Light v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Resa K. Light
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Case Number: 6:2020cv00069
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: James Wesley Hendrix
Referring Judge: John R Parker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration; served on 7/31/2020. (Honig, Ronald)
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed at to the Commissioner of Social Security; served on 7/27/2020. (Honig, Ronald) Enhanced text on 8/6/2020 (dsr).
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration; served on 7/27/2020. (Honig, Ronald)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 *** SEE DOC #4 FOR SUMMONS(ES) ISSUED. Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Resa K. Light. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Honig, Ronald) Modified text on 7/21/2020 (pnp).
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall perfect service on the Defendant pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules ofCivil Procedure. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge John R. Parker on 7/20/2020) (pnp)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Parker (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge John R. Parker. (pnp)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration. (pnp)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Resa K. Light (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s)) (Honig, Ronald)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Resa K. Light. (Honig, Ronald)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Resa K. Light. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Honig, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Light v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Resa K. Light
Represented By: Ronald D Honig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?