Odam v. Jones et al

Plaintiff: Scott Alan Odam
Defendant: Scott Wade, U.S. Government Bankruptcy Court, Harvey Leon Morton and Robert L. Jones
Case Number: 5:2019cv00119
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Intent to Preserve Interest filed by Scott Alan Odam (Odam, Scott)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #11 Motion to Amend/Correct. The Court ORDERS that all pending Motions be DENIED and that the Clerk of Court strike any future filings other than a notice of appeal to the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/5/2019) (bmg)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Order to Issue Citation re: #11 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #9 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Issue Citations filed by Scott Alan Odam (Odam, Scott)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #9 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Issue Citations filed by Scott Alan Odam (Odam, Scott)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 ***DISREGARD REFILED AS #12 NOTICE of Order re: #9 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Issue Citations filed by Scott Alan Odam (Odam, Scott) Modified text per Odam on 8/2/2019 (bmg).
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 ***DISREGARD REFILED AS #11 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Issue Citations filed by Scott Alan Odam (Odam, Scott) Modified text Per Odam on 8/2/2019 (bmg).
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Scott Alan Odam re: #7 Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure, (Odam, Scott)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff has failed to state a claim against any Defendant who is not clearly immune from suit. The Court finds that Plaintiff's claims arefrivolous, without merit and name Defendants immune from suit-thereby requiring the dismissal of the above-styled and -numbered civil action. Therefore, Plaintiffs claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 7/9/2019) (bmg)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 (Document Restricted) DECLARATION TO CORRECT ERROR IN APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS re: #5 Order, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 6/24/2019) filed by Scott Alan Odam (Odam, Scott) Modified text on 6/26/2019 (bmg).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court, having considered Plaintiff's Application to Proceed #2 in Forma Pauperis, is of the opinion that the same should be DENIED. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to pay the filing fee of $400.00 to the Clerk of Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply will result in this dismissal of this civil action. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 6/25/2019) (bmg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (bmg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bmg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 (Document Restricted) Motion to Seal filed by Scott Alan Odam (Attachments: #1 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis) (bmg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Scott Alan Odam. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (bmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Odam v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Alan Odam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Government Bankruptcy Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Leon Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?