Bigham v. Lubbock County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Gregory K. Bigham
Defendant: Lubbock County Jail, NFN 523CV89 Hernandez, Lubbock Detention Facility, NFN 523CV89 Andrist and NFN 523CV89 Acevado
Case Number: 5:2023cv00089
Filed: April 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: James Wesley Hendrix
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE RE: #7 Deficiency Order, filed by Gregory K. Bigham. (krr)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DEFICIENCY SHOW CAUSE ORDER: Plaintiff filed his IFP application, but he did not submit the required certificate of his inmate trust account statement with authorization. Thus, the Court finds that Plaintiff shall have 20 days from the date of this order to: either pay the fee or file a certified copy of his inmate trust account statement with signed authorization, or file a sworn affidavit or unsworn declaration, attach copies of any relevant consent forms or other supporting information to Plaintiff's sworn affidavit or unsworn declaration. If Plaintiff fails to respond to this order, the Court will dismiss this cause without further notice. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 5/26/2023) (krr)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Fri May 26 15:23:48 CDT 2023 (crt)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gregory K. Bigham. (krr)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER AND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY. Plaintiff must address the following deficiency: Plaintiff did not pay the $402 filing fee or file a request to proceed in forma pauperis with a certificate of his inmate trust account. Therefore, by May 22, 2023 (30 days), Plaintiff is ORDERED to pay the $402 filing fee or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis on the approved form with the required certificate of inmate trust account. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this action under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). The Clerk will mail an application to proceed in forma pauperis to Plaintiff along with a copy of this order. It is Plaintiff's responsibility to obtain a certificate of his inmate trust account from the appropriate official at his prison unit. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 4/21/2023) (chmb)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF JUDICIAL SCREENING AND STANDING ORDER: Judicial screening of this case is pending. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2); 28 U.S.C. 1915A(a). It is therefore ORDERED that (1) service of process will be withheld until judicial screening is complete, (2) no motions for appointment of counsel may be filed until the Court has completed the screening process, (3) all discovery in this case is stayed until an answer is filed or until further order, (4) no amendments or supplements may be filed without prior Court approval, and (5) any motion to amend the complaint must be accompanied by a complete proposed amended complaint on the required form. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff must promptly notify the Court in writing of any change of address. Failure to provide updated address information may result in the dismissal of the case under Fed. R. Civ. 41(b). (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 4/21/2023) (chmb)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (krr)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (krr)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Gregory K. Bigham. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (krr)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4 and 5 along with a IFP Application. Clerk mailed electronic orders to Plaintiff. Fri Apr 21 14:28:54 CDT 2023 (crt)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2,3. Fri Apr 21 09:26:51 CDT 2023 (crt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bigham v. Lubbock County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory K. Bigham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lubbock County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN 523CV89 Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lubbock Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN 523CV89 Andrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN 523CV89 Acevado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?