Miller v. Martinez et al

Petitioner: Robert Miller
Respondent: Daniel Wheeler and David Martinez
Case Number: 5:2019cv00123
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Mon Jul 1 13:43:43 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The instant action is hereby DISMISSED. This Court will not permit Plaintiff to avoid previous sanctions by filing cases in other Courts, only to have those claims severed and transferred to this Court. THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO DOCKET A COPY OF THIS ORDER AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE, WITHOUT FURTHER ORDER, ANY CIVIL ACTIONS RECEIVED FROM PLAINTIFF BY TRANSFER OR REMOVAL FROM ANOTHER COURT IN VIOLATION OF THE PRIOR SANCTION ORDERS. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 7/1/2019) (zzm)
June 25, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6,7. Tue Jun 25 13:19:12 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (bmg)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bmg)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00267. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER. It is ordered that the Clerk of Court shall transfer this action to the U. S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas, Lubbock Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 6/24/19. (mrp, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER REGARDING VENUE. This action should be transferred to the Northern District of Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 6/24/19. (mrp, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 17, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. (bjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert Miller.(bjc, ) (Original document filed in 1:19cv223) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDERED that the claims against defendants Martinez and Wheeler are severed from this lawsuit and shall proceed as a separate lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 6/17/2019. (bjc, ) (Original document filed in 1:19cv223) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Martinez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?