Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company a/s/o TD Healthcare, LLC v. Federal Express Corporation
Plaintiff: Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company a/s/o TD Healthcare, LLC
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv00169
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: James Wesley Hendrix
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 Mail returned as undeliverable. #8 Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure, received back from Mark A. Solomon as RTS: Not Deliverable as addressed; Unable to forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (bmh)
September 20, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Fri Sep 20 15:23:21 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED ORDER TO DISMISS: For the sake of clarity, the Court hereby amends the prior order to confirm that the dismissal was with prejudice. A11 parties shall bear their own costs and attorney's fees. The Clerk of Court is ordered to close the case. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 9/20/2019) (bmh)
September 19, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Thu Sep 19 07:48:32 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S STIPULATED MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Federal Express's Stipulated Motion to Dismiss all of,Pharmacist Mutual's claims and causes of action against Federal Express, the Court orders the action dismissed with prejudice. All parties shall bear their own costs and attorney's fees. The Clerk of Court is ordered to close the case. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 9/18/2019) (bmh)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice by Federal Express Corporation. (Matthews, Arlene)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 Mail returned as undeliverable. #5 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, received back from Mark A. Solomon as RTS: Not Deliverable as addressed; Unable to forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (bmh)
September 9, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Mon Sep 9 15:02:21 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER:Pursuant to the Civil Justice Expense and Delay Reduction Plan for the Northern District of Texas and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16(b) and 26(0, the Court enters this Order to promote possible early settlement and to facilitate entry of a scheduling order. The Joint Report is due on or before 10/07/2019. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 9/9/2019) (bmh)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Mail returned as undeliverable. #3 Hendrix received back from Mark A. Solomon as RTS: Insufficient Address. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (bmh)
August 21, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Wed Aug 21 13:51:33 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdg)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Federal Express Corporation. (Matthews, Arlene)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court at Law No. 3, Lubbock County, case number 2019-575,295 filed by Federal Express Corporation. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10197830) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Index of Documents filed in State Court, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3, #5 Exhibit(s) 4, #6 Exhibit(s) 5, #7 Exhibit(s) 6, #8 Cover Sheet, #9 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Matthews, Arlene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company a/s/o TD Healthcare, LLC v. Federal Express Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Represented By: Arlene C Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company a/s/o TD Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: Mark A Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?