State of Texas v. Becerra et al
Plaintiff: State of Texas, American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists and Christian Medical & Dental Associations
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, US Department of Health and Human Services, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, Karen L. Tritz and David R. Wright
Amicus Curiae: New York State, California State of, Colorado, Connecticut, Delaware, Hawaii, Illinois, Maine, Maryland, Massachusetts, Michigan, Minnesota, Nevada, New Jersey, New Mexico, North Carolina, Oregon, Pennsylvania, Rhode Island, Officer Washington, Washington DC, American College of Emergency Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Medical Association, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine, National Medical Association, National Hispanic Medical Association, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Public Health Association, American Academy of Emergency Medicine Residents and Students Association, Thomas More Society, Catholic Health Care Leadership Alliance, Christ Medicus Foundation, National Catholic Bioethics Center, Catholic Bar Association, Catholic Medical Association, National Association of Catholic Nurses-U.S.A. and The Catholic Benefits Association
Case Number: 5:2022cv00185
Filed: July 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: James Wesley Hendrix
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, Karen L. Tritz, US Department of Health and Human Services, David R. Wright. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ely, Alexander)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 REPLY filed by Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, Karen L. Tritz, US Department of Health and Human Services, David R. Wright re: #86 MOTION for Clarification (Talmor-DOJ, Kate)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 RESPONSE filed by American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, Christian Medical & Dental Associations, State of Texas re: #86 MOTION for Clarification (Hilton, Amy)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, Karen L. Tritz, US Department of Health and Human Services, David R. Wright. (Healy, Christopher)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew S Bowman on behalf of American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, Christian Medical & Dental Associations. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Bowman, Matthew)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER: Before the Court is Defendants' Motion for Clarification. Dkt. No. 86. The defendants indicate (id. at 2) that, after conferring with the plaintiffs, the motion is opposed. Plaintiffs must file a response no later than September 12, 2022. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 9/2/2022) (bmh)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER: Before the Court is Defendants' Motion to Extend the Answer Deadline, which the plaintiffs do not oppose. Dkt. No. 85. For the reasons stated in the defendants' motion, the motion is granted. Responsive pleadings are due September 27, 2022. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 9/2/2022) (bmh)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MOTION for Clarification filed by Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, Karen L. Tritz, US Department of Health and Human Services, David R. Wright with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Healy, Christopher)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, Karen L. Tritz, US Department of Health and Human Services, David R. Wright with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Healy, Christopher)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STATUS REPORT ORDER: The Court orders the parties to file a joint status report by no lather than 9/9/2022. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 8/29/2022) (bdg)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 SUMMONS Returned Executed. (Hilton, Amy)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 SUMMONS Returned Executed. (Hilton, Amy)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 SUMMONS Returned Executed. (Hilton, Amy)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 SUMMONS Returned Executed. (Hilton, Amy)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 SUMMONS Returned Executed. (Hilton, Amy)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 SUMMONS Returned Executed. (Hilton, Amy)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 SUMMONS Returned Executed. (Hilton, Amy)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 SUMMONS Returned Executed. (Hilton, Amy)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Karen L. Tritz ; served on 7/25/2022. (Hilton, Amy)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Xavier Becerra ; served on 7/21/2022. (Hilton, Amy)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: EMTALA is a federal statute requiring hospitals to provide emergency care to patients regardless of their financial circumstances. The statute says nothing about abortion, but it does impose obligations to stabilize both a mother and her unborn child. Without first completing notice-and-comment procedures, the Department of Health and Human Services issued Guidance to hospitals purporting to remind them that EMTALA requires the provision of abortions in certain circumstances regardless of whether they are permitted under state law. Because that Guidance exceeds EMTALAs text and because notice-and-comment was required, the Court grants the plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction #22 and enjoins the Guidances enforcement against them. For the same reasons, the Court denies the defendants motion to dismiss #38 . (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 8/23/2022) (egp)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER: Before the Court is the defendants motion to file a