Nuziard et al v. Minority Business Development Agency et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Nuziard, Matthew Piper and Christian Bruckner
Defendant: Minority Business Development Agency, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Gina M Raimondo and Donald R Cravins, Jr
Case Number: 4:2023cv00278
Filed: March 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Pittman: Motion Hearing held on 5/12/2023 re: #14 MOTION for Injunction (Preliminary). Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Cara Tolliver, Jason Nash; Defense - Andrew Braniff, Vendarryl Jenkins. (Court Reporter: Monica Guzman) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 1:24. (chmb)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 ...Before the Court is Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline. ECF No. #23 . Having considered the Motion, relevant docket entries, and applicable case law, the Court hereby GRANTS the Motion. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 5/9/2023) (wxc)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY filed by Christian Bruckner, Jeffrey Nuziard, Matthew Piper re: #14 MOTION for Injunction (Preliminary) (Tolliver, Cara)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline filed by Joseph R Biden, Jr, Donald R Cravins, Jr, Minority Business Development Agency, Gina M Raimondo (Jenkins, Vendarryl)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER...Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. #14 ). The Court ORDERS that a hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction will be held at 2:00 p.m. on Friday, May 12, 2023, in the Fourth Floor Courtroom of the Eldon B. Mahon United States Courthouse, located at 501 W. 10th Street, Fort Worth, Texas. Counsel for all parties are ORDERED to attend. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 5/3/2023) (wxc)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER...Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. #14 ). The Court ORDERS that a hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction will be held at 2:00 p.m. on Thursday, May 11, 2023, in the Fourth Floor Courtroom of the Eldon B. Mahon United States Courthouse, located at 501 W. 10th Street, Fort Worth, Texas. Counsel for all parties are ORDERED to attend. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 5/3/2023) (wxc)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE filed by Joseph R Biden, Jr, Donald R Cravins, Jr, Minority Business Development Agency, Gina M Raimondo re: #14 MOTION for Injunction (Preliminary) (Jenkins, Vendarryl)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Woolley on behalf of Joseph R Biden, Jr, Donald R Cravins, Jr, Minority Business Development Agency, Gina M Raimondo. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Woolley, Christopher)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vendarryl Jenkins on behalf of Joseph R Biden, Jr, Donald R Cravins, Jr, Minority Business Development Agency, Gina M Raimondo. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Jenkins, Vendarryl)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christian Bruckner, Jeffrey Nuziard, Matthew Piper (Tolliver, Cara)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Appendix in Support filed by Christian Bruckner, Jeffrey Nuziard, Matthew Piper re #15 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Tolliver, Cara)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Christian Bruckner, Jeffrey Nuziard, Matthew Piper re #14 MOTION for Injunction (Preliminary) (Tolliver, Cara)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Injunction (Preliminary) filed by Christian Bruckner, Jeffrey Nuziard, Matthew Piper (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tolliver, Cara)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christian Bruckner, Jeffrey Nuziard, Matthew Piper Declaration of Service on Attorney General of the United States (Lennington, Daniel)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to All Defendants. (Lennington, Daniel)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cara M. Tolliver. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 3/23/2023) (chmb)(tjp)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard M. Esenberg. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 3/23/2023) (chmb)(tjp)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel P. Lennington. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 3/23/2023) (chmb)(tjp)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13604441) filed by Christian Bruckner, Jeffrey Nuziard, Matthew Piper (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Cara Tolliver added to party Christian Bruckner(pty:pla), Attorney Cara Tolliver added to party Jeffrey Nuziard(pty:pla), Attorney Cara Tolliver added to party Matthew Piper(pty:pla) (Tolliver, Cara)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13603910) filed by Christian Bruckner, Jeffrey Nuziard, Matthew Piper (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Richard M Esenberg added to party Christian Bruckner(pty:pla), Attorney Richard M Esenberg added to party Jeffrey Nuziard(pty:pla), Attorney Richard M Esenberg added to party Matthew Piper(pty:pla) (Esenberg, Richard)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13603706) filed by Christian Bruckner, Jeffrey Nuziard, Matthew Piper (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Daniel Lennington added to party Christian Bruckner(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Lennington added to party Jeffrey Nuziard(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Lennington added to party Matthew Piper(pty:pla) (Lennington, Daniel)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons issued as to Joseph R Biden, Jr, Donald R Cravins, Jr, Minority Business Development Agency, Gina M Raimondo, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (wxc)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Christian Bruckner, Jeffrey Nuziard, Matthew Piper. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s), #3 Additional Page(s)) (Nash, Jason)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Christian Bruckner, Jeffrey Nuziard, Matthew Piper. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Nash, Jason)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joseph R Biden, Jr, Donald R Cravins, Jr, Minority Business Development Agency, Gina M Raimondo filed by Jeffrey Nuziard, Matthew Piper, Christian Bruckner. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-13601836) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Nash, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nuziard et al v. Minority Business Development Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Nuziard
Represented By: Jason Chad Nash
Represented By: Cara Tolliver
Represented By: Richard M Esenberg
Represented By: Daniel Lennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Piper
Represented By: Jason Chad Nash
Represented By: Cara Tolliver
Represented By: Daniel Lennington
Represented By: Richard M Esenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Bruckner
Represented By: Jason Chad Nash
Represented By: Daniel Lennington
Represented By: Richard M Esenberg
Represented By: Cara Tolliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minority Business Development Agency
Represented By: Vendarryl Jenkins
Represented By: Christopher Woolley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R Biden, Jr
Represented By: Christopher Woolley
Represented By: Vendarryl Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina M Raimondo
Represented By: Vendarryl Jenkins
Represented By: Christopher Woolley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald R Cravins, Jr
Represented By: Vendarryl Jenkins
Represented By: Christopher Woolley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?