Vista Bank v. First Bancshares of Texas, Inc

Plaintiff: Vista Bank
Defendant: Kenneth L. Burgess, Jr., First Bancshares of Texas, Inc, Brad Burgess and FirstCapital Bank of Texas, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2018cv00204
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 21 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by First Bancshares of Texas, Inc re #15 Amended Complaint,, (Hogue, Joel)
October 23, 2018 Filing 20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by First Bancshares of Texas, Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Hogue, Joel)
October 23, 2018 Filing 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Brad Burgess, Kenneth L. Burgess, Jr with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Slade, Jared)
October 23, 2018 Filing 18 Appendix in Support filed by FirstCapital Bank of Texas, N.A. re #17 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Hogue, Joel)
October 23, 2018 Filing 17 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by FirstCapital Bank of Texas, N.A. re #15 Amended Complaint,, (Hogue, Joel)
October 23, 2018 Filing 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by FirstCapital Bank of Texas, N.A. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Joel R Hogue added to party FirstCapital Bank of Texas, N.A.(pty:dft) (Hogue, Joel)
October 9, 2018 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Vista Bank. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Bustos, Fernando)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2019. Discovery due by 2/10/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 1/15/2019. Motions for summary judgment due by 9/16/2019. Motions in limine due by 02/10/2020. Jury Trial set for 3/2/2020 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom C-216, 1205 Texas Avenue, Lubbock, TX 79401-4091 before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 9/21/2018) (bdg)
September 19, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brad Burgess, Kenneth L. Burgess, Jr. (Slade, Jared)
September 19, 2018 Filing 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Brad Burgess, Kenneth L. Burgess, Jr with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Jared Michael Slade added to party Brad Burgess(pty:dft), Attorney Jared Michael Slade added to party Kenneth L. Burgess, Jr(pty:dft) (Slade, Jared)
September 18, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by First Bancshares of Texas, Inc. (Hogue, Joel)
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 Appendix in Support filed by First Bancshares of Texas, Inc re #9 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Hogue, Joel)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by First Bancshares of Texas, Inc re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Hogue, Joel)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by First Bancshares of Texas, Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Hogue, Joel)
August 30, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to First Bancshares of Texas, Inc. (Bustos, Fernando) Modified text on 8/30/2018 (bdg).
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Kenneth L. Burgess. (Bustos, Fernando) Modified text on 8/30/2018 (bdg).
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Brad Burgess. (Bustos, Fernando) Modified text on 8/30/2018 (bdg).
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (zzm)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zzm)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 COVER SHEET to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Vista Bank. (Bustos, Fernando) Modified text on 8/27/2018 (zzm).
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Vista Bank. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9411048) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: DISREGARD:RE-ENTERED AS DOCUMENT NUMBER 2 #1 Cover Sheet) (Bustos, Fernando) Modified on 8/27/2018 (zzm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vista Bank v. First Bancshares of Texas, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth L. Burgess, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Chase Hales
Represented By: John F Massouh
Represented By: Joel R Hogue
Represented By: Jared Michael Slade
Represented By: Heather Coghlan Barger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Bancshares of Texas, Inc
Represented By: Michael Chase Hales
Represented By: John F Massouh
Represented By: Joel R Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Burgess
Represented By: Michael Chase Hales
Represented By: John F Massouh
Represented By: Joel R Hogue
Represented By: Jared Michael Slade
Represented By: Heather Coghlan Barger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FirstCapital Bank of Texas, N.A.
Represented By: Joel R Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vista Bank
Represented By: Fernando M Bustos
Represented By: Deirdre Kelly Trotter
Represented By: Matthew Nephi Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?