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE of Advisory to the Court re: #131 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Preserve Election Records filed by Cynthia Jaqua, Bobbie Koepp (Shaunessy, Michael)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 145 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Chris Hill ; served on 8/8/2022. (Buster, Jason)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 144 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Duncan Webb ; served on 8/8/2022. (Buster, Jason)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 143 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Darrell Hale ; served on 8/2/2022. (Buster, Jason)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 142 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Cheryl Williams ; served on 8/8/2022. (Buster, Jason)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 141 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Susan Fletcher ; served on 8/8/2022. (Buster, Jason)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 140 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bruce Sherbet ; served on 8/4/2022. (Buster, Jason)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:134. Tue Aug 30 13:20:17 CDT 2022 (crt)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Ruben Becerra, Jennifer Doinoff, Debbie Ingalsbe, Mark Jones, Lon Shell, Walt Smith re #81 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Shaunessy, Michael)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 138 REPLY filed by Ruben Becerra, Jennifer Doinoff, Debbie Ingalsbe, Mark Jones, Lon Shell, Walt Smith re: #81 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Shaunessy, Michael)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Cynthia Jacqua, Bobbie Koepp re #80 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Shaunessy, Michael)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 136 REPLY filed by Cynthia Jaqua, Bobbie Koepp re: #80 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Shaunessy, Michael)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ross Boles, Terry Cook, Valerie Covey, Christopher Davis, Bill Gravell, Cynthia Long (Heath, C)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER REQUIRING COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES: According to the Court's records, the following prose plaintiffs have not complied with this local rule: Kyle Strongin, Christine Koepke, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Karen Rene Towell, Alexandra Campo, Sonja Zielsdorf, Beverly Foley, Jose Christine Silvester, Robert James Brooks, Jr., Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jennifer Mienke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Lynn Davenport, and Lester Rand. Based on the foregoing, it is ORDERED that the above-listed Plaintiffs, no later than September 16, 2022, comply with these local rules or file a motion for exemption from the ECF requirements. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 8/29/2022). (fba)
August 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Alana S Phillips re: #115 MOTION to Dismiss (Phillips, Alana)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:132. Fri Aug 26 14:21:45 CDT 2022 (crt)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #128 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant Sarah Eckhardt's answer is due 9/8/2022. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 8/25/2022) (chmb)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Preserve Election Records filed by Jason Scott Buster with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Emergency Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit(s) Texas AG Opinion Public review of anonymous voted ballots, #3 Affidavit(s) Plaintiff Juan Carlos Arias PIR on election systems, #4 Affidavit(s) 3A: Part 1 of Plaintiff Jose Christine Silvester PIR on election systems, #5 Affidavit(s) 3B: Part 2 of Plaintiff Jose Christine Silvester PIR on election systems, #6 Affidavit(s) Plaintiffs PIR on election systems, #7 Affidavit(s) Plaintiffs PIR on election systems) (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/25/2022 (twd).
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction () filed by Michele Carew, Ron Massingill with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Mills, Matthew)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Alexander Mills on behalf of Michele Carew, Ron Massingill. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Mills, Matthew)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint (ECF No. #13 ) filed by Sarah Eckhardt (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Patrick Pope added to party Sarah Eckhardt(pty:dft) (Pope, Patrick) Modified link on 8/24/2022 (mmw).
