State of Texas et al v. United States of America et al Featured Case

Plaintiff States sought declaratory and injunctive relief against the United states on the grounds that President Obama's DACA program which provided deferred action for childhood arrivals violated the Take Care Clause and the Administrative Procedure Act.

Plaintiff: State of Texas, State of Alabama, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, Paul R. LePage, Patrick L. McCrory, C.L. "Butch" Otter, Phil Bryant, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of Florida, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas and Bill Schuette
Defendant: United States of America, Jeh Johnson, R. Gil Kerlikowske, Ronald D. Vitiello, Thomas S. Winkowski and Leon Rodriguez
Amicus: Service Employees International Union
Movant: Mitchell Williams
Case Number: 1:2014cv00254
Filed: December 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Brownsville Office
County: Cameron
Presiding Judge: Andrew S. Hanen
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) (Attachments: # 1 Continuation pages 51-100, # 2 Continuation pages 101-123) Parties notified.(rdv, 1)
February 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(rdv, 1)
February 11, 2015 Filing 143 Supplemental EXHIBITS by Joe Arpaio, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DHS Announcement accepting deferred action applications Feb 18, # 2 Exhibit DHS announcement immediate application of deferred action requirements)(Moseley, Jonathon)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER denying 135 Motion for Reconsideration.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER denying 91 MOTION to Intervene by Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(jtabares, 1)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER denying 137 Motion to Intervene filed by Dr. Orly Taitz.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
February 11, 2015 Filing 139 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus by Harold William Van Allen, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/4/2015. (dnoriega, 1)
February 6, 2015 Filing 138 REPLY in Support of 91 MOTION to Intervene, filed by Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3. (Perales, Nina)
February 5, 2015 Filing 137 MOTION to Intervene as an Additional Plaintiff by Orly Taitz, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/26/2015. (rnieto, 1)
February 3, 2015 Filing 136 RESPONSE in Opposition to 91 MOTION to Intervene, filed by Jeh Johnson, R. Gil Kerlikowske, Leon Rodriguez, United States of America, Ronald D. Vitiello, Thomas S. Winkowski. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Freeny, Kyle)
February 3, 2015 Filing 135 MOTION for Reconsideration or Motion in the Alternative by Intervenor Mitchell Williams, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/24/2015. (rnieto, 1)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting 126 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Supplement to the Amended Complaint.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting 129 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(jtabares, 1)
February 2, 2015 Filing 132 SUPPLEMENT to 5 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, Patrick L. McCrory, C.L. "Butch" Otter, Bill Schuette, State of Louisiana, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A, # 2 Exhibit Ex B, # 3 Exhibit Ex C, # 4 Exhibit Ex D, # 5 Exhibit Ex E, # 6 Exhibit Ex F)(Oldham, Andrew)
January 30, 2015 Filing 131 RESPONSE to 91 MOTION to Intervene filed by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, Patrick L. McCrory, C.L. "Butch" Otter, Bill Schuette, State of Louisiana, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Oldham, Andrew)
January 30, 2015 Filing 130 SURREPLY to 5 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Jeh Johnson, R. Gil Kerlikowske, Leon Rodriguez, United States of America, Ronald D. Vitiello, Thomas S. Winkowski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 34, # 2 Exhibit 35, # 3 Exhibit 36, # 4 Exhibit 37, # 5 Exhibit 38, # 6 Exhibit 39, # 7 Exhibit 40, # 8 Exhibit 41, # 9 Exhibit 42, # 10 Exhibit 43, # 11 Exhibit 44, # 12 Exhibit 45, # 13 Exhibit 46)(Freeny, Kyle)
January 30, 2015 Filing 129 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jeh Johnson, R. Gil Kerlikowske, Leon Rodriguez, United States of America, Ronald D. Vitiello, Thomas S. Winkowski, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/20/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Freeny, Kyle)
January 30, 2015 Filing 128 Certified Mail Receipt Returned as to Mitchell Williams re: 74 Document(s) Sent - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (bcampos, 1)
