Hooker v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Linda Lee Hooker
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Case Number: 5:2022cv00006
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: D Gordon Bryant
Referring Judge: James Wesley Hendrix
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Region VI, Social Security Administration, Commissioner of Social Security-Office of General Counsel. Executed on 01/24/2022. (lkw)
January 24, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration (US Attorney's Office); served on 1/24/2022. (bdg)
January 12, 2022 Filing 8 Summons issued along with USM-285, Complaint, consent form to proceed before United States Magistrate Judge, and #6 Order as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and Region VI, Social Security Administration. (lkw)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion Waive Local Counsel. It is therefore, ORDERED that Howard D. Olinsky may represent Plaintiff without designating local counsel, subject to further order of the Court. SO ORDERED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 1/12/2022) (lkw)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER PERMITTING FILING IN FORMA PAUPERIS. It is, therefore, ORDERED that: Plaintiff's request to proceed IFP is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk shall file plaintiff's pleadings without prepayment of costs or security therefor; the Clerk of Court is directed to complete Form USM-285 and issue summons to Defendant. The Clerk of Court shall provide Form USM-285 and issue summons to Defendant. The Clerk of Court shall provide Form USM-285, the completed summons, Plaintiff's Complaint, a form to consent to proceed before United States Magistrate Judge, and this Order to United States Marshal (USM) for service upon Defendant. The USM shall, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order and in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i), effectuate service upon Defendant. Within ten (1) days after service is effected, the USM shall file the return of service for Defendant and state costs incurred in effecting service on said Defendant. Although Court has directed the USM to serve Defendant, it is ultimately the Plaintiff's responsibility to see that defendant is timely served in accordance with Fed. R Civ. P. 4 (m). Defendant shall file a written answer or other responsive pleading in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12. SO ORDERED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 1/12/2022) (lkw)
January 11, 2022 Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr added. (lkw)
January 6, 2022 Filing 5 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Linda Lee Hooker re #4 MOTION Waive Local Counsel (Olinsky, Howard)
January 6, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION Waive Local Counsel filed by Linda Lee Hooker with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Olinsky, Howard)
January 6, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Linda Lee Hooker. (Olinsky, Howard)
January 6, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Linda Lee Hooker (Olinsky, Howard)
January 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Linda Lee Hooker. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es) if the motion to proceed IFP is granted. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter to Clerk) (Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hooker v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Lee Hooker
Represented By: Howard D Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?