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Jason Scott Buster re: #79 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order To Deny Hays County Defendants Motion to Dismiss CORRECTION OF DOCKET #1 #2 #4 ) (Buster, Jason)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alana S Phillips re #125 Response/Objection PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION IN RESPONSE TO TEXAS SECRETARY OF STATE DEFENDANTS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS (Phillips, Alana)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:89. Mon Aug 22 09:09:38 CDT 2022 (crt)
August 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Jason Scott Buster re: #83 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to deny TX SoS Defendants Motion to Dismiss) (Buster, Jason)
August 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Jason Scott Buster re: #79 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order to Deny Hays County Defendants Motion to Dismiss) (Buster, Jason)
August 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Jason Scott Buster re: #78 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order to Deny Comal County Defendants Motion to Dismiss) (Buster, Jason)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Devan Allen, Roy Charles Brooks, Gary Fickes, Heider Garcia, J.D. Johnson, B. Glen Whitley with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Brief in Support of Tarrant County Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) (Lund, Stephen)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:119,120. Thu Aug 18 12:55:15 CDT 2022 (crt)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 OBJECTION filed by Jason Scott Buster re: #88 Waiver of Service Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit(s) Affidavits of attempted Service of Summons, #3 Exhibit(s) Conferring with OAG regarding filing of Waiver of Service for Former State Official) (Buster, Jason)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #118 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant Susan Fletcher answer due 9/30/2022; Defendant Darrell Hale answer due 9/30/2022; Defendant Chris Hill answer due 9/30/2022; Defendant Bruce Sherbet answer due 9/30/2022; Defendant Duncan Webb answer due 9/30/2022; Defendant Cheryl Williams answer due 9/30/2022. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 8/17/2022) (chmb)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot #22 Motion for Alternative Service of Process on Defendant James Noack ("Noack") as Plaintiffs filed Proof of Service on Noack on 8/15/2022 [doc. 113]. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 8/17/2022) (chmb)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Susan Fletcher, Darrell Hale, Chris Hill, Bruce Sherbet, Duncan Webb, Cheryl Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Conference email, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Robert Jacob Davis added to party Susan Fletcher(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Jacob Davis added to party Darrell Hale(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Jacob Davis added to party Chris Hill(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Jacob Davis added to party Bruce Sherbet(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Jacob Davis added to party Duncan Webb(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Jacob Davis added to party Cheryl Williams(pty:dft) (Davis, Robert)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Jason Scott Buster re: #81 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Response in Opposition) (Buster, Jason)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Jason Scott Buster re: #80 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion in Opposition) (Buster, Jason)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andy Eads, Dianne Edmondson, Ron Marchant, Bobbie J. Mitchell, Frank Phillips, Ryan Williams with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Shovlin, Matthew)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Sarah Eckhardt ; served on 8/4/2022. (Buster, Jason)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to James Noack ; served on 8/11/2022. (Buster, Jason)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Isabel Longoria ; served on 8/4/2022. (Buster, Jason)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:107, 108, 109, 110. Mon Aug 15 08:06:54 CDT 2022 (crt)
August 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alana S Phillips re #14 Affidavit in support of complaint (Phillips, Alana)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #102 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lisa V. Cubriel. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 8/12/2022) (chmb)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #93 Montgomery County Defendants' Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Suzie Harvey answer or response due 9/8/2022; James Metts answer or response due 9/8/2022; James Noack answer or response due 9/8/2022; Charlie Riley answer or response due 9/8/2022; Robert C. Walker answer or response due 9/8/2022. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 8/12/2022) (chmb)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #92 Montgomery County Defendants Suzie Harvey, Charlie Riley, Robert C. Walker, James Noack, James Metts, and Judge Mark Heough's Opposed Motion Proceeed Without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 8/12/2022) (chmb)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #90 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert W. Piatt III. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 8/12/2022) (chmb)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Ryan Walker on 7/12/2022. (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/12/2022 (sre).
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Frank Phillips ; served on 7/12/2022. (Buster, Jason)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Dianne Edmondson ; served on 7/12/2022. (Buster, Jason)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Andy Eads ; served on 7/14/2022. (Buster, Jason)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Lisa Cubriel (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-13029408) filed by Marialyn Barnard, Jacquelyn Callanen, Tommy Calvert, Rebeca Clay-Flores, Justin Rodriguez, Nelson Wolff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Knight, Camille)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:89. Thu Aug 11 12:08:16 CDT 2022 (crt)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Ryan Williams on 07/12/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/11/2022 (sre).
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Ryan Williams on 07/12/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/11/2022 (sre). Modified on 8/11/2022 (sre).