January 30, 2015 Filing 127 APPENDIX re: 121 Brief, by Bill de Blasio, filed.(Dearing, Richard)
January 30, 2015 Filing 126 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Supplement to the Amended Complaint by Jeh Johnson, R. Gil Kerlikowske, Leon Rodriguez, United States of America, Ronald D. Vitiello, Thomas S. Winkowski, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/20/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Freeny, Kyle)
January 29, 2015 Filing 125 Certified Mail Receipt Returned, executed on 1/20/15 re: 42 Document(s) Sent - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (mperez, 1)
January 28, 2015 Filing 124 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Kendra Morries. This is to order a transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 1/15/15 before Judge Andrew S. Hanen (copy order). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Barbara Barnard, filed. (rnieto, 1)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER re: 119 MOTION for Richard Dearing to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bill de Blasio.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(jtabares, 1)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting 120 Motion for Leave to File Brief Amici Curaie in Support of Defendants and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified. (rnieto, 1)
January 27, 2015 Filing 121 BRIEF for the Amici Curiae the Mayors of New York and Los Angeles, the Mayor of Thirty-One Additional Cities, the United States Conferences of Mayors, and the National League of Cities in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Bill de Blasio, filed.(mperez, 1)
January 27, 2015 Filing 120 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae In Support of Defendants and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Bill de Blasio, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/17/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(mperez, 1)
January 27, 2015 Filing 119 MOTION for Richard Dearing to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bill de Blasio, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/17/2015. (mperez, 1)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Striking Document re: 117 Notice of Fraud/ Misrepresentation(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(sbejarano, 1)
January 27, 2015 Filing 117 NOTICE of Fraud/ Misrepresentation Committed by Orly Taitz, filed. (Attachments: # 1 attachment)(sbejarano, 1)
January 27, 2015 Filing 116 Certified Mail Receipt Returned, executed on 1/20/15 re: 76 Document(s) Sent - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (mperez, 1)
January 23, 2015 Filing 115 SUPPLEMENT to 14 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, Patrick L. McCrory, C.L. "Butch" Otter, Bill Schuette, State of Louisiana, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, filed.(Oldham, Andrew)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting 111 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to attorney, Adam P. KohSweeney.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
January 21, 2015 Filing 113 Amicus BRIEF in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Joe Arpaio as Sheriff of Maricopa County, filed.(bcampos, 1)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting 108 Motion for Leave to File to Participate as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs by Sheriff Joe Arpaio.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
January 21, 2015 Filing 111 MOTION for Adam P KohSweeney to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, filed. (Bar Membership verified) Motion Docket Date 2/11/2015. (bcampos, 1)
January 20, 2015 Filing 110 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Ilya Shapiro. This is to order a transcript of Hearing held on 1/15/2015 before Judge Andrew S. Hanen (Copy Order). Court Reporter: B. Barnard, filed. (pcrawford, 4)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting 105 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jonathan F. Mitchell terminated.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(jtabares, 1)
January 20, 2015 Filing 108 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Joe Arpaio as Sheriff of Maricopa County by Joe Arpaio, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/10/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Joe Arpaio as Sheriff of Maricopa County)(jtabares, 1)
