Waldrop v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Molly Waldrop
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 6:2020cv00109
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: James Wesley Hendrix
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Notice: Case transferred from Texas Northern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:20-cv-08798, filed 12/11/2020. (dsr)
December 4, 2020 Interdistrict Transfer to Northern District of California; notice sent via email. All documents available electronically. If receiving court cannot upload, documents are available from PACER (record does not contain restricted documents). Counsel advised to file future documents in Northern District of California. (twd)
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 Finalized Conditional Transfer Order: The JPML has issued the attached order in MDL 2741, and that order has now been filed in the Northern District of California. (dsr)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. (pnp)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Monsanto Company. (Stubbs, Jennise)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Monsanto Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11316974) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) 1, #4 Exhibit(s) 2, #5 Exhibit(s) 3, #6 Exhibit(s) 4) (Stubbs, Jennise)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waldrop v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molly Waldrop
Represented By: Marcus Alan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Jennise W Stubbs
Represented By: Ryan S Killian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?