sur-reply #71 The motion is granted. The Court will take the sur-reply #71 under advisement (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 8/23/2022) (egp)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MOTION for Leave to File Two-Page Surreplyto Address Issues Raised for First Time at Argument filed by Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, Karen L. Tritz, US Department of Health and Human Services (Talmor-DOJ, Kate)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 BRIEF filed by Jonathan F. Mitchell for Catholic Bar Association, Catholic Health Care Leadership Alliance, Catholic Medical Association, Christ Medicus Foundation, National Association of Catholic Nurses-U.S.A., National Catholic Bioethics Center, The Catholic Benefits Association re: #22 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Injunction. (bmh)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #63 , #64 , #65 Applications for Admissions Pro Hac Vice of Shannon Rose Selden, Leah Martin, and Adam Aukland-Peck. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). The motion for leave to file #68 is granted. The Clerk shall file the amicis brief (Dkt. No. 68-1) as a new docket entry. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 8/23/2022) (bmh)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief filed by Catholic Bar Association, Catholic Health Care Leadership Alliance, Catholic Medical Association, Christ Medicus Foundation, National Association of Catholic Nurses-U.S.A., National Catholic Bioethics Center, The Catholic Benefits Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Mitchell, Jonathan)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan F Mitchell on behalf of Catholic Health Care Leadership Alliance, Christ Medicus Foundation, National Catholic Bioethics Center, Catholic Bar Association, Catholic Medical Association, National Association of Catholic Nurses-U.S.A., The Catholic Benefits Association. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Mitchell, Jonathan)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Transcript Order Form: transcript requested by Xavier Becerra, David R. Wright, US Department of Health and Human Services, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, Karen L. Tritz (Court Reporter: Mechelle Daniel.) Payment method: US government funds Reminder: If the transcript is ordered for an appeal, Appellant must also file a copy of the order form with the appeals court.. (Talmor-DOJ, Kate)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-13054506) filed by American Academy of Emergency Medicine Residents and Students Association, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Emergency Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Medical Association, American Public Health Association, National Hispanic Medical Association, National Medical Association, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine Attorney Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck added to party American Academy of Emergency Medicine Residents and Students Association(pty:am), Attorney Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck added to party American Academy of Family Physicians(pty:am), Attorney Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck added to party American Academy of Pediatrics(pty:am), Attorney Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck added to party American College of Emergency Physicians(pty:am), Attorney Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck added to party American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists(pty:am), Attorney Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck added to party American Medical Association(pty:am), Attorney Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck added to party American Public Health Association(pty:am), Attorney Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck added to party National Hispanic Medical Association(pty:am), Attorney Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck added to party National Medical Association(pty:am), Attorney Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck added to party Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine(pty:am) (Aukland-Peck, Adam)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-13054383) filed by American Academy of Emergency Medicine Residents and Students Association, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Emergency Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Medical Association, American Public Health Association, National Hispanic Medical Association, National Medical Association, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine Attorney Leah Suzanne Martin added to party American Academy of Emergency Medicine Residents and Students Association(pty:am), Attorney Leah Suzanne Martin added to party American Academy of Family Physicians(pty:am), Attorney Leah Suzanne Martin added to party American Academy of Pediatrics(pty:am), Attorney Leah Suzanne Martin added to party American College of Emergency Physicians(pty:am), Attorney Leah Suzanne Martin added to party American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists(pty:am), Attorney Leah Suzanne Martin added to party American Medical Association(pty:am), Attorney Leah Suzanne Martin added to party American Public Health Association(pty:am), Attorney Leah Suzanne Martin added to party National Hispanic Medical Association(pty:am), Attorney Leah Suzanne Martin added to party National Medical Association(pty:am), Attorney Leah Suzanne Martin added to party Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine(pty:am) (Martin, Leah)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-13054199) filed by American Academy of Emergency Medicine Residents and Students Association, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Emergency Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Medical