January 20, 2015 Filing 107 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Friend of the Court Brief by Joe Arpaio, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/10/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief by Sheriff Joe Arpaio, # 2 Affidavit Stating Data published by Defendants re: Funding Requests for Enforcement of Immigration Laws, attested to by Jonathon Moseley in Arpaio v. Obama case, # 3 Proposed Order)(Moseley, Jonathon)
January 20, 2015 Filing 106 TRANSCRIPT re: Preliminary injunction hearing held on 1/15/15 before Judge Andrew S. Hanen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Barbara Barnard. Ordering Party Kyle Freeny Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/20/2015., filed. (bbarnard, )
January 16, 2015 Filing 105 MOTION for Jonathan F. Mitchell to Withdraw as Attorney by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, Patrick L. McCrory, C.L. "Butch" Otter, Bill Schuette, State of Louisiana, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/6/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Oldham, Andrew)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 98 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(avleal, 1)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 93 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, attorney Jonathon A Moseley.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 97 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, for attorney Gabriel Markoff.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
January 16, 2015 Filing 101 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Karen C. Tumblin. This is to order a transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 1/15/15 before Judge Andrew S. Hanen (copy). Court Reporter: Barbara Barnard, filed. (jtabares, 1)
January 16, 2015 Filing 100 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Kyle Freeny. This is to order a transcript of Motion Hearing held on 01/15/2015 before Judge Andrew S. Hanen (original). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Barbara Barnard, filed. (dahumada, 1)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER entered. The Court hereby cancels the initial pretrial conference scheduled for March 31, 2015. (Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
January 16, 2015 Filing 98 MOTION for J. Jorge deNeve to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/6/2015. (avleal, 1)
January 16, 2015 Filing 97 MOTION for Gabriel Markoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/6/2015. (avleal, 1)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER entered. The Court hereby imposes the following deadlines: 1) Plaintiffs shall file any supplemental pleading adding the State of Tennessee as a party-plaintiff by January 23, 2015; 2) Any responsive pleading by Defendants to Plaintiffs' above-referenced supplemental pleading shall be filed on or before January 30, 2015; and 3) Defendants shall file any responses to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of their Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before January 30, 2015. (Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(jtabares, 1)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 94 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Linda Jane Smith. (Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
January 15, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew S. Hanen. Preliminary INJUNCTION HEARING held on 1/15/2015. Appearances: Attorneys for Plaintiffs: A. Oldham; A. Bitter; A. Colmenero; A. D'Andrea; J. Mitchell; Attorneys for Defendants: K. Hartnett; K. Freeny; D. Hu;(Court Reporter: B.Barnard)(10:05-11:35 / 11:49-01:13). Court addressed the Parties. Oral argument heard. Court Break. Court Resumes. Oral argument heard. The state of Tennesse would like to be part of this case. Supplemental complaint joining Tennesse by 01/23/15 with reply by 01/30/15. 90 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Reply by Jeh Johnson, R. Gil Kerlikowske, Leon Rodriguez, United States of America, Ronald D. Vitiello, Thomas S. Winkowski, -Discussed and due 1/30/15. Court will rule expeditiously has it can. Court adjourned., filed.(csustaeta, 1)
January 15, 2015 Filing 94 MOTION for Linda J. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Defendant-Intervenors, Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, and Jane Doe 3, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/5/2015. (bcampos, 1)
January 15, 2015 Filing 93 MOTION for Jonathan Alden Moseley to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Amicus, Sheriff Joe Arpaio, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/5/2015. (bcampos, 1) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2015: # 1 Statement) (bcampos, 1).
