Kemp v. Regions Bank d/b/a Regions Mortgage et al
Plaintiff: Reginalea Kemp
Defendant: Regions Bank doing business as Regions Mortgage and Larry Darnell Kemp
Not Classified By Court: ADR Provider
Case Number: 4:2023cv00841
Filed: August 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Appendix in Support filed by Regions Bank re #27 Brief/Memorandum in Support #26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Cronenwett, Mark) Modified link on 10/5/2023 (mmw).
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Regions Bank re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, (Cronenwett, Mark)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, filed by Regions Bank (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cronenwett, Mark)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Defendant Regions Bank's Designation of Expert Witnesses, filed by Regions Bank (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Cronenwett, Mark)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant Regions Bank's Unopposed #22 Motion to Extend Time to Respond. The Court GRANTS the Motion. The Court ORDERS that the above-mentioned Defendant shall have up to and including October 6, 2023 to respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 10/2/2023) (mmw)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to file her Second Amended Complaint (ECF No. 18-1) as a separate ECF filing on or before October 6, 2023. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 10/2/2023) (nsb)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (), MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #19 Additional Attachments to Main Document, #20 Additional Attachments to Main Document, #18 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Regions Bank with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cronenwett, Mark)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Unopposed #18 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Having considered the Motion and applicable docket entries, the Court GRANTS the Motion. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 9/18/2023) (mmw)
September 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #18 Motion for Leave to File, #19 Additional Attachments to Main Document by Plaintiff Reginalea Kemp. (Brooks, Jerry)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #18 Motion for Leave to File by Plaintiff Reginalea Kemp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Brooks, Jerry)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Reginalea Kemp (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amendment) (Brooks, Jerry)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures filed by Reginalea Kemp (Brooks, Jerry)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures, filed by Regions Bank (Cronenwett, Mark)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jerry C. Brooks. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 8/28/2023) (mmw)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Appendix in Support filed by Regions Bank in support of #13 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Cronenwett, Mark) Modified link on 8/28/2023 (mmw).
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Regions Bank re #12 MOTION to Dismiss (Cronenwett, Mark)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Regions Bank with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cronenwett, Mark)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning April 29, 2024. Joinder of Parties due by 10/23/2023., Amended Pleadings due by 10/23/2023. Deadline for mediation is on or before 11/1/2023. Discovery due by 12/1/2023. Motions due by 1/28/2024. Pretrial Order due by 4/4/2024. The court appoints David R Seidler as mediator. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 8/24/2023) (mmw)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT - Joint CMP Status Report, filed by Regions Bank. (Cronenwett, Mark)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #6 Amended Complaint,, by Plaintiff Reginalea Kemp. (Brooks, Jerry)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13969921) filed by Reginalea Kemp (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (Brooks, Jerry)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Additional Attachments to #6 AMENDED COMPLAINT Exhibits 4-5 against All Defendants filed by Reginalea Kemp. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Brooks, Jerry) Modified text per PDF on 8/21/2023 (mmw).
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint against All Defendants filed by Reginalea Kemp. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Exhibits 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Exhibit 2) (Brooks, Jerry)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court ORDERS that by August 18, 2023, Plaintiff(s) file an amended complaint and within 14 days after Plaintiff(s) file an amended complaint, but no later than August 25, 2023, Defendant(s) file an answer or other response to the amended complaint. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 8/11/2023) (bdb)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Lead counsel for each party or designee attorney with appropriate authority and any unrepresented party must confer in an in-person, face-to-face conference as soon as practicable. As a result of the Scheduling Conference, counsel must prepare and submit a Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order by August 30, 2023. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 8/11/2023) (bdb)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (mmw)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Regions Bank d/b/a Regions Mortgage. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Cronenwett, Mark)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Regions Bank d/b/a Regions Mortgage. (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATXNDC-13950294) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Cronenwett, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kemp v. Regions Bank d/b/a Regions Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginalea Kemp
Represented By: Jerry Cole Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Bank doing business as Regions Mortgage
Represented By: Mark D Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Darnell Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ADR Provider
Represented By: David R Seidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?