Castellanos et al v. St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: BRYZEIDA CASTELLANOS, Claudia Nava, BRAYZA CASTELLANOS and YADIRA CASTELLANOS
Defendant: Robert W Covington and St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2020cv00068
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company re: #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Allen, Robert)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Robert W Covington, St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Allen, Robert)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas P Skelley on behalf of Brayza Castellanos, Bryzeida Castellanos, Yadira Castellanos, Claudia Nava. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Skelley, Douglas)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Brayza Castellanos, Bryzeida Castellanos, Yadira Castellanos, Claudia Nava (Westlund, R)
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Robert W Covington, St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company filed by Bryzeida Castellanos, Yadira Castellanos, Claudia Nava, Brayza Castellanos. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (dsr)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to File. Accordingly, the Clerk ofCourt is hereby directed to file Plaintiffs' Exhibit I (attached to Document 6) as Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/10/2020) (dsr)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Claudia Nava with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint) (Westlund, R)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings AND Joinder of Parties due by 3:00 p.m. on 11/16/2020. Motions in Limine must be filed and Discovery completed by 3:00 p.m. on 3/28/2022. Motions for summary judgment due by 3:00 p.m. on 8/2/2021. Jury Trial set for 4/18/2022 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 216, 33 East Twohig Avenue, San Angelo, TX 76903-6451 before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 7/22/2020) (dsr)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. (pnp)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Allen, Robert)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company. (Allen, Robert)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11000600) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) B-1, #4 Exhibit(s) B-2, #5 Exhibit(s) B-3, #6 Exhibit(s) B-4, #7 Exhibit(s) B-5, #8 Exhibit(s) B-6, #9 Exhibit(s) B-7, #10 Exhibit(s) B-8) (Allen, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castellanos et al v. St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W Covington
Represented By: Robert D Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert D Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYZEIDA CASTELLANOS
Represented By: R Scott Westlund
Represented By: Joshua Sloan Hatley
Represented By: Richard Reagan Sahadi
Represented By: Douglas P Skelley
Represented By: Blake Holt Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Nava
Represented By: R Scott Westlund
Represented By: Joshua Sloan Hatley
Represented By: Richard Reagan Sahadi
Represented By: Douglas P Skelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRAYZA CASTELLANOS
Represented By: R Scott Westlund
Represented By: Joshua Sloan Hatley
Represented By: Richard Reagan Sahadi
Represented By: Douglas P Skelley
Represented By: Blake Holt Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YADIRA CASTELLANOS
Represented By: R Scott Westlund
Represented By: Joshua Sloan Hatley
Represented By: Richard Reagan Sahadi
Represented By: Douglas P Skelley
Represented By: Blake Holt Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?