January 14, 2015 Filing 92 MOTION to Proceed under Pseudonyms and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/4/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Declarations and Exhibits, # 2 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
January 14, 2015 Filing 91 MOTION to Intervene by Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/4/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - [Proposed] Defendant-Intervenors' Joinder in Defendants' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Exhibit 2 - [Proposed] Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, # 3 Appendix of Authorities, # 4 Appendix of Declarations, # 5 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
January 14, 2015 Filing 90 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Reply by Jeh Johnson, R. Gil Kerlikowske, Leon Rodriguez, United States of America, Ronald D. Vitiello, Thomas S. Winkowski, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/4/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Freeny, Kyle)
January 14, 2015 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan F. Mitchell on behalf of Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, Patrick L. McCrory, C.L. "Butch" Otter, Bill Schuette, State of Louisiana, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, filed. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 83 Motion for Leave to File. The Court hereby grants leave for the aforementioned movants to participate as amici curiae and file a brief in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injuction. (Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(avleal, 1)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 81 Unopposed MOTION Filing of Amicus Brief of Washington and States by State of Washington. The Court hereby grants leave for the aforementioned movants to participate as amici curiae and file a brief in opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(jtabares, 1)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER re: 85 MOTION for Cally Younger to Appear Pro Hac Vice by C.L. "Butch" Otter,.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(jtabares, 1)
January 13, 2015 Filing 85 MOTION for Cally Younger to Appear Pro Hac Vice by C.L. "Butch" Otter, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/3/2015. (lcayce, 2)
January 12, 2015 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen R. Hartnett on behalf of Jeh Johnson, R. Gil Kerlikowske, Leon Rodriguez, United States of America, Ronald D. Vitiello, Thomas S. Winkowski, filed. (Freeny, Kyle)
January 12, 2015 Filing 83 MOTION for Leave to File Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief of Major Cities Chiefs Association et al. by Proposed Amici Major Cities Chiefs Police Association, et al., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/2/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Proposed Amici Curiae Brief, # 2 Exhibit 2-Proposed Order)(Badlani, Chirag)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER re: 79 MOTION for Kathleen R. Hartnett to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeh Johnson, R. Gil Kerlikowske, Leon Rodriguez, United States of America, Ronald D. Vitiello, Thomas S. Winkowski.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(jtabares, 1)
January 12, 2015 Filing 81 Unopposed MOTION Filing of Amicus Brief of Washington and States by State of Washington, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/2/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Part 1, # 2 Appendix Part 2)(Egeler, Anne)
January 12, 2015 Filing 80 NOTICE of attorney substitution by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, Patrick L. McCrory, C.L. "Butch" Otter, Bill Schuette, State of Louisiana, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin. Attorney Scott A. Keller added. Attorney Jonathan F. Mitchell terminated, filed. (Keller, Scott)
January 12, 2015 Filing 79 MOTION for Kathleen R. Hartnett to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeh Johnson, R. Gil Kerlikowske, Leon Rodriguez, United States of America, Ronald D. Vitiello, Thomas S. Winkowski, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/2/2015. (Freeny, Kyle) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2015: # 1 Verified Status of Bar Membership for Motion Pro Hac Vice) (avleal, 1).
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 77 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kyle R. Freeny.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(mperez, 1)
January 9, 2015 Filing 77 MOTION for Kyle R. Freeny to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeh Johnson, R. Gil Kerlikowske, Leon Rodriguez, United States of America, Ronald D. Vitiello, Thomas S. Winkowski, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/30/2015. (Freeny, Kyle)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER denying 40 Motion to Intervene.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(mperez, 1)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 39 Motion for Leave to File. The Court hereby grants leave for the aforementioned movants to participate as amici curiae and file a brief in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction. (Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(avleal, 1)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 66 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Chirag G. Badlani.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(mperez, 1)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 62 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Prof. Peter Margulies.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(mperez, 1)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 55 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Dale L. Wilcox.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(mperez, 1)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 65 Motion to Exceed Page Limits.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(mperez, 1)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 61 Motion for Leave to File Brief as Friends of the Court Supporting Plaintiffs Request for a Preliminary Injunction.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(mperez, 1)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting 63 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ilya Shapiro.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(mperez, 1) (Main Document 67 replaced on 1/8/2015) (mperez, 1).
