Cooper v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Carla Cooper
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Case Number: 7:2021cv00104
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Referring Judge: Hal R Ray
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 USMS Process Receipt and Return/SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, served on 11/10/2021; U.S. Attorney, served on 11/08/2021; U.S. Attorney General, served on 11/10/2021. (pef)
October 27, 2021 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (Copies of summons, USM-285 forms, and #1 Complaint, provided to USMS per #5 ORDER) (pef)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S #2 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: It is therefore ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall issue summons and the United States Marshals Service shall serve process. (See order for further specifics) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 10/27/2021) (pef)
October 22, 2021 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. File to: appropriate staff attorney. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ray (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ray). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr. (pef)
October 22, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carla Cooper. (Kelly, Michael)
October 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carla Cooper (Kelly, Michael)
October 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner, Social Security Administration filed by Carla Cooper. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Kelly, Michael) Modified docket text on 10/22/2021 (pef).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Cooper
Represented By: Michael T Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?