KIRK v. USA
Petitioner: Claude Kelley Kirk
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 6:2019cv00057
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE filed by USA re: #1 Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255,, (Burch-DOJ, Amanda)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA. Amanda R Burch-DOJ added as AUSA. (Burch-DOJ, Amanda)
September 18, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. mailed to Petitioner Wed Sep 18 10:11:01 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order to Show Cause, Notice, and Instructions to Parties. Respondent is directed to file an answer pursuant to Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2255 Cases in the United States District Courts within sixty(60) days of the date of this Order. No extensions will be granted. All records must be filed with the Clerk within sixty (60) days from the date of this Order. Movant may file a response to Respondent's answer within twenty-one (21) days from the date shown on Respondent's certificate of service. The clerk has served this order and has regenerated the notice of the motion and supporting documents to the designated Assistant US Attorney. Leigha A Simonton-DOJ for USA added. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 9/18/2019) (pnp)
September 17, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2. mailed to Petitioner Tue Sep 17 15:55:40 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (pnp)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (Criminal Case Number 6:18-cr-004) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Exhibits) (pnp)
September 17, 2019 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. (pnp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KIRK v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Claude Kelley Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?