Association, American Public Health Association, National Hispanic Medical Association, National Medical Association, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine Attorney Shannon Rose Selden added to party American Academy of Emergency Medicine Residents and Students Association(pty:am), Attorney Shannon Rose Selden added to party American Academy of Family Physicians(pty:am), Attorney Shannon Rose Selden added to party American Academy of Pediatrics(pty:am), Attorney Shannon Rose Selden added to party American College of Emergency Physicians(pty:am), Attorney Shannon Rose Selden added to party American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists(pty:am), Attorney Shannon Rose Selden added to party American Medical Association(pty:am), Attorney Shannon Rose Selden added to party American Public Health Association(pty:am), Attorney Shannon Rose Selden added to party National Hispanic Medical Association(pty:am), Attorney Shannon Rose Selden added to party National Medical Association(pty:am), Attorney Shannon Rose Selden added to party Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine(pty:am) (Selden, Shannon)
August 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Evidentiary Hearing Proceedings held on 08/18/2022 before Judge James Wesley Hendrix. Court Reporter/Transcriber Mechelle Daniel, Telephone number (806) 744-7667. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If the transcript contains personal identifiers that must be redacted under MO 61, Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1, or if the transcript contains the name of a minor child victim or a minor child witness that must be redacted under 18 U.S.C. 3509, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (145 pages) Redaction Request due 9/12/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/20/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/18/2022. (kmd)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 BRIEF OF THE THOMAS MORE SOCIETY AS AMICUS CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS. (krr)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER: Before the Court is B. Tyler Brooks's application for admission pro hac vice for the limited purpose of appearing on behalf of the Thomas More Society as amicus curiae in this case. Dkt. No. #59 . The application is granted. The Clerk of Court shall deposit the admission fee to the account of the Non-Appropriated Fund of this Court. If Brooks has not already done so, he must register as an ECF user within 14 days. See Loc. Civ. R. 5.1(f). Also before the Court is the Unopposed Motion of the Thomas More Society to File Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss. Dkt. No. #57 . The Court grants the motion. The Clerk shall file the amicus's brief (Dkt. No. #57 -1) as a new docket entry. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 8/19/2022) (krr)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-13047844) filed by Thomas More Society (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Brennan Tyler Brooks added to party Thomas More Society(pty:am) (Brooks, Brennan)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Transcript Order Form: transcript requested by State of Texas for Preliminary Injunction & TRO Hearing held 8/18/22 (Court Reporter: Mechelle Daniel.) Payment method: Private funds - Requester has obtained the estimate from the reporter and has paid or will pay the cost as directed. Reminder: If the transcript is ordered for an appeal, Appellant must also file a copy of the order form with the appeals court.. (Hilton, Amy)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae filed by Thomas More Society (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order) (Brandt, Thomas)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Wesley Hendrix: Evidentiary Hearing held on 8/18/2022. Argument from parties heard by Court. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Charles Eldred, Amy Hilton, William Wassdorf, Ryan Bangert; Defense - Christopher Healy, Alexander Ely, Kate Talmor, Eric Beckenhauer. (Court Reporter: Mechelle Daniel) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 3:20. (chmb)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 REPLY filed by American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, Christian Medical & Dental Associations, State of Texas re: #22 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Injunction (Hilton, Amy)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE MEDICAL AND PUBLIC HEALTH SOCIETIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Jessica Ann Morton on behalf of American Academy of Emergency Medicine Residents and Students Association, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Emergency Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Medical Association, American Public Health Association, National Hispanic Medical Association, National Medical Association, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine re: #22 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Injunction. (bmh)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: Before the Court are Jessica Anne Morton's, Jeffrey B. Dubner's, John T. Lewis's, and Skye L. Perryman's applications for admission pro hac vice and request to proceed without local counsel. Also before the Court is Molly A. Meegan's application for admission pro hac vice and request to proceed without local counsel. The applications and requests are granted. Dkt. Nos. 48-51. