Williams v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Tyson Williams
Defendant: Officer NFN Smith, Officer NFN Esquivel, Lorie Davis and Officer NFN Davis
Case Number: 5:2019cv00174
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: D Gordon Bryant
Referring Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. Also mailed a copy of Order and Complaint to Warden, TDCJ Allred Unit, TDCJ Litigation Support - Office of General Counsel and Court Coordinator - TDCJ Bureau of Classification and emailed a copy to courtorders@tdcj.texas.gov. Tue Oct 1 11:47:00 CDT 2019 (crt) Modified on 10/1/2019 (bdg).
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING EVIDENTIARY HEARING: The hearing via video teleconferencing shall be held on 10/24/2019 02:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 214, 1205 Texas Avenue, Lubbock, TX 79401-4091 before Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant Jr.. TDCJ official are instructed to have Plaintiff present at a TDCJ facility with video teleconferencing capabilities. The Clerk shall mail a copy of this order, Plaintiff's Complaint, any amended or supplemental complaint, and Plaintiff's responses to the Court's questionnaire to the listed TDCJ officials. The Clerk shall also transmit by e-mail a copy of this order to the appropriate e-mail address on file for the TDCJ Classification Department. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 10/1/2019) (bdg)
September 26, 2019 Authenticated Records: re #9 received and maintained in JGB's Chambers. (bmh)
August 27, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8,9. Tue Aug 27 17:21:24 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR AUTHENTICATED RECORDS: It is ORDERED that TDCJ provide the Court with authenticated and verified copies of any and all records pertaining to the specific allegations in Plaintiff's Complaint. The records and executed Certification must be provided to the Court on or before September 26, 2019. The Clerk mailed a copy of this Order and Plaintiff's Complaint to the above-listed addresses. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 8/27/2019) (zzm)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE TO EXERCISE JURISDICTION. It is ORDERED that if Plaintiff wishes to consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, Plaintiff must sign and date the attached consent form and return the completed form to the United States District Clerk, Northern District of Texas, Lubbock Division, within thirty (30) days from the receipt of this notice. The Clerk mailed this notice, Lubbock Miscellaneous Order No. 14, and the attached consent form to Plaintiff. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 8/27/2019) (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Order No. 14) (zzm)
August 26, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6,7. Mon Aug 26 10:55:35 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Sam R Cummings no longer assigned to case. This case shall hereafter be numbered Civil Action No. 5:19-CV-00174-BQ. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/26/2019) (bdg)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PLRA FILING FEE ORDER: It is ordered that Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. Tyson Williams shall pay $350.00 in monthly installments as mandated by the PLRA. (Clerk note: TDCJ Inmate Trust Office has been electronically notified of this order.) (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/26/2019) (bdg)
August 20, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,4,5. Tue Aug 20 11:21:28 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (bdg)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdg)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Trust Account by Tyson Williams TDCJ # 02001726. (bdg)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tyson Williams (bdg)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Tyson Williams. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (bdg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer NFN Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer NFN Esquivel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorie Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer NFN Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyson Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?