Johnson v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: LaQuintin Johnson
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, Pete Chavez and Yes Indeed Car Lot, Inc
Case Number: 5:2021cv00023
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: James Wesley Hendrix
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 04/30/2021. Amendment of Pleadings due by 04/30/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 1/14/2022. Completion of Discovery due by 11/29/2021. Pretrial Order due by 4/18/2022. Jury Trial set for 5/9/2022 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom C-216, 1205 Texas Avenue, Lubbock, TX 79401-4091 before Judge James Wesley Hendrix. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 3/5/2021) (bmh)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Fri Mar 5 15:00:40 CST 2021 (crt)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Ford Motor Company, Pete Chavez, Yes Indeed Car Lot, Inc. (Chambless, John)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Garnett Elsworth Hendrix, Jr on behalf of LaQuintin Johnson. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hendrix, Garnett)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before 03/01/2021. Lead counsel for each party and any unrepresented party shall confer at a scheduling conference no later than 02/16/2021. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 2/1/2021) (bmh)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bmh)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Mon Feb 1 11:08:28 CST 2021 (crt)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ford Motor Company. (Chambless, John)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Ford Motor Company. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11564072) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Index to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Chambless, John) (Attachment 3 replaced with flattened PDF on 2/1/2021) (bmh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: John W Chambless, II
Represented By: Israel Flores, Jr
Represented By: Ronald D Wamsted
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Chavez
Represented By: Sondra S Sylva
Represented By: George S McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yes Indeed Car Lot, Inc
Represented By: Sondra S Sylva
Represented By: George S McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaQuintin Johnson
Represented By: Garnett Elsworth Hendrix, Jr
Represented By: Austin M Carrizales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?