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Ron Marchant on 07/12/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/11/2022 (sre).
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Frank Phillips on 07/12/2022 (Buster, Jason)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Dianne Edmondson on 07/12/2022 (Buster, Jason)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Bobbie J. Mitchell on 07/19/2022 (Buster, Jason)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Andy Eads on 07/14/2022 (Buster, Jason)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alana S Phillips re #19 Notice (Other) (Phillips, Alana)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 First Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or response to First Amended Complaint filed by Suzie Harvey, Mark Keough, James Metts, James Noack, Charlie Riley, Robert C. Walker with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Plake, Daniel)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION Proceed without local counsel filed by Suzie Harvey, Mark Keough, James Metts, James Noack, Charlie Riley, Robert C. Walker with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Daniel Dale Plake added to party Suzie Harvey(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Dale Plake added to party Mark Keough(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Dale Plake added to party James Metts(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Dale Plake added to party James Noack(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Dale Plake added to party Charlie Riley(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Dale Plake added to party Robert C. Walker(pty:dft) (Plake, Daniel)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alana S Phillips re #18 Notice (Other) (Phillips, Alana)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-13024821) filed by Marialyn Barnard, Jacquelyn Callanen, Tommy Calvert, Rebeca Clay-Flores, Justin Rodriguez, Nelson Wolff Attorney Robert W Piatt, III added to party Marialyn Barnard(pty:dft), Attorney Robert W Piatt, III added to party Jacquelyn Callanen(pty:dft), Attorney Robert W Piatt, III added to party Tommy Calvert(pty:dft), Attorney Robert W Piatt, III added to party Rebeca Clay-Flores(pty:dft), Attorney Robert W Piatt, III added to party Justin Rodriguez(pty:dft), Attorney Robert W Piatt, III added to party Nelson Wolff(pty:dft) (Piatt, Robert)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER: It is ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion of Leave to File Response to Comal County Defendants' Opposed Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue [doc. #85 ] is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion of Leave to File Response to Hays County Defendants' Opposed Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue #86 is DENIED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 8/10/2022) (fba)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed (Smith, Pierce)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 RESPONSE filed by Jason Scott Buster re: #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Buster, Jason)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Hays County Defendants Opposed #81 Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue filed by Jason Scott Buster (Buster, Jason) Modified link on 8/10/2022 (mmw).
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Comal County Defendants Opposed #80 Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue filed by Jason Scott Buster (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/10/2022 (mmw).
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Jose "Joe" A. Esparza, Keith Ingram, John B. Scott re #83 MOTION to Dismiss (Smith, Pierce)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jose "Joe" A. Esparza, Keith Ingram, John B. Scott (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Defs' MTD - Prop. Order) (Smith, Pierce)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Camille M Knight on behalf of Marialyn Barnard, Jacquelyn Callanen, Tommy Calvert, Rebeca Clay-Flores, Justin Rodriguez, Nelson Wolff. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Knight, Camille)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION to Sever , MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division () filed by Ruben Becerra, Jennifer Doinoff, Debbie Ingalsbe, Mark Jones, Lon Shell, Walt Smith with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Shaunessy, Michael)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION to Sever , MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division () filed by Cynthia Jacqua, Cynthia Jaqua, Bobbie Koepp with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Shaunessy, Michael)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ruben Becerra, Jennifer Doinoff, Debbie Ingalsbe, Mark Jones, Lon Shell, Walt Smith with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)Attorney Michael A Shaunessy added to party