January 8, 2015 Filing 66 MOTION for Chirag G. Badlani to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Proposed Amici Major Cities Chiefs Police Association, et al, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/29/2015. (jtabares, 1)
January 7, 2015 Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, Patrick L. McCrory, C.L. "Butch" Otter, Bill Schuette, State of Louisiana, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/28/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Oldham, Andrew)
January 7, 2015 Filing 64 REPLY in Support of 5 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, Patrick L. McCrory, C.L. "Butch" Otter, Bill Schuette, State of Louisiana, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 2, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 3, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 4, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 5, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 6, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 7, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 8, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 9.a, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 9.b, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 10.a, # 12 Exhibit Ex. 10.b, # 13 Exhibit Ex. 10.c, # 14 Exhibit Ex. 10.d, # 15 Exhibit Ex. 10.e, # 16 Exhibit Ex. 10.f, # 17 Exhibit Ex. 10.g, # 18 Exhibit Ex. 10.h, # 19 Exhibit Ex. 10.i, # 20 Exhibit Ex. 10.j, # 21 Exhibit Ex. 10.k, # 22 Exhibit Ex. 10.l, # 23 Exhibit Ex. 10.m, # 24 Exhibit Ex. 10.n, # 25 Exhibit Ex. 10.0, # 26 Exhibit Ex. 10.p, # 27 Exhibit Ex. 10.q, # 28 Exhibit Ex. 10.r, # 29 Exhibit Ex. 10.s, # 30 Exhibit Ex. 11, # 31 Exhibit Ex. 12, # 32 Exhibit Ex. 13, # 33 Exhibit Ex. 14, # 34 Exhibit Ex. 15, # 35 Exhibit Ex. 16, # 36 Exhibit Ex. 17, # 37 Exhibit Ex. 18, # 38 Exhibit Ex. 19, # 39 Exhibit Ex. 20, # 40 Exhibit Ex. 21, # 41 Exhibit Ex. 22, # 42 Exhibit Ex. 23, # 43 Exhibit Ex. 24, # 44 Exhibit Ex. 25, # 45 Exhibit Ex. 26, # 46 Exhibit Ex. 27, # 47 Exhibit Ex. 28, # 48 Exhibit Ex. 29, # 49 Exhibit Ex. 30, # 50 Exhibit Ex. 31, # 51 Exhibit Ex. 32, # 52 Exhibit Ex. 33, # 53 Exhibit Ex. 34, # 54 Exhibit Ex. 35)(Oldham, Andrew)
January 7, 2015 Filing 63 MOTION for Ilya Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Josh Blackman, Cato Institute, Jeremy A. Rabkin, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/28/2015. (Olson, Leif)
January 7, 2015 Filing 62 MOTION for Peter Margulies to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Josh Blackman, Cato Institute, Jeremy A. Rabkin, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/28/2015. (Olson, Leif)
January 7, 2015 Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Friends of the Court Supporting Plaintiffs by Cato Institute, Josh Blackman, Jeremy A. Rabkin, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/28/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed brief)(Olson, Leif)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER re: 58 MOTION for Attorney Anne E. Egeler to Appear Pro Hac Vice for the State of Washington.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(jtabares, 1)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying 46 Motion to Consolidate 14-CV-254 and 14-CV-119. (Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(mperez, 1)
January 7, 2015 Filing 58 MOTION for Attorney Anne E. Egeler to Appear Pro Hac Vice for the State of Washington, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/28/2015. (rnieto, 1)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 52 Motion for Leave to File an Overlength Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(mperez, 1)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 49 Motion for Leave to Participate as Amicus Curiae and file a brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Congressman Filemon Vela in his official capacity. (Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(mperez, 1)
January 7, 2015 Filing 55 MOTION for Dale L. Wilcox to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/28/2015. (jguajardo, 1)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David A. Lopez.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(mperez, 1)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ryan S. Post.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(mperez, 1)
January 7, 2015 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to File Over-Length Amicus Curiae Brief by Proposed Amicus Curiae Immigration Reform Law Institute, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/28/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amicus Curiae Brief)(Hethmon, Michael)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 37 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
