Heck v Forest River
Plaintiff: Bob Heck
Defendant: Forest River Inc
Case Number: 6:2020cv00081
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: James Wesley Hendrix
Nature of Suit: Contract: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Before the Court is the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. Dkt. No. #6 . The Court instructs the Clerk of Court to enter this dismissal and terminate the case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), permitting dismissal of an action without a court order. All causes of action are dismissed with prejudice against all parties. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 9/14/2020) (pnp)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Bob Heck. (Patrick, Craig)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Forest River Inc. (Arthur, Robert)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Forest River, Inc is therefore ordered to obtain local counsel or file a motion to proceed without local counsel by 9/4/2020. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 8/18/2020) (dsr)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Lead counsel for each party shall confer at a scheduling conference no later than 9/2/2020. A Joint Report shall be filed on or before 9/16/2020. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 8/18/2020) (dsr)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (dsr)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Forest River Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11085772) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Dillard, Craig) (Attachments 2 and 3 replaced to flatten image on 8/18/2020) (dsr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heck v Forest River
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest River Inc
Represented By: Craig D Dillard
Represented By: Robert Patrick Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bob Heck
Represented By: Craig M Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?