Ruben Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Michael A Shaunessy added to party Jennifer Doinoff(pty:dft), Attorney Michael A Shaunessy added to party Debbie Ingalsbe(pty:dft), Attorney Michael A Shaunessy added to party Mark Jones(pty:dft), Attorney Michael A Shaunessy added to party Lon Shell(pty:dft), Attorney Michael A Shaunessy added to party Walt Smith(pty:dft) (Shaunessy, Michael)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cynthia Jacqua, Cynthia Jaqua, Bobbie Koepp with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)Attorney Michael A Shaunessy added to party Cynthia Jacqua(pty:dft), Attorney Michael A Shaunessy added to party Cynthia Jaqua(pty:dft), Attorney Michael A Shaunessy added to party Bobbie Koepp(pty:dft) (Shaunessy, Michael)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alana S Phillips re #22 MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF PROCESS (Phillips, Alana)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER: It is ORDERED that the Williamson County Defendants' Opposed Motion to Waive Local Counsel Requirement [doc. #23 ] is GRANTED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 8/5/2022) (fba)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Dana Debeauvoir on 07/26/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Andrew Steven Brown on 07/26/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon James Metts on 07/20/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Robert Walker on 07/21/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Suzie Harvey on 07/21/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Charlie Riley on 07/22/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Cynthia Long on 07/19/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Christopher Davis on 07/19/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Bill Gravell on 07/19/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Valerie Covey on 07/19/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Ross Boles on 07/19/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Terry Cook on 07/19/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Devan Allen on 07/20/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Gary Fickes on 07/19/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Roy Charles Brooks on 07/19/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon J.D. Johnson on 07/19/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Glenn Whitley on 07/19/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Heider Garcia on 07/19/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Ron Massingill on 07/15/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Pat Deen on 07/11/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Larry Walden on 07/11/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Crickett Miller on 07/11/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon George Conley on 07/11/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Craig Peacock on 07/11/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Steve Dugan on 07/11/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Michele Carew on 07/12/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Walt Smith on 07/12/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Lon Shell on 07/12/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Mark Jones on 07/12/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/8/2022 (sre).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Debbie Ingalsbe on 07/12/2022 (Buster, Jason)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Ruben Becerra on 07/12/2022 (Buster, Jason)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Jennifer Doinoff on 07/12/2022 (Buster, Jason)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Rodney Ellis on 07/12/2022 (Buster, Jason)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Lina Hidalgo on 07/12/2022 (Buster, Jason)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Adrian Garcia on 07/12/2022 (Buster, Jason)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Tom Ramsey on 07/12/2022 (Buster, Jason)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Bobbie Koepp on 07/18/2022 (Buster, Jason)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Tommy Calvert on 07/18/2022 (Buster, Jason)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Rebeca Clay-Flores on 07/18/2022 (Buster, Jason)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Nelson Wolff on 07/18/2022 (Buster, Jason)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Marialyn Barnard on 07/18/2022 (Buster, Jason)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Justin Rodriguez on 07/18/2022 (Buster, Jason)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Jacquelyn Callanen on 07/18/2022 (Buster, Jason)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon R. Jack Cagle on 07/13/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/5/2022 (sre).
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Rebecca Guerrero on 07/13/2022 (Buster, Jason) Modified on 8/5/2022 (sre).
