Welsh v. Maddox
Petitioner: Lonnie Kade Welsh
Respondent: Sheriff NFN Maddox
Case Number: 5:2021cv00116
Filed: May 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: James Wesley Hendrix
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Case transferred from NDTX has been opened in Western District of Texas San Antonio Division as case number 5:21-cv-00562. (bdg)
June 11, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Fri Jun 11 14:51:02 CDT 2021 (crt)
June 11, 2021 Interdistrict Transfer to Western District, San Antonio Division; notice sent via email. All documents available electronically. If receiving court cannot upload, documents are available from PACER (record does not contain restricted documents). Counsel advised to file future documents in Western District, San Antonio Division. (lkw)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Transferring to Another District: Case transferred to San Antonio Division of Western. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 6/11/2021) (lkw)
June 3, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Lonnie Kade Welsh. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254) (bmh)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER AND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: Petitioner did not pay the required filing fee or file a request to proceed in forma pauperis. Therefore, Petitioner is ORDERED to pay the $5.00 filing fee or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis with the required certificate of inmate trust account by June 21, 2021 (30 days). Petitioner's failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). The Clerk of the Court is directed to provide to Petitioner, with service of this order, a prisoner form application to proceed in forma pauperis and a certificate of inmate trust account. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 5/21/2021) (chmb)
May 19, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,3. Wed May 19 14:09:03 CDT 2021 (crt)
May 19, 2021 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (lkw)
May 19, 2021 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. (lkw)
May 19, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Lonnie Kade Welsh. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (lkw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welsh v. Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff NFN Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lonnie Kade Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?