Byrd et al v. Clay County Sheriff's Department
Plaintiff: Gary Tatum, Linda Byrd and Tyler Aylor
Defendant: Clay County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 7:2021cv00027
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2615
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Clay County Sheriff's Department filed by Linda Byrd, Tatum Gary, Aylor Tyler. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (O'Kelly, Nicholas)
April 26, 2021 Filing 8 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Transfer Case out of District/Division Case transferred to the Wichita Falls Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 4/26/2021) (mjr)
April 26, 2021 New case number 7:21-cv-00027-O Byrd et al v. Clay County Sheriff's Department has been opened following the order of transfer entered in case number 3:21-cv-00901-C. Future filings should be made in the WICHITA FALLS division and reflect the new case number as indicated. Clerk to complete new case processing and mail notice of this entry to any party who did not receive it electronically. (twd)
April 21, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division from Dallas to Wichita Falls filed by Linda Byrd, Tatum Gary, Aylor Tyler (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Kelly, Nicholas)
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Clay County Sheriff's Department. (oyh)
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tatum Gary, Byrd Linda, Aylor Tyler. (O'Kelly, Nicholas)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Clay County Sheriff's Department, in Clay County, Texas filed by Byrd Linda, Tatum Gary, Aylor Tyler. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11812726) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Info Cover Sheet) (O'Kelly, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrd et al v. Clay County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clay County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Tatum
Represented By: Nicholas A O'Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Byrd
Represented By: Nicholas A O'Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Aylor
Represented By: Nicholas A O'Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?