Griffin v. Seminole Police Department, et al
Plaintiff: Jewel Griffin
Defendant: Dionne Smith, Cara Castillo and Seminole Poloce Department
Case Number: 5:2019cv00138
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER of USCA as to #10 Notice of Appeal filed by Jewel Griffin. Under 5th Cir. R. 42.3, the appeal is dismissed as of August 28, 2019 for want of prosecution. The appellant failed to timely pay docketing fee. (Attachments: #1 Letter from USCA Fifth Circuit) (krr) Modified text on 8/29/2019 (bdg).
August 6, 2019 USCA Case Number 19-10860 in USCA Fifth Circuit for #10 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jewel Griffin. (krd)
August 5, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11. Mon Aug 5 14:21:05 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS that the above-styled and -numbered civil action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/5/2019) (krd)
July 31, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. Wed Jul 31 14:18:05 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #8 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, #9 Order on Motion for Hearing to the Fifth Circuit by Jewel Griffin. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (krd)
July 16, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7,8,9. Tue Jul 16 13:45:12 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Hearing. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 7/16/2019) (krd)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 7/16/2019) (krd)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Accordingly, the Court hereby suo sponte ORDERS that Plaintiff file an amended complaint on or before July 31, 2019, therein satisfying the pleading standards imposed by Rule 8(a). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 7/16/2019) (krd)
July 15, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2,3,4,5,6. Mon Jul 15 11:13:44 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (krd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (krd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION FOR EMERGENCY HEARING filed by Jewel Griffin. (krd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL filed by Jewel Griffin. (krd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS filed by Jewel Griffin. (krd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jewel Griffin. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (krd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Seminole Police Department, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dionne Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cara Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seminole Poloce Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jewel Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?