Velasquez v. Rogers et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Velasquez
Defendant: Lakisha Nicole McKnight, State of Texas, Margaret Rogers, Valerie Thomerson and Mary Elizabeth Romm
Case Number: 7:2020cv00097
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 9/23/2020. Replies due by 9/30/2020. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 9/9/2020) (skg)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1), #8 MOTION to Dismiss individual defendants, pursuant to TCPRC Sec. 101.106(e) filed by Brenda Velasquez (Eaves, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss individual defendants, pursuant to TCPRC Sec. 101.106(e) filed by State of Texas with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Lindsey, Christopher)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) filed by State of Texas with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Christopher Lee Lindsey added to party State of Texas(pty:dft) (Lindsey, Christopher)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT ROMM AND ROGERS' MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Brenda Velasquez re: #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (trt)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Margaret Rogers, Mary Elizabeth Romm re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Lindsey, Christopher)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction () filed by Margaret Rogers, Mary Elizabeth Romm (Lindsey, Christopher)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ray). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (skg)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Margaret Rogers, Mary Elizabeth Romm. (Lindsey, Christopher)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Mary Elizabeth Romm, Margaret Rogers. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11004025) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Cover Sheet, #10 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Lindsey, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velasquez v. Rogers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Velasquez
Represented By: Jeffrey L Eaves
Represented By: Mark H Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakisha Nicole McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Texas
Represented By: Christopher Lee Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Rogers
Represented By: Christopher Lee Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Thomerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Elizabeth Romm
Represented By: Christopher Lee Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?