Barton v. Slayton et al
Petitioner: Ronnie Barton
Respondent: Jimmy S Smith, Andrea B Lozado, Charlotte A Slayton and Andrea B Lozada
Case Number: 7:2020cv00110
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7, 8. Tue Aug 18 16:43:30 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice as Plaintiff is barred from proceeding in forma pauperis by the three strikes provision of 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/18/2020) (trt)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. For the foregoing reasons, this action is DISMISSED without prejudice as barred by the three strikes provision of 28 U.S.C. 1915 (g). See Brown v. Megg, 857 F.3d 287 (5th Cir. 2017); Adepegba v. Hammons, 103 F.3d 383 (5th Cir. 1996), abrogated in part on other grounds by Coleman v. Tollefson, 575 U.S. 532, ___, 135 S. Ct. 1759, 1762-63 (2015). Plaintiff may reopen this case by filing a motion to reopen and paying the $400.00 filing and administrative fees within thirty days of the date of this order. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/18/2020) (trt)
August 17, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5,6. Mon Aug 17 13:07:40 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (trt)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ray). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (trt)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00306. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER transferring this action to the Wichita Falls Division of the US District Court for the Northern District of TX. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 7/28/20. (tkd, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/17/2020.]
July 13, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Keith Giblin pursuant to a Standing Order (tkd, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/17/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronnie Barton. (tkd, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/17/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrea B Lozado, Charlotte A Slayton, Jimmy S Smith, filed by Ronnie Barton.(tkd, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barton v. Slayton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jimmy S Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andrea B Lozado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charlotte A Slayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andrea B Lozada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronnie Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?