Ziegenfuss et al v. McCraw
Plaintiff: Charles Ziegenfuss, Brian Robinson, Firearmes Policy Coalition, Inc. and David Montgomery
Defendant: Steven C McCraw
Case Number: 4:2024cv01049
Filed: October 28, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Before the Court is the Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. ECF No. #16 . The Court hereby GRANTS the Motion. The Court ORDERS that Defendant respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before February 4, 2025. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 12/19/2024) (saw)
December 19, 2024 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time Time to File Answer filed by Steven C McCraw (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tebo, Kyle)
November 22, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Daniel Walters on behalf of Steven C McCraw. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Walters, Ryan)
November 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stephen M. Duvernay. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 11/21/2024) (wra)
November 21, 2024 Filing 13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-15080716) filed by Charles Ziegenfuss, David Montgomery, Brian Robinson, Firearmes Policy Coalition, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Duvernay, Stephen)
November 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bradley A. Benbrook. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 11/21/2024) (wra)
November 21, 2024 Filing 11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-15080559) filed by Charles Ziegenfuss, David Montgomery, Brian Robinson, Firearmes Policy Coalition, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Benbrook, Bradley)
November 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. ECF No. #9 . Having considered the Motion and applicable law, the Court hereby GRANTS the Motion. Therefore, the Court ORDERS that Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before December 21, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 11/21/2024) (sre)
November 20, 2024 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time Unopposed, FRCP 6(b) filed by Steven C McCraw (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rhines, Zachary)
November 20, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachary Louis Rhines on behalf of Steven C McCraw. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Rhines, Zachary)
November 20, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyle Tebo on behalf of Steven C McCraw. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Tebo, Kyle)
November 7, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Steven C McCraw ; served on 10/31/2024. (Walton, Samuel)
October 30, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Steven C McCraw. (sre)
October 30, 2024 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Charles Ziegenfuss. (Walton, Samuel)
October 28, 2024 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (sre)
October 28, 2024 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Charles Ziegenfuss, David Montgomery, Brian Robinson, Firearmes Policy Coalition, Inc.. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Cooper, R)
October 28, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steven C McCraw filed by Firearmes Policy Coalition, Inc., Charles Ziegenfuss, Brian Robinson, David Montgomery. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-15022542) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Cooper, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ziegenfuss et al v. McCraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Ziegenfuss
Represented By: Stephen Michael Duvernay
Represented By: Samuel Hunter Walton
Represented By: Bradley Alan Benbrook
Represented By: R Brent Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Robinson
Represented By: Stephen Michael Duvernay
Represented By: Samuel Hunter Walton
Represented By: Bradley Alan Benbrook
Represented By: R Brent Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firearmes Policy Coalition, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Michael Duvernay
Represented By: Samuel Hunter Walton
Represented By: Bradley Alan Benbrook
Represented By: R Brent Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Montgomery
Represented By: Stephen Michael Duvernay
Represented By: Samuel Hunter Walton
Represented By: Bradley Alan Benbrook
Represented By: R Brent Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven C McCraw
Represented By: Ryan Daniel Walters
Represented By: Kyle Tebo
Represented By: Zachary Louis Rhines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?