Knapp v. Saul

Plaintiff: Sharena Gail Knapp
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Case Number: 7:2019cv00069
Filed: June 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Referring Judge: Hal R Ray
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to AG of the United States ; served on 7/8/2019. (skg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Andrew M Saul ; served on 6/26/2019. (skg)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 Summons issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. Summons emailed to USM for service. (skg)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 6/25/2019) (skg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. File to: No court file needed. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ray (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ray). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr. (trt)
June 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sharena Gail Knapp (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s) IFP Application, #2 Proposed Order) (Long, Martin)
June 23, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sharena Gail Knapp. (Long, Martin)
June 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Martin Wayne Long on behalf of Sharena Gail Knapp. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Long, Martin)
June 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul filed by Sharena Gail Knapp. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es) for federal defendant(s). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Long, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knapp v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharena Gail Knapp
Represented By: Martin Wayne Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?