United States of America v. Cabelka
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Larry Cecil Cabelka
Case Number: 7:2016cv00126
Filed: October 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Wichita Falls Office
County: Archer
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court GRANTS the parties' Joint Motion to Approve Sale of Megargel Property to Randell and Rebecca McAnally for the amount of $35,000.00 in the form attached as Exhibit 2 to the Joint Motion to Approve Sale of Megargel Property to Randell and Rebecca McAnally, for Expedited Ruling, and Supporting Brief. Cause No. 7:16-cv-00126-O-BP, ECF No. 327 ; Cause No. 7:18-cv-00174-O-BP, ECF No. 78 . (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/21/2021) (bdb)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER ACCEPTING 318 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Having conducted a de novo review of the FCR and Cabelka and Latimer's Objection, the Court OVERRULES each of the Objection; ADOPTS the rea soning in the Magistrate Judge's FCR; GRANTS the United States' 305 Motion to Appoint Receiver; DENIES Cabelka's 311 Motions to Stay, and DENIES Cabelka's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response (ECF No. 322 ). Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 66, an order appoints receiver shall issue separately. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/22/2021) (pef)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's motions regarding whether Defendant and Jacqueline Latimer should be held in contempt (ECF Nos. 240, 264, 268) are DENIED. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 2/4/2019) (trt)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court reviewed de novo those portions of the FCR to which Plaintiff made objections. For the following reasons, the Court OVERRULES Defendant's objections (ECF No. 236 ), ADOPTS the Magistrate Judge's FCR as the Findings and Conclusions of the Court, and GRANTS Plaintiff's motion to compel (ECF No. 227 ). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/21/2018) (skg)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff United States of America's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 72 ) should be and is hereby GRANTED. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/29/2018) (skg)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE 210 : Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Third-Party Defendant Rebecca Thorp's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 190 ) should be and is hereby GRANTED. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/25/2018) (skg)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER ACCEPTING 204 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Defendant Larry Cabelka's request in his Objection to the Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 201 ) that default judgment be entered against Jared and Bonnie Cabelka, and that he be granted leave to amend his third-party pleading, is DENIED. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/9/2018) (skg)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATIONOF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The undersigned District Judge is of the opinion that the findings and conclusions of the Magistrate Judge are correct, and they are accepted as the fi ndings and conclusions of the Court. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Jared and Bonnie Cabelka's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 182 ) is GRANTED in part without prejudice to the extent it seeks dismissal under Rule 12(b)(5) or Rule 12(b)(6), and DENIED in part as MOOT to the extent it seeks dismissal under Rule 12(b)(2) and Rule 12(b)(4). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/8/2018) (plp)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the Price Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 179 ) is GRANTED in part to the extent it seeks dismissal under Rule 12(b)(1) and DENIED in part as MOOT to the extent it seeks dismissal under Rule 12(b)(6). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/29/2017) (skg)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order Accepting Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendations re: 24 Motion to Dismiss filed by Amanda Slate, 11 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Billy Logsdon, Logsdon Farms, Inc., Chad Logsdon, 29 Motion to Dismiss fi led by Rebecca Cabelka Tho. It is ORDERED that Logsdon Farms, Inc., Chad Logsdon, and Billy Logsdon's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 11 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as moot, Amanda Slate' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 24 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as moot, and Defendant Larry Cabelka's claims against Logsdon Farms, Inc., Chad Logsdon, Billy Logsdon, and Amanda Slate are DISMISSED without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that Rebecca Cabelka Thorpe's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 29 ) is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is ordered to correct Larry Cabelka's designation in this case to reflect his party status as both the defendant and third-party plaintiff, instead of cross claimant, and correct Rebecca Cabelka Thorpe's designation to reflect her party status as a third-party defendant instead of a cross defendant. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/24/2017) (ewd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Cabelka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Ramona S Notinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Cecil Cabelka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?