Marcus et al v. Apple Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Uriel Marcus and Benedict Verceles
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00082
Filed: May 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Brownsville Office
County: Cameron
Presiding Judge: Hilda G Tagle
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2014 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by: First-class mail, filed.(bcampos, 1)
May 27, 2014 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Apple Inc., filed.(Rosales, Omar)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Disclosures. Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 9/30/2014.(Signed by Judge Hilda G Tagle) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Andrew S. Hanen recused. Case reassigned to Judge Hilda G Tagle for all further proceedings. (Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
May 15, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-13164839) filed by Uriel Marcus. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosales, Omar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marcus et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uriel Marcus
Represented By: Omar Weaver Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benedict Verceles
Represented By: Omar Weaver Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?