Securities and Exchange Commission v. Princeton Alternative Funding, LLC et al
Plaintiff: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION, and Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: PRINCETON ALTERNATIVE FUNDING, LLC, MICROBILT CORPORATION, PHILLIP N. BURGESS, JR., WALTER WOJCIECHOWSKI and JOHN COOK, JR.
Respondent: Steven Bellah
Case Number: 4:2023mc00005
Filed: March 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Cureton
Referring Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1782 Letter rogatory - appointment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2023 Filing 7 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Reply to Response of Steven Bellah to Defendants' Motion to Compel Compliance with Third Party Document Subpoena by Steven Bellah, Phillip N. Burgess, Jr., John Cook, Jr., Microbilt Corporation, Princeton Alternative Funding, LLC, Walter Wojciechowski. (Purcell, Bradley)
May 12, 2023 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton: Telephone Conference held on 5/11/2023. Hearing unrecorded, 10 minute duration. Appearance by Defendants'/Movants' counsel: Bradley Purcell, Gerald Korvatin, and Jared McCabe. Appearance by Respondent's counsel: Brian Vanderwoude. It is ORDERED Defendants'/Movants' file their Reply to Defendants'/Movants' Motion to Compel [doc. 1] no later than 12:00 p.m. CST May 31, 2023. (Court Reporter: Not Recorded) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :10. (chmb)
May 1, 2023 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton per #5 Order. (bdb)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Before the Court is Defendants' Motion to Compel a third party, Steven Bellah, to comply with their third-party subpoena duces tecum. ECF No. #1 . The record indicates that Bellah was served with the subpoena on or around October 18, 2022. It is therefore ORDERED that the above-captioned case is hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge Jeffrey Cureton for all pre-trial case management proceedings in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A)(B). The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court update the docket sheet accordingly to reflect the referral of this case for pre-trial case management to Magistrate Judge Cureton. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 5/1/2023) (tjc)
May 1, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Brian Vanderwoude on behalf of Steven Bellah. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Vanderwoude, J)
May 1, 2023 Filing 3 Appendix in Support filed by Steven Bellah re #2 Response/Objection (Attachments: #1 CMB Expert, LLC v. Atteberry, #2 Margel v. EGL Gem Lab Ltd., #3 Mortg. Resolution Servicing v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, #4 Visionworks v. Johnson & Johnson) (Vanderwoude, J)
May 1, 2023 Filing 2 RESPONSE filed by Steven Bellah re: #1 Miscellaneous Case Initiating Documents, (Vanderwoude, J)
March 29, 2023 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (tjc)
March 28, 2023 Filing 1 Motion to Compel (compliance with a subpoena) filed by WALTER WOJCIECHOWSKI, PHILLIP N. BURGESS, JR., MICROBILT CORPORATION, JOHN COOK, JR., PRINCETON ALTERNATIVE FUNDING, LLC. (Filing fee $49; Receipt number ATXNDC-13622381) (Attachments: #1 Appendix In Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Purcell, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Princeton Alternative Funding, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION,
Represented By: Joshua E Braunstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Joshua E Braunstein
Represented By: James E Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRINCETON ALTERNATIVE FUNDING, LLC
Represented By: Bradley James Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICROBILT CORPORATION
Represented By: Bradley James Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIP N. BURGESS, JR.
Represented By: Bradley James Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALTER WOJCIECHOWSKI
Represented By: Bradley James Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN COOK, JR.
Represented By: Bradley James Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steven Bellah
Represented By: J Brian Vanderwoude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?