Triple S Sports and Entertainment Group Limited v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Triple S Sports and Entertainment Group Limited
Petitioner: United States of America
Garnishee: Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America NA
Case Number: 4:2022cv00943
Filed: October 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot #20 Motion to Amend/Correct. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 12/5/2022) (chmb)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Before the Court are Plaintiffs Motion for Remand for Lack of Federal Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, Motion for Judgment on Garnishment #6 . Plaintiffs Motion (and Amended Motion) for Leave of Court to Amend its Notice of Removal #20 , #21 . The Court hereby REFERS the motions and all related responses, replies, briefs in support, and appendices, etc., to United States Magistrate Judge Cureton for hearing, if necessary, and determination or recommendation to this Court. See 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1). Further pleadings concerning this motion shall be filed with a transmittal letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Cureton so copies may be sent directly to him without delay. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 11/29/2022) (jgg)
November 22, 2022 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Triple S Sports and Entertainment Group Limited re: #20 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, , #21 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #20 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Order for Remand in Cause 4:22-CV-0861, #2 Proposed Order Deny Motion for Leave to Amend) (Hill, Donald)
November 21, 2022 Filing 21 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #20 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, filed by Bank of America NA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Exhibit(s)) (Moeller, Evan)
November 20, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, filed by Bank of America NA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Amended Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E, #7 Exhibit(s) F, #8 Exhibit(s) G, #9 Exhibit(s) H, #10 Exhibit(s) I, #11 Exhibit(s) J, #12 Exhibit(s) K, #13 Exhibit(s) L, #14 Exhibit(s) M) (Moeller, Evan)
November 17, 2022 Filing 19 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Triple S Sports and Entertainment Group Limited re: #8 MOTION to Intervene (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 - Order for Remand in 4:22-CV-861-P, #2 Proposed Order Order Denying Motion to Intervene) (Hill, Donald)
November 7, 2022 Filing 18 Appendix in Support filed by Bank of America NA re #17 Response/Objection (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Moeller, Evan)
November 7, 2022 Filing 17 RESPONSE filed by Bank of America NA re: #6 MOTION to Remand or, Alternatively, MOTION for Judgment (Moeller, Evan)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Before the Court is Defendants Unopposed Motion for Leave of Court for Relief From Local Rule 83.10 #15 . Counsel for Defendants are admitted to the Northern District of Texas but are located in Houston, Texas. Defendants ask for leave under Local Rule 83.10 to proceed without local counsel. Having reviewed the motion and finding good cause, the Court GRANTS the motion and ORDERS that Defendants counsel abide by all local rules of this Court, including the standards of litigation conduct set forth in Dondi Properties Corporation v. Commerce Savings & Loan Association, 121 F.R.D. 284 (N.D. Tex. 1988) (per curiam). It is further ORDERED that if proceeding without local counsel disrupts this litigation or otherwise results in a failure to comply with the rules of this Court, Defendants will be required to obtain local counsel immediately. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 11/4/2022) (jgg)
November 3, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION from Local Rule 83.10 filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America NA (Moeller, Evan)
October 31, 2022 Deadline Modification: Deadlines set. Responses due by 11/7/2022. Replies due by 11/14/2022. (jgg)
October 31, 2022 Filing 14 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Bank of America Corporation. First Amended Answer. (Moeller, Evan)
October 31, 2022 Filing 13 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Bank of America NA. First Amended Answer. (Moeller, Evan)
October 31, 2022 Filing 12 Supplemental Document by Bank of America NA as to #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Moeller, Evan)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiffs Motion for Remand for Lack of Federal Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, Motion for Judgment on Garnishment #6 , filed October 20, 2022. Plaintiff asserts this Courts lack of subject matter jurisdiction. To expedite resolution of the jurisdictional question the motion raises, the Court ORDERS Defendants to respond to the motion by November 7, 2022. Plaintiff may file a reply by November 14, 2022. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/31/2022) (jgg)
October 28, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Garnishee, Triple S Entertainment Group Limited's Opposition re: #8 MOTION to Intervene , #9 Order, filed by Triple S Sports and Entertainment Group Limited (Hill, Donald)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Before the Court is would-be intervenor United States of Americas Motion to Intervene #8 , filed October 27, 2022. The Governments certificate of conference notes that. Plaintiff has not stated whether it is opposed or unopposed to the Governments intervention. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a brief notice on the docket in this case stating its position with respect to the motion no later than 12:00 PM on October 31, 2022. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/28/2022) (jgg)
October 27, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Intervene filed by USA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Seizure Warrant, #2 Exhibit(s) Seizure Warrant, #3 Exhibit(s) Seizure Warrant, #4 Exhibit(s) Seizure Warrant, #5 Proposed Notice of Claim)Attorney John J de la Garza-DOJ, III added to party USA(pty:intv) (de la Garza-DOJ, John)
October 20, 2022 Filing 7 Appendix in Support filed by Triple S Sports and Entertainment Group Limited re #6 MOTION to Remand or, Alternatively, MOTION for Judgment (Hill, Donald)
October 20, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand or, Alternatively, MOTION for Judgment filed by Triple S Sports and Entertainment Group Limited (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order) (Hill, Donald)
October 20, 2022 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (jgg)
October 20, 2022 Filing 4 Supplemental Document by Bank of America Corporation . (Moeller, Evan)
October 20, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of America Corporation. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Moeller, Evan)
October 20, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of America, N.A.. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Moeller, Evan)
October 20, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATXNDC-13239116) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Exhibit(s)) (Moeller, Evan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Triple S Sports and Entertainment Group Limited v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triple S Sports and Entertainment Group Limited
Represented By: Donald E Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Evan Alexander Moeller
Represented By: Joshua Abraham Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Evan Alexander Moeller
Represented By: Joshua Abraham Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Evan Alexander Moeller
Represented By: Joshua Abraham Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: John J de la Garza-DOJ, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?