January 6, 2015 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by John Campbell Barker on behalf of Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, Patrick L. McCrory, C.L. "Butch" Otter, Bill Schuette, State of Louisiana, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, filed. (Barker, John)
January 6, 2015 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Filemon Vela, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/27/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Brief)(Martinez, Antonio)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan Weissglass.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(mperez, 1)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael M. Hethmon.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(mperez, 1)
January 6, 2015 Filing 46 MOTION to Consolidate B14CV254 and B14CV119 by Orly Taitz, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/27/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2)(bcampos, 1)
January 6, 2015 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. Lennington on behalf of State of Wisconsin, filed. (Lennington, Daniel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. Lennington on behalf of State of Wisconsin, filed. (Lennington, Daniel)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 32 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time. Brief due by 1/7/2015 Injunction Hearing set for 1/15/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 before Judge Andrew S. Hanen.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(mperez, 1)
December 30, 2014 Filing 43 MOTION for Michael M. Hathmon to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/20/2015. (jguajardo, 1)
December 29, 2014 Filing 40 MOTION to Intervene by Mitchell Williams, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/20/2015. (avleal, 1)
December 29, 2014 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to File PARTICIPATE AS AMICI CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS BY AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL, AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION, DEFINE AMERICAN, NATIONAL IMMIGRANT JUSTICE CENTER, NATIONAL IMMIGRATION LAW CENTER, NEW ORLEANS WORKERS CENTER FOR RACIAL JUSTICE, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION, SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER, AND UNITED WE DREAM by Service Employees International Union, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/20/2015. (Attachments: # 1 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF, # 2 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PARTICIPATE AS AMICI CURIAE)(Weissglass, Jonathan)
December 24, 2014 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition to 5 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Jeh Johnson, R. Gil Kerlikowske, Leon Rodriguez, United States of America, Ronald D. Vitiello, Thomas S. Winkowski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Errata 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Proposed Order)(Freeny, Kyle)
December 24, 2014 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jeh Johnson, R. Gil Kerlikowske, Leon Rodriguez, United States of America, Ronald D. Vitiello, Thomas S. Winkowski, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/14/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Freeny, Kyle)
December 24, 2014 Filing 36 NOTICE of additional Members of Congress as amici by American Center for Law & Justice, filed. (Sekulow, Jay)
December 23, 2014 Filing 33 MOTION for Jonathan Weissglass to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Service Employees International Union, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/13/2015. (Weissglass, Jonathan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/24/2014: # 1 Continuation) (dahumada, 1).
December 23, 2014 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Reply Brief by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, Patrick L. McCrory, C.L. "Butch" Otter, Bill Schuette, State of Louisiana, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/13/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Oldham, Andrew)
December 22, 2014 Filing 35 MOTION for David A. Lopez to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State of Nebraska, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/12/2015. (jtabares, 1) (Main Document 35 replaced on 1/6/2015) (rnieto, 1).
December 22, 2014 Filing 34 MOTION for Ryan S. Post to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State of Nebraska, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/12/2015. (jtabares, 1) (Main Document 34 replaced on 1/6/2015) (rnieto, 1).