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). The Court also grants the amicis unopposed motion to file a brief in opposition to the plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order and a preliminary injunction. Dkt. No. #47 . The Clerk shall file the amicis brief (Dkt. No. 47-1) as a new docket entry. (bmh) (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 8/17/2022)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Molly A. Meegan (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-13041297) filed by American Academy of Emergency Medicine Residents and Students Association, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Emergency Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Medical Association, American Public Health Association, National Hispanic Medical Association, National Medical Association, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine (Morton, Jessica)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Skye L. Perryman (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-13041296) filed by American Academy of Emergency Medicine Residents and Students Association, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Emergency Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Medical Association, American Public Health Association, National Hispanic Medical Association, National Medical Association, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine (Morton, Jessica)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney John T. Lewis (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-13041294) filed by American Academy of Emergency Medicine Residents and Students Association, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Emergency Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Medical Association, American Public Health Association, National Hispanic Medical Association, National Medical Association, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine (Morton, Jessica)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Jeffrey B. Dubner (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-13041293) filed by American Academy of Emergency Medicine Residents and Students Association, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Emergency Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Medical Association, American Public Health Association, National Hispanic Medical Association, National Medical Association, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine (Morton, Jessica)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-13041292) filed by American Academy of Emergency Medicine Residents and Students Association, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Emergency Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Medical Association, American Public Health Association, National Hispanic Medical Association, National Medical Association, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine (Morton, Jessica)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by American College of Emergency Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Medical Association, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine, National Medical Association, National Hispanic Medical Association, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Public Health Association, American Academy of Emergency Medicine Residents and Students Association with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order). Party Medical and Public Health Societies added.Attorney Jessica Anne Morton added to party American College of Emergency Physicians(pty:am), Attorney Jessica Anne Morton added to party American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists(pty:am), Attorney Jessica Anne Morton added to party American Medical Association(pty:am), Attorney Jessica Anne Morton added to party Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine(pty:am), Attorney Jessica Anne Morton added to party National Medical Association(pty:am), Attorney Jessica Anne Morton added to party National Hispanic Medical Association(pty:am), Attorney Jessica Anne Morton added to party American Academy of Pediatrics(pty:am), Attorney Jessica Anne Morton added to party American Academy of Family Physicians(pty:am), Attorney Jessica Anne Morton added to party American Public Health Association(pty:am), Attorney Jessica Anne Morton added to party American Academy of Emergency Medicine Residents and Students Association(pty:am) (Morton, Jessica)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed. (Hilton, Amy)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed. (Hilton, Amy)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE: A hearing is set for the plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. No. 22) on August 18, 2022, at 1:00 p.m. CST in the United States District Court, Courtroom C-216, 1205 Texas Avenue, Lubbock, Texas 79401. Dkt. No. 31. To aid the parties' preparation, the Court specifies the following procedural guidelines. Each side shall have one hour to present their arguments, with time to be distributed by each side as the respective parties see fit. Separately and as necessary, the Court willpermit the parties to present witness testimony and other evidence, and the time used for such presentation will not be counted against the parties argument time. Additional time for evidence and arguments may be granted as needed. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 8/16/2022) (bmh)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 BRIEF FOR THE STATES OF CALIFORNIA, NEW YORK, COLORADO, CONNECTICUT, DELAWARE, HAWAII, ILLINOIS, MAINE, MARYLAND, MASSACHUSETTS, MICHIGAN, MINNESOTA, NEVADA, NEW JERSEY, NEW MEXICO, NORTH CAROLINA, OREGON, PENNSYLVANIA, RHODE ISLAND, WASHINGTON, AND WASHINGTON, D.C. AS AMICI CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS AND IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Laura Etlinger. (bmh)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #36 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Laura Etlinger. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g); granting #37 Motion for Leave to File. The Clerk shall file the amici states' brief (Dkt. No. 37-1) as a new docket entry.(Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 8/16/2022) (bmh)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Appendix in Support filed by Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, Karen L. Tritz, US Department of Health and Human Services, David R. Wright re #39 Response/Objection, #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Healy, Christopher)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, Karen L. Tritz, US Department of Health and Human Services, David R. Wright re #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Healy, Christopher)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RESPONSE filed by Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, Karen L. Tritz, US Department of Health and Human Services, David R. Wright re: #22 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Injunction (Healy, Christopher)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, Karen L. Tritz, US Department of Health and Human Services, David R. Wright (Healy, Christopher)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File amicus brief filed by California State of, Colorado, Connecticut, Delaware, Hawaii, Illinois, Maine, Maryland, Massachusetts, Michigan, Minnesota, Nevada, New Jersey, New Mexico, New York State, North Carolina, Oregon, Pennsylvania, Rhode Island, Washington, Washington DC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) proposed amicus brief) (Etlinger, Laura)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-13037143) filed by New York State, California State of, Colorado, Connecticut, Delaware, Hawaii, Illinois, Maine, Maryland, Massachusetts, Michigan, Minnesota, Nevada, New Jersey, New Mexico, North Carolina, Oregon, Pennsylvania, Rhode Island, Washington, Washington DC with Brief/Memorandum in Support.. Party New York, California, Colorado, Connecticut, Delaware, Hawaii, Illinois, Maine, Maryland, Massachusetts, Michigan, Minnesota, Nevada, New Jersey, New Mexico, North Carolina, Oregon, Pennsylvania, Rhode Island, Washington, and Washington, D.C. added.Attorney Laura Etlinger added to party New York State(pty:am), Attorney Laura Etlinger added to party California State of(pty:am), Attorney Laura Etlinger added to party Colorado(pty:am), Attorney Laura Etlinger added to party Connecticut(pty:am), Attorney Laura Etlinger added to party Delaware(pty:am), Attorney Laura Etlinger added to party Hawaii(pty:am), Attorney Laura Etlinger added to party Illinois(pty:am), Attorney Laura Etlinger added to party Maine(pty:am), Attorney Laura Etlinger added to party Maryland(pty:am), Attorney Laura Etlinger added to party Massachusetts(pty:am), Attorney Laura Etlinger added to party Michigan(pty:am), Attorney Laura Etlinger added to party Minnesota(pty:am), Attorney Laura Etlinger added to party Nevada(pty:am), Attorney Laura Etlinger added to party New Jersey(pty:am), Attorney Laura Etlinger added to party New Mexico(pty:am), Attorney Laura Etlinger added to party North Carolina(pty:am), Attorney Laura Etlinger added to party Oregon(pty:am), Attorney Laura Etlinger added to party Pennsylvania(pty:am), Attorney Laura Etlinger added to party Rhode Island(pty:am), Attorney Laura Etlinger added to party Washington(pty:am), Attorney Laura Etlinger added to party Washington DC(pty:am) (Etlinger, Laura)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Enlargement of Pages. The defendants may file up to 45 pages in their response brief to the plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order and a preliminary injunction (Dkt. No. 22). Furthermore, the Court permits the plaintiffs to file a reply brief of up to 20 pages. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 8/12/2022) (bdg)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Page Limits Set by Local Rule filed by Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, Karen L. Tritz, US Department of Health and Human Services, David R. Wright (Talmor-DOJ, Kate)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, Christian Medical & Dental Associations. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Bangert, Ryan)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Robert Healy on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, Karen L. Tritz, US Department of Health and Human Services, David R. Wright. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Healy, Christopher)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: The Court recognizes the plaintiffs allegations of imminent and irreparable injury, and it is also mindful of the defendants need for additional time to respond to the plaintiffs motion. Considering these conflicting interests, the Court sets the following schedule on the motion: The defendants shall file a responsive brief on or before August 15, 2022. The plaintiffs may file a reply brief on or before August 17, 2022. The Court will hear any evidence or argument the parties wish to present on August 18, 2022, at 1:00 p.m. CST in the United States District Court, Courtroom C-216, 1205 Texas Avenue, Lubbock, Texas 79401, before Judge James Wesley Hendrix. So ordered. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 8/10/2022) (krr)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, Christian Medical & Dental Associations, State of Texas. (Hilton, Amy)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Advisory to the Court filed by American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, Christian Medical & Dental Associations, State of Texas (Hilton, Amy)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to All Defendants. (Hilton, Amy)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander N Ely on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, Karen L. Tritz, US Department of Health and Human Services, David R. Wright. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Ely, Alexander)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kate Talmor-DOJ on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, Karen L. Tritz, US Department of Health and Human Services, David R. Wright. