Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company as subrogee of Penny Newman Grain Company v. Varco Pruden Buildings, Inc., A Division of BlueScope Buildings North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Defendant: Varco Pruden Buildings, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00083
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: D Gordon Bryant
Referring Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Nature of Suit: Contract: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Within seven (7) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a) or, pursuant to Local Rule 83.10(a), a motion for leave to proceed without local counsel. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 6/28/2019) (bdg)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR SCHEDULING PROPOSALS: Counsel must submit a joint scheduling proposal that contains the matters set forth in section IV below. The scheduling proposal is due no later than 5:00 p.m. on July 19, 2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 6/28/2019) (krd)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (Sebesta, William) (Main Document 8 replaced on 6/25/2019) (bmg).
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Varco Pruden Buildings, Inc.. (Bustos, Fernando)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Varco Pruden Buildings, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Fernando M Bustos added to party Varco Pruden Buildings, Inc.(pty:dft) (Bustos, Fernando) Modified text on 6/14/2019 (bmg).
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE AND NOTICE OF OPTION TO CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case is now referred to United States Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr. for pretrial management. The parties may consent to have all further proceedings in this case, including a jury or non-jury trial, conducted by the Magistrate Judge. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/11/2019) (bmg)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Varco Pruden Buildings, Inc. ; served on 5/24/2019. (Sebesta, William)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Varco Pruden Buildings, Inc.. (bmg)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Bryant). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bmg)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs filed by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company as subrogee of Penny Newman Grain Company. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9962657) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Sebesta, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company as subrogee of Penny Newman Grain Company v. Varco Pruden Buildings, Inc., A Division of BlueScope Buildings North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Represented By: William Thomas Sebesta
Represented By: Randall J Poelma, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varco Pruden Buildings, Inc.
Represented By: Fernando M Bustos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?