USA v. Jerry Bumpas

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Jerry Bumpas
Case Number: 5:2018cv00268
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Forfeiture/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 29:651
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Judgment against Jerry Bumpas filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s)) (Ray, Doug)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jerry Bumpas. (krd)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to issue Entry of Default filed by United States of America. (Ray, Doug)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jerry Bumpas ; served on 12/12/2018. (Ray, Doug)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 NEW CASE NOTES: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zzm)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jerry Bumpas. (zzm)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of America. (Ray, Doug)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jerry Bumpas filed by United States of America. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Ray, Doug) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/13/2018; Cover Sheet not flattened.) (zzm). Modified text due to Cover Sheet Replaced on 11/13/2018 (zzm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Jerry Bumpas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Bumpas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Doug W Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?