International Bank of Commerce v. Ford Motor Credit Company LLC
Plaintiff: International Bank of Commerce
Defendant: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00137
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/6/2020. Discovery due by 12/14/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 1/6/2020. Motions due by 9/7/2020. Motions for summary judgment must be filed by 3:00 p.m. on September 7, 2020. Motions in limine must be filed by 3:00 p.m. on December 14, 2020. Jury Trial set for 1/4/2021 at 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom C-216, 1205 Texas Avenue, Lubbock, TX 79401-4091 before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 9/3/2019) (zzm)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 Appendix in Support filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC re #10 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #11 Appendix in Support, #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Appendix Part 2 of 2 (Goldberg, Michael)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 Appendix in Support filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC re #10 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Appendix Part 1 of 2 (Goldberg, Michael)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC re #1 Complaint,,,, (Goldberg, Michael)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC Attorney Michael S Goldberg added to party Ford Motor Credit Company LLC(pty:dft) (Goldberg, Michael)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John Henry Rule. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/13/2019) (krr)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10182894) filed by International Bank of Commerce Attorney John Henry Rule, II added to party International Bank of Commerce(pty:pla) (Rule, John)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David L Bryant on behalf of International Bank of Commerce. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Bryant, David)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURN Executed as to Ford Motor Credit Company LLC; served on 7/31/2019. (krd) Modified text on 8/8/2019 (krd).
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. (krd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (krd)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by International Bank of Commerce. (Siebenlist, Traci)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Ford Motor Credit Company LLC filed by International Bank of Commerce. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10112582) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Siebenlist, Traci)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Bank of Commerce v. Ford Motor Credit Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Bank of Commerce
Represented By: Traci Siebenlist
Represented By: John David Dale
Represented By: David L Bryant
Represented By: John Henry Rule, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC
Represented By: Michael S Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?