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Cynthia Jaqua on 07/13/2022 (Buster, Jason)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Keith Ingram on 07/13/2022 (Buster, Jason)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon Jose A. Esparza on 07/13/2022 (Buster, Jason)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Scott Buster Proof of Service re: Summons upon John B. Scott on 07/13/2022 (Buster, Jason)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:24,25,26. Thu Aug 4 12:31:22 CDT 2022 (crt)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #21 Movant-Defendants Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. It is ORDERED that Movant-Defendants Bexar County Elections Administrator Jacquelyn Callanen, Bexar County Judge Nelson Wolff, Bexar County Commissioners Rebeca Clay- Flores, Justin Rodriguez, Marialyn Barnard, and Tommy Calvert; Harris County Judge Lina Hidalgo, Harris County Commissioners Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Tom S. Ramsey, R. Jack Cagle and Fonner Harris County Elections Administrator Isabel Longoria; Hood County Judge Ron Massingill, Former Hood County Elections Administrator Michelle Carew, Tarrant County Elections Administrator Heider Garcia, Tarrant County Judge B. Glen Whitley, Commissioners Roy Charles Brooks, Devan Allen, Gary Fickes and J. D. Johnson; Travis County Clerk Rebecca Guerrero, Travis County Judge Andy Brown and former Travis County Clerk Dana DeBeauvoir; and Williamson County Judge Bill Gravell, Williamson County Elections Administrator Christopher Davis and Williamson County Commissioners Terry Cook, Cynthia Long, Valerie Covey, and Ross Boles shall file a response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint no later than September 8, 2022. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 8/3/2022) (fba)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S OPPOSED MOTION FOR WAIVER OF REQUIREMENT OF LOCAL COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 83.10: It is ORDERED that Defendants Brown, Guerrero and DeBeauvoirs Opposed Motion for Waiver of Requirement of Local Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 83.10 (doc. #17 ) is GRANTED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 8/3/2022). (fba)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S OPPOSED MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT LOCAL COUNSEL: It is ORDERED that the Harris County Defendants'Opposed Motion to proceed Without Local Counsel (Doc. #20 ) is GRANTED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 8/3/2022) (fba)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION waive the local counsel requirement of Local Rule LR 83.10(a) filed by Terry Cook, Valerie Covey, Christopher Davis, Bill Gravell, Cynthia Long (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Motion to Waive Local Counsel Requirement)Attorney C Robert Heath added to party Terry Cook(pty:dft), Attorney C Robert Heath added to party Valerie Covey(pty:dft), Attorney C Robert Heath added to party Christopher Davis(pty:dft), Attorney C Robert Heath added to party Bill Gravell(pty:dft), Attorney C Robert Heath added to party Cynthia Long(pty:dft) (Heath, C)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF PROCESS filed by Alana S Phillips (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF PROCESS) (Phillips, Alana)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #13 Amended Complaint,,,,,, filed by Andrew Steven Brown, Dana Debeauvoir, Rebecca Guerrero (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pope, Patrick)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Motion of Waiver of Requirement of Local Counsel filed by R. Jack Cagle, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Lina Hidalgo, Isabel Longoria, Tom S. Ramsey (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Sameer Singh Birring added to party R. Jack Cagle(pty:dft), Attorney Sameer Singh Birring added to party Rodney Ellis(pty:dft), Attorney Sameer Singh Birring added to party Adrian Garcia(pty:dft), Attorney Sameer Singh Birring added to party Lina Hidalgo(pty:dft), Attorney Sameer Singh Birring added to party Isabel Longoria(pty:dft), Attorney Sameer Singh Birring added to party Tom S. Ramsey(pty:dft) (Birring, Sameer)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Communications from Defendant(s) Counsel Who Have Not Designated A Local Counsel In This Court filed by Jason Scott Buster (Buster, Jason)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Removal of Erroneous Party filed by Jason Scott Buster (Buster, Jason)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Waiver of Requirement of Local Counsel filed by Andrew Steven Brown, Dana Debeauvoir, Rebecca Guerrero (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Patrick Pope added to party Andrew Steven Brown(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick Pope added to party Dana Debeauvoir(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick Pope added to party Rebecca Guerrero(pty:dft) (Pope, Patrick)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Devan Allen, Marialyn Barnard, Ruben Becerra, Ross Boles, Roy Charles Brooks, Andrew Steven Brown, R. Jack Cagle, Jacquelyn Callanen, Tommy Calvert, Michele Carew, Rebeca Clay-Flores, George Conley, Terry Cook, Valerie Covey, Christopher Davis, Dana Debeauvoir, Pat Deen, Jennifer Doinoff, Steve Dugan, Andy Eads, Sarah Eckhardt, Dianne Edmondson, Rodney Ellis, Jose "Joe" A. Esparza, Gary Fickes, Susan Fletcher, Adrian Garcia, Heider Garcia, Bill Gravell, Rebecca Guerrero, Darrell Hale, Suzie Harvey, Lina Hidalgo, Chris Hill, Ruth R. Hughs, Debbie Ingalsbe, Keith Ingram, Cynthia Jaqua, J.D. Johnson, Mark Jones, Mark Keough, Bobbie Koepp, Cynthia Long, Isabel Longoria, Ron Marchant, Ron Massingill, James Metts, Crickett Miller, Bobbie J. Mitchell, James Noack, Craig Peacock, Frank Phillips, Tom S. Ramsey, Charlie Riley, Justin Rodriguez, John B. Scott, Secretary of State of Texas, Lon Shell, Bruce Sherbet, Walt Smith, Larry Walden, Robert C. Walker, Duncan Webb, B. Glen Whitley, Cheryl Williams, Ryan Williams, Nelson Wolff. (sre)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by George Conley, Pat Deen, Steve Dugan, Crickett Miller, Craig Peacock, Larry Walden with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Ken Hanson added to party George Conley(pty:dft), Attorney Ken Hanson added to party Pat Deen(pty:dft), Attorney Ken Hanson added to party Steve Dugan(pty:dft), Attorney Ken Hanson added to party Crickett Miller(pty:dft), Attorney Ken Hanson added to party Craig Peacock(pty:dft), Attorney Ken Hanson added to party Larry Walden(pty:dft) (Hanson, Ken)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint,,,, #13 Amended Complaint,,,,,, in support of complaint by Alana S Phillips. (Phillips, Alana)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT Strongin et al v. Scott et al against Devan Allen, Marialyn Barnard, Ruben Becerra, Ross Boles, Roy Charles Brooks, Andrew Steven Brown, R. Jack Cagle, Jacquelyn Callanen, Tommy Calvert, Michele Carew, Rebeca Clay-Flores, R. Jack Cole, George Conley, Terry Cook, Valerie Covey, Christopher Davis, Dana Debeauvoir, Pat Deen, Jennifer Doinoff, Steve Dugan, Andy Eads, Dianne Edmondson, Rodney Ellis, Jose "Joe" A. Esparza, Gary Fickes, J.D. Fickes, Adrian Garcia, Heider Garcia, Bill Gravell, Rebecca Guerrero, Suzie Harvey, Lina Hidalgo, Ruth R. Hughs, Debbie Ingalsbe, Keith Ingram, Cynthia Jacqua, J.D. Johnson, Mark Jones, Bobbie Koepp, Cynthia Long, Isabel Longoria, Ron Marchant, Ron Massingill, James Metts, Crickett Miller, Bobbie J. Mitchell, James Noack, Craig Peacock, Frank Phillips, Tom S. Ramsey, Charlie Riley, Justin Rodriguez, John B. Scott, Secretary of State of Texas, Lon Shell, Walt Smith, Larry Walden, Robert C. Walker, Glenn Whitley, Ryan Williams, Nelson Wolff, Warren Kenneth Paxton, Jr, Susan Fletcher, Darrell Hale, Chris Hill, Cheryl Williams, Duncan Webb, Bruce Sherbet, Mark Keough, Sarah Eckhardt, Lester Rand filed by Jason Scott Buster. Clerk to issue summons(es). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Buster, Jason)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Summons Reissued as to Glenn Whitley. (jgg)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Jason Scott Buster. (Buster, Jason)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Suzie Harvey, J.D. Johnson, Charlie Riley, Robert C. Walker, Glenn Whitley. (mmw)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Devan Allen, Ross Boles, Roy Charles Brooks, Andrew Steven Brown, R. Jack Cagle, George Conley, Terry Cook, Valerie Covey, Christopher Davis, Dana Debeauvoir, Steve Dugan, Gary Fickes, Heider Garcia, Bill Gravell, Rebecca Guerrero, Cynthia Long, James Metts, James Noack, Craig Peacock, Larry Walden. (mmw)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Tom S. Ramsey. (mmw)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Marialyn Barnard, Ruben Becerra, Jason Scott Buster, Jacquelyn Callanen, Tommy Calvert, Michele Carew, James L. Clark, Rebeca Clay-Flores, Amber Cloy, Pat Deen, Jennifer Doinoff, Andy Eads, Dianne Edmondson, Rodney Ellis, Jose "Joe" A. Esparza, Adrian Garcia, Lina Hidalgo, Ruth R. Hughs, Debbie Ingalsbe, Keith Ingram, Cynthia Jacqua, Mark Jones, Bobbie Koepp, Isabel Longoria, Ron Massingill, Crickett Miller, Bobbie J. Mitchell, Frank Phillips, Tom S. Ramsey, Justin Rodriguez, John B. Scott, Walt Smith, Ryan Williams, Nelson Wolff. (mmw) (summons not issued to non-parties) Modified on 7/7/2022 (mmw).
