Demos v. U.S. Attorney General et al
Petitioner: John Robert Demos, Jr
Respondent: State of Washington, United States, U.S. Congress, Washington DC, U.S. Solicitor General, U.S. Attorney General, President of the U.S.A. and US Attorney General
Case Number: 7:2019cv00010
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Referring Judge: Hal R Ray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 DETAILS: Case transferred from Texas Northern has been opened in United States District Court for the Western District of Washington as case 2:19-cv-00225, filed 02/15/2019. (skg)
February 14, 2019 Interdistrict Transfer to Western District of Washington; notice sent via email. All documents available electronically. If receiving court cannot upload, documents are available from PACER (record does not contain restricted documents). Counsel advised to file future documents in Western District of Washington. (skg)
February 14, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Thu Feb 14 14:56:42 CST 2019 (crt)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Transferring to Another District: Case transferred to Division of Western District of Washington. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 2/14/2019) (skg)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by John Robert Demos, Jr. (skg)
January 23, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Wed Jan 23 11:27:53 CST 2019 (crt)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER: It is ORDERED that, by February 13, 2019, Petitioner shall either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 1/23/2019) (skg)
January 22, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3, 4. Tue Jan 22 15:19:26 CST 2019 (crt)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (skg)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. File to: No court file needed. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ray (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ray). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr. (skg)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by John Robert Demos, Jr. (skg)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by John Robert Demos, Jr. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (skg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demos v. U.S. Attorney General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Congress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Washington DC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Solicitor General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: President of the U.S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Robert Demos, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?