Hickey v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Sharon Hickey
Defendant: Social Security Administration - Interested Party and Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2021cv00167
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: D Gordon Bryant
Referring Judge: James Wesley Hendrix
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Commissioner of Social Security - United States Attorney's Office; served on 8/18/2021. (bdg)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion seeking leave to proceed without local counsel. It is therefore, ORDERED that Howard D. Olinsky may represent Plaintiff without designating local counsel, subject to further order of the Court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr. on 8/16/2021) (krr)
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 Summons issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 FORMS (ATTACHED TO SUMMONS')) (krr)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER PERMITTING FILING IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE BY THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL, RE: #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff's request to proceed IFP is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to complete Form USM-285 and issue summons to Defendant. The USM shall, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order effectuate service upon Defendant as listed in the order. Within ten (10) days after service is effected, the USM shall file the return of service for Defendant. Defendant shall file a written answer or other responsive pleading in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr. on 8/16/2021) (krr)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Sharon Hickey re #6 MOTION Waive Local Counsel (Olinsky, Howard)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION Waive Local Counsel filed by Sharon Hickey (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Olinsky, Howard)
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sharon Hickey. (Olinsky, Howard)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sharon Hickey (Olinsky, Howard)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (krr)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Bryant (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (krr)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Sharon Hickey. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es) if the motion to proceed IFP is granted. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter to Clerk, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 USM-285 Form, #7 USM-285 Form, #8 USM-285 Form) (Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hickey v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Hickey
Represented By: Howard D Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?