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5, 6. Thu Jul 7 08:33:20 CDT 2022 (crt)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (mmw)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Cureton preliminarily assigned. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (mmw)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Untitled Document filed by Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer B. Edwards, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Jennifer Mienke, Alana S. Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf (mmw)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue summons filed by Juan Carlos Arias, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jason Scott Buster, Alexandra Campo, James L. Clark, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, Tommie Dickinson, Jennifer B. Edwards, Amanda Eubanks, Travis Wayne Eubanks, Beverly Foley, Lindsey Gremont, Christine Koepke, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Jennifer Mienke, Alana S. Phillips, Kristen Plaisance, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Jose Christine Silvester, Kyle Strongin, Karen Rene Towell, Jennifer Williams, Sonja Zielsdorf. (mmw)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (mmw)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jennifer Mienke, Karen Rene Towell, Alana S. Phillips, Lindsey Gremont, Kyle Strongin, Jennifer B. Edwards, Robert James Brooks, Jr, Jose Christine Silvester, Amber Cloy, Lynn Davenport, James L. Clark, Sonja Zielsdorf, Jennifer Williams, Juan Carlos Arias, Sheron Jennifer Lipper, Kristen Plaisance, Christine Koepke, Alexandra Campo, Beverly Foley, Tommie Dickinson, Jason Scott Buster, Amanda Eubanks, Aubrey Brandon Rhymes, Travis Wayne Eubanks. (Filing fee $402.00; Receipt number FW038303) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mmw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2022: #1 Cover Sheet) (mmw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strongin et al v. Scott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Strongin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Gremont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Koepke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Wayne Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Plaisance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Rene Towell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Scott Buster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Campo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonja Zielsdorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Carlos Arias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Christine Silvester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommie Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert James Brooks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alana S. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer B. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aubrey Brandon Rhymes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Cloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Mienke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheron Jennifer Lipper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Arias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alana S Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Lester Rand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Beasley Edwards, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester Rand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John B. Scott
Represented By: Pierce Nicholas Vail Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose "Joe" A. Esparza
Represented By: Pierce Nicholas Vail Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth R. Hughs
Represented By: Pierce Nicholas Vail Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Ingram
Represented By: Pierce Nicholas Vail Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacquelyn Callanen
Represented By: Camille M Knight
Represented By: Lisa V Cubriel
Represented By: Robert W Piatt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson Wolff
Represented By: Camille M Knight
Represented By: Lisa V Cubriel
Represented By: Robert W Piatt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebeca Clay-Flores
Represented By: Camille M Knight
Represented By: Lisa V Cubriel
Represented By: Robert W Piatt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Rodriguez
Represented By: Camille M Knight
Represented By: Lisa V Cubriel
Represented By: Robert W Piatt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marialyn Barnard
Represented By: Camille M Knight
Represented By: Lisa V Cubriel
Represented By: Robert W Piatt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Calvert
Represented By: Camille M Knight
Represented By: Lisa V Cubriel
Represented By: Robert W Piatt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobbie Koepp
Represented By: Austin Lewis Jones
Represented By: Eric Alexander Johnston
Represented By: Michael A Shaunessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Jacqua
Represented By: Michael A Shaunessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Phillips
Represented By: Matthew Shovlin
Represented By: John Feldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Eads
Represented By: Matthew Shovlin
Represented By: John Feldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Williams
Represented By: Matthew Shovlin
Represented By: John Feldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Marchant
Represented By: Matthew Shovlin
Represented By: John Feldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobbie J. Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew Shovlin
Represented By: John Feldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dianne Edmondson
Represented By: Matthew Shovlin