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Talmor-DOJ, Kate)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Bangert on behalf of American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, Christian Medical & Dental Associations. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Bangert, Ryan)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: It is ordered that the plaintiffs shall notify the defendants of their request for injunctive relief and provide them with a copy of this order. It is further ordered that the plaintiffs shall file a notice describing compliance with Rule 65(a)(1). Finally, the Court orders the plaintiffs to confer with the defendants and to prepare a status report for the Court that provides: (1) a proposed briefing schedule regarding the plaintiffs' motion; (2) the parties position on whether the Court may resolve the motion on the papers alone; (3) a proposed hearing date, if a hearing is desired or necessary; (4) an explanation of whether any hearing would be evidentiary in nature; and (5) if so, a general description of what evidence the parties plan to submit. The plaintiffs shall file the status report no later than August 9, 2022. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 8/4/2022) (bmh)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by State of Texas re #22 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix) (Hilton, Amy)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Texas (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Temporary Restraining Order) (Hilton, Amy). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 8/4/2022 (twd).
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Department of Health and Human Services ; served on 7/21/2022. (Hilton, Amy)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Summons issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (bmh)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Request for Clerk to issue Summonses filed by American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, Christian Medical & Dental Associations, State of Texas. (Hilton, Christopher)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, Karen L. Tritz, US Department of Health and Human Services, David R. Wright filed by State of Texas, American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, Christian Medical & Dental Associations. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (Hilton, Amy)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed. (Hilton, Amy)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services ; served on 7/22/2022. (Hilton, Amy)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Xavier Becerra ; served on 7/22/2022. (Hilton, Amy)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Xavier Becerra ; served on 7/19/2022. (Hilton, Amy)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Karen L. Tritz ; served on 7/22/2022. (Hilton, Amy)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Karen L. Tritz ; served on 7/19/2022. (Hilton, Amy)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services ; served on 7/19/2022. (Hilton, Amy)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed. (Hilton, Amy)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to David R. Wright ; served on 7/19/2022. (Hilton, Amy)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to David R. Wright ; served on 7/22/2022. (Hilton, Amy)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Department of Health and Human Services ; served on 7/22/2022. (Hilton, Amy)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Department of Health and Human Services ; served on 7/19/2022. (Hilton, Amy)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (bmh)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bmh)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by State of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) SumsRqst-Becerra-ND, #2 Additional Page(s) SumsRqst-Becerra-USAG, #3 Additional Page(s) SumsRqst-CMMS-MD, #4 Additional Page(s) SumsRqst-CMMS-ND, #5 Additional Page(s) SumsRqst-CMMS-USAG, #6 Additional Page(s) SumsRqst-Tritz-MD, #7 Additional Page(s) SumsRqst-Tritz-ND, #8 Additional Page(s) SumsRqst-Tritz-USAG, #9 Additional Page(s) SumsRqst-US HHS-DC, #10 Additional Page(s) SumsRqst-US HHS-ND, #11 Additional Page(s) SumsRqst-US HHS-USAG, #12 Additional Page(s) SumsRqst-Wright-MD, #13 Additional Page(s) SumsRqst-Wright-ND, #14 Additional Page(s) SumsRqst-Wright-USAG) (Hilton, Amy)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State of Texas. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Hilton, Christopher)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by State of Texas. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12962642) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet) (Hilton, Christopher) Modified on 7/14/2022 (bmh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Texas v. Becerra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Texas
Represented By: Christopher D Hilton
Represented By: Amy S Hilton
Represented By: Charles K Eldred
Represented By: William David Wassdorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists
Represented By: Ryan Bangert
Represented By: Matthew S Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Medical & Dental Associations
Represented By: Ryan Bangert
Represented By: Matthew S Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Christopher Robert Healy
Represented By: Alexander N Ely
Represented By: Kate Talmor-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Christopher Robert Healy
Represented By: Alexander N Ely
Represented By: Kate Talmor-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services
Represented By: Christopher Robert Healy
Represented By: Alexander N Ely
Represented By: Kate Talmor-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen L. Tritz
Represented By: Christopher Robert Healy
Represented By: Alexander N Ely
