Southwestern Cotton of Plainview,Inc. v. Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation

Plaintiff: SOUTHWESTERN COTTON OF PLAINVIEW, INC.
Defendant: Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv00085
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2019. Discovery due by 10/13/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 10/1/2019. Motions due by 6/1/2020. Motions for summary judgment must be filed by 3:00 p.m. on 06/01/2020. Motions in limine must be filed by 3:00 p.m. on 10/13/2020. Jury Trial set for 11/2/2020 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom C-216, 1205 Texas Avenue, Lubbock, TX 79401-4091 before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 5/29/2019) (bmg)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bmg)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation. (Elza, Slater)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 64TH DISTRICT, HALE COUNTY, case number A42694-1904 filed by Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9982889) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Cover Sheet, #7 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Elza, Slater) (Attachment 6 replaced on 5/13/2019) (bmg). (Attachment 7 replaced on 5/13/2019) (bmg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southwestern Cotton of Plainview,Inc. v. Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation
Represented By: Jennie Christine Knapp
Represented By: Slater Elza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTHWESTERN COTTON OF PLAINVIEW, INC.
Represented By: Laura Pratt
Represented By: Brent B Hamilton
Represented By: Zachary S Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?