Represented By: John Feldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lina Hidalgo
Represented By: Sameer Singh Birring
Represented By: Tiffany Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Ellis
Represented By: Sameer Singh Birring
Represented By: Tiffany Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Garcia
Represented By: Sameer Singh Birring
Represented By: Tiffany Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom S. Ramsey
Represented By: Sameer Singh Birring
Represented By: Tiffany Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Jack Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isabel Longoria
Represented By: Sameer Singh Birring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Doinoff
Represented By: Austin Lewis Jones
Represented By: Eric Alexander Johnston
Represented By: Michael A Shaunessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Becerra
Represented By: Austin Lewis Jones
Represented By: Eric Alexander Johnston
Represented By: Michael A Shaunessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Ingalsbe
Represented By: Austin Lewis Jones
Represented By: Eric Alexander Johnston
Represented By: Michael A Shaunessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Jones
Represented By: Austin Lewis Jones
Represented By: Eric Alexander Johnston
Represented By: Michael A Shaunessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lon Shell
Represented By: Austin Lewis Jones
Represented By: Eric Alexander Johnston
Represented By: Michael A Shaunessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walt Smith
Represented By: Austin Lewis Jones
Represented By: Eric Alexander Johnston
Represented By: Michael A Shaunessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Massingill
Represented By: Matthew Alexander Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Carew
Represented By: Matthew Alexander Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Deen
Represented By: Ken Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crickett Miller
Represented By: Ken Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Conley
Represented By: Ken Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Peacock
Represented By: Ken Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Walden
Represented By: Ken Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Dugan
Represented By: Ken Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heider Garcia
Represented By: Stephen Andrew Lund
Represented By: Ann Lusas Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Jack Cagle
Represented By: Sameer Singh Birring
Represented By: Tiffany Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Charles Brooks
Represented By: Stephen Andrew Lund
Represented By: Ann Lusas Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devan Allen
Represented By: Stephen Andrew Lund
Represented By: Ann Lusas Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Fickes
Represented By: Stephen Andrew Lund
Represented By: Ann Lusas Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.D. Fickes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Steven Brown
Represented By: Patrick Pope
Represented By: Anthony J Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Debeauvoir
Represented By: Patrick Pope
Represented By: Anthony J Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Guerrero
Represented By: Patrick Pope
Represented By: Anthony J Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Gravell
Represented By: C Robert Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Davis
Represented By: C Robert Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Cook
Represented By: C Robert Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Long
Represented By: C Robert Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Covey
Represented By: C Robert Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Boles
Represented By: C Robert Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzie Harvey
Represented By: Daniel Dale Plake
Represented By: Benjamin Devane Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C. Walker
Represented By: Daniel Dale Plake
Represented By: Benjamin Devane Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Riley
Represented By: Daniel Dale Plake
Represented By: Benjamin Devane Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Noack
Represented By: Daniel Dale Plake
Represented By: Benjamin Devane Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Metts
Represented By: Daniel Dale Plake
Represented By: Benjamin Devane Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.D. Johnson
Represented By: Stephen Andrew Lund
Represented By: Ann Lusas Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Whitley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Fletcher
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Hale
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Hill
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Williams
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duncan Webb
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Sherbet
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Keough
Represented By: Daniel Dale Plake
Represented By: Benjamin Devane Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Eckhardt
Represented By: Patrick Pope
Represented By: Anthony J Nelson
Represented By: Leslie W Dippel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Glen Whitley
Represented By: Stephen Andrew Lund
Represented By: Ann Lusas Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Jaqua
Represented By: Austin Lewis Jones
Represented By: Eric Alexander Johnston
Represented By: Michael A Shaunessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Tatum
Represented By: Sameer Singh Birring
Represented By: Tiffany Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Honorable Warren Kenneth Paxton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?