OneMain Financial Services, Inc. v. Boyer et al
Plaintiff: OneMain Financial Services, Inc. and OneMain Financial Group, LLC
Defendant: Harold Boyer and Susan Boyer
Case Number: 6:2023cv00022
Filed: April 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Real Property: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2023 Filing 18 Appendix in Support filed by OneMain Financial Group, LLC re #17 Response/Objection to Defendants Amended Response and Motion to Dismiss (Sanders, Jason)
May 31, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE filed by OneMain Financial Group, LLC re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss (Sanders, Jason)
May 31, 2023 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION against All Defendants filed by OneMain Financial Group, LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Deed of Trust, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Constable's Deed, #3 Exhibit(s) 3 - RRR BPO-23-01-12, #4 Exhibit(s) 4- Mechanic's Lien, #5 Exhibit(s) 5 - Fraudulent Warranty Deed, #6 Exhibit(s) 6 - Notice of Fraudulent Deed) (Sanders, Jason)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The Court finds that the Motion to Clarify should be GRANTED. As such, Plaintiff's response to the Amended Motion to Dismiss is due on or before May 31, 2023. The Clerk of Court is ORDERED to terminate the pending Motion to Dismiss #9 because it has been superseded by the Amended Motion to Dismiss. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 5/23/2023) (dsr)
May 22, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Clarify Deadline to Respond to Motion to Dismiss and Defendants Amended Response and Motion to Dismiss filed by OneMain Financial Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Opposed Motion to Clarify Deadline to Respond to Motion to Dismiss and Defendants Amended Response and Motion to Dismiss) (Sanders, Jason)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings AND Joinder of Parties due by 3:00 P.M. on 9/15/2023. Motions for summary judgment due by 3:00 p.m. 3/15/2024. Case must be taken to mediation and it must be completed by 3:00 p.m. on 3/15/2024. Motions in Limine must be filed and Discovery completed by 3:00 p.m. on 3/31/2025. Bench Trial set for 4/21/2025 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 216, 33 East Twohig Avenue, San Angelo, TX 76903-6451 before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 5/15/2023) (dsr)
May 10, 2023 Filing 12 Amended Response and MOTION to Dismiss filed by Susan Boyer. (Filed using emergency filing email.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (rekc)
May 9, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. mailed to Defendant Susan Boyer. Tue May 9 14:14:49 CDT 2023 (crt)
May 8, 2023 Filing 11 AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE on Susan Boyer Returned Executed on 4/19/2023. (dsr)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Amended Proof of Service. Clerk of the Court is directed to docket the Amended Proof of Service attached to Plaintiff's Motion. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 5/8/2023) (dsr)
May 3, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Susan Boyer. (dsr)
May 2, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Proof of Service filed by OneMain Financial Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Amended Proof of Service, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Proof of Service) (Sanders, Jason)
April 20, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Susan Boyer; served on 4/19/2023. (Sanders, Jason)
April 20, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Harold Boyer; served on 4/19/2023. (Sanders, Jason)
April 5, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Harold Boyer, Susan Boyer. (dsr)
April 5, 2023 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. (dsr)
April 4, 2023 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by OneMain Financial Services, Inc.. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Sanders, Jason) Modified text on 4/5/2023 (dsr).
April 4, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by OneMain Financial Services, Inc.. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Sanders, Jason) Modified text on 4/5/2023 (dsr).
April 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by OneMain Financial Services, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-13639687) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Deed of Trust, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Constable's Deed, #3 Exhibit(s) 3 - RRR BPO-23-01-12, #4 Exhibit(s) 4 - Fraudulent Warranty Deed, #5 Exhibit(s) 5 - Notice of Fraudulent Deed, #6 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Sanders, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OneMain Financial Services, Inc. v. Boyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OneMain Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jason L Sanders
Represented By: Caroline Elizabeth Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OneMain Financial Group, LLC
Represented By: Caroline Elizabeth Allen
Represented By: Jason L Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?