December 19, 2014 Filing 31 Amici Curiae BRIEF in Support of re: 5 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by American Center for Law & Justice, filed.(melopez, 1)
December 19, 2014 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel David Hu on behalf of United States of America, Ronald D. Vitiello, Thomas S. Winkowski, filed. (Hu, Daniel)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 22 Motion for Leave to Participate as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs by Members of Congress, the American Center for Law & Justice, and the Committee to Defend the Separation of Powers.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
December 19, 2014 Filing 28 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Injunction Hearing set for 1/9/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 before Judge Andrew S. Hanen, filed. (csustaeta, 1)
December 19, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew S. Hanen. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 12/19/2014. Appearances: Plaintiff Attorneys: A. Oldham; A. D'Andrea; Defendants Attorneys: K.Freeny; D.Hu;(ERO:R.Nieto)(10:06-10:22) Discussion held. Defendants response due 12/24/14. Plaintiffs reply due 01/02/15. Defendants have one week to 10 days to file reply to Plaintiffs reply if needed. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 01/09/15 at 10:00 am in Brownsville, Texas., filed.(csustaeta, 1)
December 19, 2014 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle R. Freeny on behalf of Jeh Johnson, R. Gil Kerlikowske, Leon Rodriguez, United States of America, Ronald D. Vitiello, Thomas S. Winkowski, filed. (Freeny, Kyle)
December 18, 2014 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela V. Colmenero on behalf of Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, Patrick L. McCrory, C.L. "Butch" Otter, Bill Schuette, State of Louisiana, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, filed. (Bitter, Adam)
December 18, 2014 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam N. Bitter on behalf of Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, Patrick L. McCrory, C.L. "Butch" Otter, Bill Schuette, State of Louisiana, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, filed. (Bitter, Adam)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(sbejarano, 1)
December 16, 2014 Filing 23 ADVISORY by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, Patrick L. McCrory, C.L. "Butch" Otter, Bill Schuette, State of Louisiana, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Juarez-Escobar Opinion)(Oldham, Andrew)
December 16, 2014 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION Motion for Leave to Participate as Amici by American Center for Law & Justice, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/6/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amici Brief)(Sekulow, Jay)
December 15, 2014 Filing 21 MOTION for Patrick R. Wyrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State of Oklahoma, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/5/2015. (dahumada, 1)
December 12, 2014 Filing 20 Motion and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Jay Alan Sekulow. (Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(mperez, 1)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Eric E. Murphy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(mperez, 1)
December 11, 2014 Filing 18 MOTION for Eric Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State of Ohio, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/2/2015. (sbejarano, 1)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Peter J. Rusthoven.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(mperez, 1)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joseph C. Chapelle.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(mperez, 1)
December 10, 2014 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. Lennington on behalf of State of Wisconsin, filed. (Lennington, Daniel)
December 9, 2014 Filing 14 First AMENDED Complaint against All Defendants filed by State of South Dakota, State of Louisiana, State of Alabama, C.L. "Butch" Otter, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, Patrick L. McCrory, State of Kansas, State of Georgia, State of Nebraska, State of Utah, State of Wisconsin, Paul R. LePage, State of Montana, State of Idaho, Phil Bryant, State of South Carolina, State of Indiana, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of Florida, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, Bill Schuette.(D'Andrea, Arthur)
December 9, 2014 Filing 13 MOTION for Peter J. Rusthoven to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State of Indiana, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/30/2014. (D'Andrea, Arthur) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2014: # 1 Verified Status of Bar Membership for Motion Pro Hac Vice) (avleal, 1). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/10/2014) (avleal, 1).
December 9, 2014 Filing 12 MOTION for Joseph C. Chapelle to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State of Indiana, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/30/2014. (D'Andrea, Arthur) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2014: # 1 Verified Status of Bar Membership for Motion Pro Hac Vice) (avleal, 1).
