Quanah Services, Inc v. Security Bank
Plaintiff: Quanah Services, Inc
Defendant: Security Bank
Case Number: 7:2020cv00027
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY filed by Security Bank re: #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Winnubst, Mark)
April 10, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE filed by Quanah Services, Inc re: #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Northern, Van)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 Appendix in Support filed by Security Bank re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Winnubst, Mark)
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Security Bank with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Mark D Winnubst added to party Security Bank(pty:dft) (Winnubst, Mark)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ray). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (skg)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Security Bank. (skg)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Quanah Services, Inc. (Northern, Van)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Security Bank filed by Quanah Services, Inc. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10664369) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Northern, Van)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quanah Services, Inc v. Security Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quanah Services, Inc
Represented By: Van W Northern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Bank
Represented By: Mark D Winnubst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?