Luelf v. Reimer

Plaintiff: Ryan D. Luelf
Defendant: Jeff Reimer
Case Number: 5:2018cv00225
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Wed Oct 24 13:15:00 CDT 2018 (crt)
October 24, 2018 7 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/15/2019. Discovery due by 2/10/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 2/15/2019. Motions due by 10/15/2019. Motions for Summary Judgment must be filed on 10/15/2019 by 3:00 p.m.. Motions in limine must be filed by 3:00 p.m. on 02/10/2020. Jury Trial set for 3/2/2020 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom C-216, 1205 Texas Avenue, Lubbock, TX 79401-4091 before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 10/24/2018) (bmg)
October 1, 2018 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Jeff Reimer. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (bmg)
September 17, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jeff Reimer ; served on 9/14/2018. (bmg)
September 10, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2,3,4. Mon Sep 10 16:20:25 CDT 2018 (crt)
September 10, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to Jeff Reimer. (bmg)
September 10, 2018 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (bmg)
September 10, 2018 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bmg)
September 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Jeff Reimer filed by Ryan D. Luelf. (Filing fee $400.00; Receipt number LU010266) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (bmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luelf v. Reimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Reimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan D. Luelf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?