Jacobs v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Lureaner Jacobs
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00194
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: James Wesley Hendrix
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Scott Jones on behalf of FCA US LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Jones, Ryan)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order filed by FCA US LLC. (Kern, Kurt)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Lead counsel for each party and any unrepresented party shall confer at a scheduling conference as soon as practicable, but in any event no later than October 31, 2019. The Joint Report shall be filed by 11/14/2019. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 10/16/2019) (bdg)
October 14, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FCA US LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V. for FCA US LLC. (Scarbrough, Tanya)
October 14, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by FCA US LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Tanya Buler Scarbrough added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft) (Scarbrough, Tanya)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC. (bdg)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdg)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC filed by Lureaner Jacobs. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10281636) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Tracy, E) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/23/2019) (bdg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lureaner Jacobs
Represented By: E Todd Tracy
Represented By: Andrew Counts
Represented By: Wendell Phillip Martens, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Kurt C Kern
Represented By: Tanya Buler Scarbrough
Represented By: Ryan Scott Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?