Antero Resources Corporation v. Kawcak et al
Plaintiff: Antero Resources Corporation
Defendant: John Kawcak, Jennifer Kawcak, ORA Trustees Limited, IJJSSTEX Management LLC and CSB Holdings 329, LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv01167
Filed: November 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Terry R Means
Referring Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION...Having considered the Application for a a Preliminary Injunction (doc. #6 ) filed by plaintiff Antero Resources Corporation (Antero), the related briefs, and the pleadings and other papers filed with the Court, the Court concludes that Antero's request for a preliminary injunction against John Kawcak; Jennifer Kawcak; ORA Trustees Limited as trustee of J&J Management Trust; IJJSSTEX Management LLC; CSB Holdings 329, LLC; John Kawcak in his capacities as a member and trustee of IJJSSTEX Management LLC; and Jennifer Kawcak, in her capacities as a member and trustee of IJJSSTEX Management LLC (collectively Defendants) should be, and it is hereby, GRANTED. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 1/11/2024) (wxc)
January 5, 2024 Filing 22 Appendix in Support filed by Antero Resources Corporation re #21 Reply In Support of Its Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Dye, Phillip)
January 5, 2024 Filing 21 REPLY filed by Antero Resources Corporation re: #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Emergency MOTION for Injunction (Dye, Phillip)
January 2, 2024 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jennifer Kawcak. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Michel, Thomas)
January 2, 2024 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Jennifer Kawcak. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Michel, Thomas)
December 29, 2023 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Jennifer Kawcak re: #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (), Emergency MOTION for Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Michel, Thomas) Modified link per PDF on 1/2/2024 (mmw).
December 19, 2023 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint; Temporary Restraining Order (on 12/19/2023) served on IJJSSTEX Management LLC on 12/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Certified Mailing Return Slip) (Nutter, Ethan)
December 19, 2023 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint; Temporary Restraining Order (on 12/19/2023) served on Jennifer Kawcak on 12/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Certified Mailing Return Slip) (Nutter, Ethan)
December 19, 2023 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint; Temporary Restraining Order (on 12/19/2023) served on John Kawcak on 12/06/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Certified Mailing Return Slip) (Nutter, Ethan)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR MAILING OF SERVICE #12 ... Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion for Mailing of Service or Alternative Service of Process (doc. #12 ). After review of the motion and the applicable law, the Court concludes that the motion should be, and it is hereby, GRANTED. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 12/19/2023) (wxc)
December 19, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Injunction Bond filed by Antero Resources Corporation (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Injunction Bond) (Nutter, Ethan)
December 15, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION Mailing Service of Process filed by Antero Resources Corporation with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) Nutter Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Nutter, Ethan)
December 14, 2023 Deadline Modification: Responses due by 12/29/2023. Replies due by 1/5/2024 Per Order #11 . (wxc)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER SETTING DEADLINES REGARDING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #6 ...If Defendants oppose Antero's request for a preliminary injunction, they shall file their response, brief, and an appendix containing any documentary evidence in support no later than Friday, December 29, 2023. Any reply to Defendants' response shall be filed no later than Friday, January 5, 2024. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 12/14/2023) (wxc)
December 1, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine D Grissel on behalf of Antero Resources Corporation. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Grissel, Katherine)
November 27, 2023 Filing 9 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mmw)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Upon review of the record, the Court finds that this case involves the same Parties and issues as Case No. 4:16-cv-668, which is currently pending before Judge Terry R. Means. In the interest of judicial economy and for the convenience of the Parties, the Court ORDERS that this case be TRANSFERRED to the Honorable Terry R. Means for possible consolidation. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 11/27/2023) (mmw)
November 27, 2023 Filing 7 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Antero Resources Corporation re #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Emergency MOTION for Injunction (Dye, Phillip)
November 27, 2023 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (), Emergency MOTION for Injunction filed by Antero Resources Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix in Support of Application for TRO and Preliminary Injunction, #2 Proposed Order Granting Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction) (Dye, Phillip)
November 17, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mmw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/17/2023: #1 ORA summons) (mmw).
November 17, 2023 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (mmw)
November 17, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ethan James Nutter on behalf of Antero Resources Corporation. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Nutter, Ethan)
November 17, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Antero Resources Corporation. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Dye, Phillip)
November 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Antero Resources Corporation. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number BTXNDC-14183435) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Dye, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antero Resources Corporation v. Kawcak et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antero Resources Corporation
Represented By: Phillip Bruce Dye, Jr
Represented By: Ethan James Nutter
Represented By: Katherine D Grissel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kawcak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Kawcak
Represented By: Thomas M Michel
Represented By: David Jefrie Mizgala
Represented By: Mark J Petrocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORA Trustees Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IJJSSTEX Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSB Holdings 329, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?