Knife Rights, Inc. et al v. Garland et al
Plaintiff: Knife Rights, Inc., Russell Arnold, Jeffrey Folloder, RGA Auction Services LLC doing business as Firearm Solutions and MOD Specialties
Defendant: Merrick B. Garland and United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 4:2023cv00547
Filed: June 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ENTERING AGREED BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Motion to Enter Proposed Briefing Schedule (ECF No. #14 ), filed July 27, 2023, the Court hereby GRANTS the motion. The parties are ORDERED to comply with the following schedule: On or before September 22, 2023, Defendants will file their motion to dismiss; On or before October 13, 2023, Plaintiffs will file their response; On or before November 3, 2023, Defendants will file their reply. Additionally, Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to September 22, 2023. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/25/2023) (fba)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION (Joint) to Enter Proposed Briefing Schedule filed by Merrick B. Garland, United States Department of Justice with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Drezner, Michael)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Drezner on behalf of Merrick B. Garland, United States Department of Justice. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Drezner, Michael)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of JOHN W. DILLON. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/21/2023) (chmb)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney John W. Dillon (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13825371) filed by Knife Rights, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (Cooper, R)
June 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Department of Justice ; served on 6/9/2023. (Cooper, R)
June 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Department of Justice ; served on 6/2/2023. (Cooper, R)
June 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Merrick B. Garland ; served on 6/9/2023. (Cooper, R)
June 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Merrick B. Garland ; served on 6/2/2023. (Cooper, R)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons issued as to Merrick B. Garland, United States Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (wxc)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Request for Clerk to issue Summons In A Civil Action filed by Russell Arnold, Jeffrey Folloder, Knife Rights, Inc., MOD Specialties, RGA Auction Services LLC d.b.a Firearm Solutions. (Cooper, R)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons In A Civil Action filed by Russell Arnold, Jeffrey Folloder, Knife Rights, Inc., MOD Specialties, RGA Auction Services LLC d.b.a Firearm Solutions. (Cooper, R)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Russell Arnold, Jeffrey Folloder, Knife Rights, Inc., MOD Specialties, RGA Auction Services LLC d.b.a Firearm Solutions. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Cooper, R)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Knife Rights, Inc., Russell Arnold, Jeffrey Folloder, RGA Auction Services LLC d.b.a Firearm Solutions, MOD Specialties. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-13781851) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Cooper, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knife Rights, Inc. et al v. Garland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Knife Rights, Inc.
Represented By: R Brent Cooper
Represented By: Benjamin David Passey
Represented By: John W Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Arnold
Represented By: R Brent Cooper
Represented By: Benjamin David Passey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Folloder
Represented By: R Brent Cooper
Represented By: Benjamin David Passey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RGA Auction Services LLC doing business as Firearm Solutions
Represented By: R Brent Cooper
Represented By: Benjamin David Passey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOD Specialties
Represented By: R Brent Cooper
Represented By: Benjamin David Passey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick B. Garland
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?