Hernandez v. Stroebel
Plaintiff: Joe Hernandez
Respondent: Andrew Stroebel
Case Number: 5:2019cv00177
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: James Wesley Hendrix
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5,6. Clerk mailed copy of NEF #4 along with document numbers 5 and 6 Thu Aug 29 11:23:58 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE AND INSTRUCTION TO PRO SE PARTY (zzm)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 NEW CASE NOTES: A filing fee has not been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zzm)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00332. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
August 26, 2019 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of TX Lubbock Division. (bjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/29/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that this civil rights action is transferred to the Lubbock Division of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 8/1/2019. (bjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/29/2019.]
July 31, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (bjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/29/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Andrew Stroebel, filed by Joe Hernandez.(bjc, ) (Original filed in 1:19cv310) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/29/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER severing the following claims into two separate civil rights actions pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983: Joe Hernandez v. Andrew Stroebel (Case 1) and Joe Hernandez v. Nolan County, Nolan County Police Department and Sweetwater, Texas (Case 2). Plaintiffs claims against Walker County, Jim Hurst, Walker County Police Department, and Huntsville, Texas will remain in the above-referenced suit.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 7/31/2019. (bjc, ) (Original filed in 1:19cv310) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/29/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Stroebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andrew Stroebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?