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(sbejarano, 1)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 6 Motion to Exceed Page Limits. (Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified. (rnieto, 1)
December 5, 2014 Summons Issued as to 1.) Jeh Johnson, 2.) R. Gil Kerlikowske, 3.) Leon Rodriguez, 4.) Ronald D. Vitiello, 5.) Thomas S. Winkowski, 6.) U.S. Attorney, 7.) U.S. Attorney General, and 8.) President of the United States. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by: First-class mail.(bcampos, 1)
December 5, 2014 Filing 9 NOTICE Amended Notice of Appearance for Jonathan F. Mitchell re: 3 Notice of Appearance, by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, Patrick L. McCrory, C.L. "Butch" Otter, State of Louisiana, State of Alabama, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, filed. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
December 5, 2014 Filing 8 MOTION for Daniel P Lennington to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State of Wisconsin, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2014. (bcampos, 1)
December 4, 2014 Filing 7 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: # 1 USA, # 2 President, # 3 Johnson, # 4 Rodriguez, # 5 Kerlikowske, # 6 Vitiello, # 7 Winkowski)(Oldham, Andrew)
December 4, 2014 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, Patrick L. McCrory, C.L. "Butch" Otter, State of Louisiana, State of Alabama, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Oldham, Andrew)
December 4, 2014 Filing 5 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, Patrick L. McCrory, C.L. "Butch" Otter, State of Louisiana, State of Alabama, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Oldham, Andrew)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/31/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 before Judge Andrew S. Hanen(Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
December 3, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan F. Mitchell on behalf of Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, Patrick L. McCrory, C.L. "Butch" Otter, State of Louisiana, State of Alabama, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, filed. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
December 3, 2014 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur C. D'Andrea on behalf of Phil Bryant, Paul R. LePage, Patrick L. McCrory, C.L. "Butch" Otter, State of Louisiana, State of Alabama, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, filed. (D'Andrea, Arthur)
December 3, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-14130337) filed by South Dakota, Louisiana, C.L. "Butch" Otter, Alabama, Texas, West Virginia, Patrick L. McCrory, Kansas, Georgia, Nebraska, Utah, Wisconsin, Paul R. LePage, Montana, Idaho, Phil Bryant, South Carolina, Indiana. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oldham, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Texas et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Texas
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Angela V Colmenero
Represented By: Arthur D'Andrea
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Alabama
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Angela V Colmenero
Represented By: Arthur D'Andrea
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Georgia
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Angela V Colmenero
Represented By: Arthur D'Andrea
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Idaho
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Angela V Colmenero
Represented By: Arthur D'Andrea
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Indiana
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Joseph C Chapelle
Represented By: Angela V Colmenero
Represented By: Arthur D'Andrea
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Oldham
Represented By: Peter J Rusthoven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Kansas
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Angela V Colmenero
Represented By: Arthur D'Andrea
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Angela V Colmenero
Represented By: Arthur D'Andrea
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Montana
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Angela V Colmenero
Represented By: Arthur D'Andrea
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nebraska
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Angela V Colmenero
Represented By: Arthur D'Andrea
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Oldham
Represented By: Ryan S Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of South Carolina
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Angela V Colmenero
Represented By: Arthur D'Andrea
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of South Dakota
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Angela V Colmenero
Represented By: Arthur D'Andrea
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Utah
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Angela V Colmenero
Represented By: Arthur D'Andrea
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of West Virginia
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Angela V Colmenero
Represented By: Arthur D'Andrea
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Angela V Colmenero
Represented By: Arthur D'Andrea
Represented By: Daniel P Lennington
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul R. LePage
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Angela V Colmenero
Represented By: Arthur D'Andrea
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick L. McCrory
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Angela V Colmenero
Represented By: Arthur D'Andrea
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.L. "Butch" Otter
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Angela V Colmenero
Represented By: Arthur D'Andrea
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phil Bryant
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Angela V Colmenero
Represented By: Arthur D'Andrea
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of North Dakota
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Angela V Colmenero
Represented By: Arthur D'Andrea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Ohio
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Angela V Colmenero
Represented By: Arthur D'Andrea
Represented By: Eric E Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oklahoma
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Angela V Colmenero
Represented By: Arthur D'Andrea
Represented By: Patrick R. Wyrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Florida
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Angela V Colmenero
Represented By: Arthur D'Andrea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Arizona
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Angela V Colmenero
Represented By: Arthur D'Andrea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Arkansas
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Angela V Colmenero
Represented By: Arthur D'Andrea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Schuette
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Bitter
Represented By: Angela V Colmenero
Represented By: Arthur D'Andrea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Kyle Renee Freeny
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeh Johnson
Represented By: Kyle Renee Freeny
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Gil Kerlikowske
Represented By: Kyle Renee Freeny
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald D. Vitiello
Represented By: Kyle Renee Freeny
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas S. Winkowski
Represented By: Kyle Renee Freeny
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Rodriguez
Represented By: Kyle Renee Freeny
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Service Employees International Union
Represented By: Jonathan D Weissglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Mitchell Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?