Simpson et al v. Weiler, Inc.
Plaintiff: Steven Todd Simpson and Christi Ann Wright
Defendant: Weiler, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2024cv01249
Filed: December 20, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 3/24/2025. Amended Pleadings due by 3/24/2025. Motions due by 11/3/2025. Deadline for mediation is on or before 9/3/2025. Discovery due by 10/3/2025. Pretrial Order due by 2/5/2026. Trial set for 3/2/2026 at 08:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/23/2025) (sre)
January 22, 2025 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order filed by Weiler, Inc.. (Bradley, Brian)
January 3, 2025 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Steven Todd Simpson. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Jackson, Greg)
December 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before January 23, 2025. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/26/2024) (mmw)
December 23, 2024 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (bdb)
December 23, 2024 Court Request for Recusal: Judge Mark Pittman recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Reed C. O'Connor for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 4:24-cv-1249-O. (bdb)
December 20, 2024 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (sre)
December 20, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Civil Cover Sheet filed by Weiler, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Bradley, Brian)
December 20, 2024 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Weiler, Inc.. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Bradley, Brian)
December 20, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Weiler, Inc.. (Filing fee $405; receipt number ATXNDC-15144262) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - SOS Packet to Weiler, #2 Index of State Court Filings, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #5 Citation Request, #6 Citation to Weiler, #7 Citation to Jagoe-public, #8 Request for Svc. - SOS, #9 ROS - Jagoe-Public, #10 2nd Citation to Weiler, #11 Notice of Partial Nonsuit, #12 Order of Partial Nonsuit, #13 Aff. of Svc. on SOS, #14 Weiler, Inc.'s Original Answer, #15 Corp. Disclosure and COIP) (Bradley, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson et al v. Weiler, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Todd Simpson
Represented By: Roger D Walton
Represented By: Greg Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christi Ann Wright
Represented By: Roger D Walton
Represented By: Greg Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weiler, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Scott Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?