Wade v. Wichita County Texas
Petitioner: Micky Dawn Wade
Respondent: Wichita County Texas
Case Number: 7:2019cv00070
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Referring Judge: Hal R Ray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 Update and Status Request filed by Micky Dawn Wade. (Attachments: #1 Deputy Clerk's Response) (skg)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Micky Dawn Wade. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (skg)
June 25, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. , and two copies of the standard form for cases filed under 28 U.S.C. 2241, with the case number and notation "Amended" included on the form has been mailed for completition. Tue Jun 25 15:49:34 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Deficiency and Order: Micky Dawn Wade must address the following deficiency: Upon review of the papers and pleadings, it appears that Petitioner has failed to file his Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241 on the appropriate form for that type of action. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 7/25/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 6/25/2019) (skg)
June 25, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Tue Jun 25 10:48:53 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FILING FEE ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 6/25/2019) (skg)
June 24, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3, 4. Mon Jun 24 12:02:45 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (skg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. File to: No court file needed. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ray (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ray). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr. (skg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Micky Dawn Wade. (skg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Micky Dawn Wade. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (skg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wade v. Wichita County Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wichita County Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Micky Dawn Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?