Cardinal Health Solutions, Inc. v. Valley Baptist Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Cardinal Health Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Valley Baptist Medical Center and Valley Baptist Medical Center - Brownsville
Case Number: 1:2007cv00111
Filed: July 30, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Brownsville Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Andrew S. Hanen
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 137 Plaintiff's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss and/or Motion for Summary Judgment. Specifically, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff summary judgment on Defendant's fraudulent-induc ement and fraudulent-nondisclosure claims, and GRANTS Plaintiff summary judgment on Defendant's RICO claims in their entirety. The Court DENIES Plaintiff summary judgment on Defendants' claim of fraudulent misrepresentation related to invoi ces issued during the life of the contracts. Finally, 177 Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Original and Supplemental Motion to Dismiss and/or Motion fur Summary Judgment are DENIED as moot.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(bcampos, )
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. For these reasons, the Court hereby GRANTS Defendant's Motion to the extent that it asks for leave to join Cardinal health 303, Inc. and DENIES Defendant's Motion to the extent that it asks for leave to join Ca rdinal Health, Inc., as additional parties, Doc. No. 123 . The Court also GRANTS Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike and Motion for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Response t o Defendants' Motion for Leave to Join, Doc. No. 153 , and DENIES Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Parties from Defendants' Second Amended Answer and Counterclaim, Doc. No. 135 (Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(bvasquez, )
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 68 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(bvasquez, )
November 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying as moot in part 90 Motion to Dismiss; denying 110 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; The Court therefore GRANTS Plaintiff summary judgment of Defendant's breach of fiduciary duty cl aim (Doc. No. 90) and thereby DENIES Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Fiduciary Duty (Doc. No. 110). To the extent that Plaintiff has pending Motion to Dismiss Defendants' fiduciary duty claim (Doc. No. 90), that Motion is DENIED as moot.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(bcampos, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardinal Health Solutions, Inc. v. Valley Baptist Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cardinal Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Thomas Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Baptist Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Baptist Medical Center - Brownsville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?