Universal Music-MGB Songs et al v. Clayton's Beach Bar and Grill, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Universal Music-MGB Songs, WB Music Corp., Herbilicious Music, Music of Windswept and Ray Vaughan Music, Inc.
Defendant: Clayton's Beach Bar and Grill, LLC and Clayton Brashear
Case Number: 1:2017cv00016
Filed: January 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Brownsville Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Referring Judge: Ronald G Morgan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER entered. The Court ORDERS that this case be dismissed with prejudice to refiling. Case terminated on 11/14/2017. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
November 8, 2017 Filing 27 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Herbilicious Music, Music of Windswept, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., Universal Music-MGB Songs, WB Music Corp., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McDaniel, Jeff)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER entered. The court orders the parties to file, no later than 11/30/2017, either a joint stipulation of dismissal or a joint brief regarding the progress of the settlement. All deadlines are stayed until further notice.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
November 1, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE of Settlement by Herbilicious Music, Music of Windswept, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., Universal Music-MGB Songs, WB Music Corp., filed. (McDaniel, Jeff)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER entered. Plaintiffs shall file a response to #23 Opposed MOTION for Continuance of Pretrial Deadlines and Trial, no later than 11/6/2017. Plaintiffs' deadline for filing a response to the summary judgment shall be stayed until the Court resolves the motion for continuance.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
October 20, 2017 Filing 23 Opposed MOTION for Continuance of Pretrial Deadlines and TrialMotions referred to Ronald G Morgan. by Clayton Brashear, Clayton's Beach Bar and Grill, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Adobbati, Ricardo)
October 18, 2017 Filing 22 APPENDIX re: #21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Herbilicious Music, Music of Windswept, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., Universal Music-MGB Songs, WB Music Corp., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Jones Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1-3 to Jones Declaration, #3 Exhibit 4-5 to Jones Declaration, #4 Exhibit 6 to Jones Declaration Part 1, #5 Exhibit 6 to Jones Declaration Part 2, #6 Exhibit 6 to Jones Declaration Part 3, #7 Exhibit 6 to Jones Declaration Part 4, #8 Exhibit 7 to Jones Declaration, #9 Exhibit B-Brashear Transcript, #10 Exhibit C-CBBG Transcript, #11 Exhibit D-Clark Declaration, #12 Exhibit E-RFA Responses, #13 Exhibit F-Brashear Amended RFA Responses, #14 Exhibit G-CBBG Interrogatory Responses, #15 Exhibit H-Cases)(McDaniel, Jeff)
October 18, 2017 Filing 21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Motions referred to Ronald G Morgan. by Herbilicious Music, Music of Windswept, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., Universal Music-MGB Songs, WB Music Corp., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/8/2017. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Proposed Order)(McDaniel, Jeff)
September 15, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan A. Botkin on behalf of Herbilicious Music, Music of Windswept, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., Universal Music-MGB Songs, WB Music Corp., filed. (Botkin, Ryan)
July 18, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeff A. McDaniel, counsel for Herbilicious Music, Music of Windswept, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., Universal Music-MGB Songs, WB Music Corp., filed. (McDaniel, Jeff)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER. ETT: 3-4 days. Jury. Joinder of Parties due by 6/16/2017 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 7/3/2017. Pltf Expert Report due by 7/3/2017. Deft Expert Witness List due by 8/1/2017. Deft Expert Report due by 8/1/2017. Discovery due by 10/4/2017. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 10/18/2017. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 11/1/2017. Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/8/2017. The final pretrial conference hearing will be scheduled after the Court rules on any dispositive motions. The case will remain on standby until tried.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified.(jtabares, 1)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER entered. The pretrial conference scheduled for May 17, 2017, is cancelled and will not be rescheduled at this time. The Court reminds the parties that if any discovery disputes arise, they are to be resolved in the manner set out in the Court's civil procedures. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified.(jtabares, 1)
May 4, 2017 Filing 16 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Herbilicious Music, Music of Windswept, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., Universal Music-MGB Songs, WB Music Corp., filed.(McDaniel, Jeff)
May 4, 2017 Filing 15 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Herbilicious Music, Music of Windswept, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., Universal Music-MGB Songs, WB Music Corp., filed.(McDaniel, Jeff)
May 4, 2017 Filing 14 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Clayton Brashear, Clayton's Beach Bar and Grill, LLC, filed.(Adobbati, Ricardo)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: #12 Report and Recommendations, #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the alternative Motion for More Definite Statement (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
April 17, 2017 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the alternative Motion for More Definite Statement Objections to R&R due by 5/1/2017(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
April 3, 2017 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition to #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the alternative Motion for More Definite Statement, filed by Herbilicious Music, Music of Windswept, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., Universal Music-MGB Songs, WB Music Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(McDaniel, Jeff)
March 13, 2017 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the alternative Motion for More Definite Statement Motions referred to Ronald G Morgan. by Clayton Brashear, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Adobbati, Ricardo)
March 9, 2017 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Clayton Brashear, Clayton's Beach Bar and Grill, LLC, filed.(Adobbati, Ricardo)
March 8, 2017 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Clayton Brashear, Clayton's Beach Bar and Grill, LLC, filed.(Adobbati, Ricardo)
February 24, 2017 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Clayton Brashear served on 2/16/2017, answer due 3/9/2017, filed.(McDaniel, Jeff)
February 24, 2017 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Clayton's Beach Bar and Grill, LLC served on 2/16/2017, answer due 3/9/2017, filed.(McDaniel, Jeff)
February 8, 2017 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Herbilicious Music, Music of Windswept, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., Universal Music-MGB Songs, WB Music Corp., filed.(McDaniel, Jeff)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/17/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
January 31, 2017 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Clayton Brashear)(McDaniel, Jeff)
January 31, 2017 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Herbilicious Music, Music of Windswept, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., Universal Music-MGB Songs, WB Music Corp. identifying Vivendi; Warner Music Group Corp; BMG Rights Management US, L.L.C.; Sony Corporation of America as Corporate Parent, filed.(McDaniel, Jeff)
January 31, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Clayton Brashear, Clayton's Beach Bar and Grill, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-17859107) filed by Universal Music-MGB Songs, Music of Windswept, Herbilicious Music, WB Music Corp., Ray Vaughan Music, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(McDaniel, Jeff)
January 31, 2017 Summons Issued as to Clayton Brashear, Clayton's Beach Bar and Grill, LLC. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by: First-class mail, filed.(bcampos, 1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universal Music-MGB Songs et al v. Clayton's Beach Bar and Grill, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton's Beach Bar and Grill, LLC
Represented By: Ricardo Marcos Adobbati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Brashear
Represented By: Ricardo Marcos Adobbati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music-MGB Songs
Represented By: Jeff Anthony McDaniel
Represented By: Ryan Andrew Botkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WB Music Corp.
Represented By: Jeff Anthony McDaniel
Represented By: Ryan Andrew Botkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbilicious Music
Represented By: Jeff Anthony McDaniel
Represented By: Ryan Andrew Botkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Music of Windswept
Represented By: Jeff Anthony McDaniel
Represented By: Ryan Andrew Botkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Vaughan Music, Inc.
Represented By: Jeff Anthony McDaniel
Represented By: Ryan Andrew Botkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?