Represented By: Kate Talmor-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R. Wright
Represented By: Christopher Robert Healy
Represented By: Alexander N Ely
Represented By: Kate Talmor-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New York State
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California State of
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Colorado
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Connecticut
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Delaware
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Hawaii
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Illinois
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Maine
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Maryland
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Massachusetts
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michigan
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Minnesota
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Nevada
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New Jersey
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New Mexico
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: North Carolina
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Oregon
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Pennsylvania
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rhode Island
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Officer Washington
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Washington DC
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American College of Emergency Physicians
Represented By: Jessica Anne Morton
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Represented By: Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Jeffrey B Dubner
Represented By: John T Lewis
Represented By: Leah Suzanne Martin
Represented By: Skye L Perryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists
Represented By: Jessica Anne Morton
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Represented By: Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Jeffrey B Dubner
Represented By: John T Lewis
Represented By: Leah Suzanne Martin
Represented By: Molly A Meegan
Represented By: Skye L Perryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Medical Association
Represented By: Jessica Anne Morton
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Represented By: Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Jeffrey B Dubner
Represented By: John T Lewis
Represented By: Leah Suzanne Martin
Represented By: Skye L Perryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine
Represented By: Jessica Anne Morton
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Represented By: Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Jeffrey B Dubner
Represented By: John T Lewis
Represented By: Leah Suzanne Martin
Represented By: Skye L Perryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Medical Association
Represented By: Jessica Anne Morton
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Represented By: Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Jeffrey B Dubner
Represented By: John T Lewis
Represented By: Leah Suzanne Martin
Represented By: Skye L Perryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Hispanic Medical Association
Represented By: Jessica Anne Morton
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Represented By: Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Jeffrey B Dubner
Represented By: John T Lewis
Represented By: Leah Suzanne Martin
Represented By: Skye L Perryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Academy of Pediatrics
Represented By: Jessica Anne Morton
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Represented By: Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Jeffrey B Dubner
Represented By: John T Lewis
Represented By: Leah Suzanne Martin
Represented By: Skye L Perryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Academy of Family Physicians
Represented By: Jeffrey B Dubner
Represented By: John T Lewis
Represented By: Jessica Anne Morton
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Represented By: Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Leah Suzanne Martin
Represented By: Skye L Perryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Public Health Association
Represented By: Jessica Anne Morton
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Represented By: Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Jeffrey B Dubner
Represented By: John T Lewis
Represented By: Leah Suzanne Martin
Represented By: Molly A Meegan
Represented By: Skye L Perryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Academy of Emergency Medicine Residents and Students Association
Represented By: Jessica Anne Morton
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Represented By: Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Jeffrey B Dubner
Represented By: John T Lewis
Represented By: Leah Suzanne Martin
Represented By: Skye L Perryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Thomas More Society
Represented By: Thomas P Brandt
Represented By: Brennan Tyler Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Catholic Health Care Leadership Alliance
Represented By: Jonathan F Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Christ Medicus Foundation
Represented By: Jonathan F Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Catholic Bioethics Center
Represented By: Jonathan F Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Catholic Bar Association
Represented By: Jonathan F Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Catholic Medical Association
Represented By: Jonathan F Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Association of Catholic Nurses-U.S.A.
Represented By: Jonathan F Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Catholic Benefits Association
Represented By: Jonathan F Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?